blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2392592 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2392592



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 487
18.10.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
02.03.2017 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
14.12.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
17.11.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
03.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.11.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
03.11.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
03.11.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
03.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
29.06.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
29.06.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
29.06.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
29.06.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 61
29.06.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 60
29.06.2016 Text intended for grant (sequence listing) Search / examination 5
24.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
24.02.2016 Claims Search / examination 2
24.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.02.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
18.12.2015 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
14.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.12.2015 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.08.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
26.08.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.04.2015 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
27.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
27.03.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
27.03.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
27.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
19.01.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
08.10.2014 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
01.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.06.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
06.06.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.05.2014 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
15.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.05.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
15.05.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
15.05.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
15.05.2014 Request for further processing Search / examination 4
05.03.2014 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
13.01.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
03.01.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
04.11.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
29.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.10.2013 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.07.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
26.07.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
03.05.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
14.11.2012 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
16.10.2012 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
25.09.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.09.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
25.09.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
25.09.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
25.09.2012 Request for further processing Search / examination 4
16.07.2012 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
25.06.2012 Refund order of filing/examination fee Search / examination 1
31.05.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
31.05.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
31.05.2012 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
30.01.2012 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 1
30.01.2012 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
09.01.2012 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
12.12.2011 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
09.11.2011 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
09.11.2011 European search opinion Search / examination 4
09.11.2011 European search report Search / examination 4
09.11.2011 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
25.08.2011 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 9
25.08.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
25.08.2011 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
25.08.2011 Sequence listing Search / examination 8
25.07.2011 Deficiencies in sequence listing Search / examination 3
16.05.2011 Communication on invalid designation/extension/validation of states Search / examination 1
09.05.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
09.05.2011 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
15.04.2011 Abstract Search / examination 1
15.04.2011 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
15.04.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
15.04.2011 Description Search / examination 43
15.04.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
15.04.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
15.04.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
15.04.2011 Drawings Search / examination 15
15.04.2011 Priority search results Search / examination 2
15.04.2011 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
15.04.2011 Sequence listing Search / examination 5
30.10.2008 Translation of priority document Search / examination 61
07.11.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 65