blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2392592


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
04.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.06.2018  [2018/23]
02.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.04.2018  [2018/14]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
12.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.02.2018  [2018/07]
05.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.02.2018  [2018/06]
01.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
20.10.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  22.11.2017  [2017/47]
13.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
06.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.11.2017  [2017/45]
29.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.11.2017  [2017/44]
22.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
15.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.10.2017  [2017/42]
08.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.10.2017  [2017/41]
28.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.08.2017  [2017/35]
30.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.08.2017  [2017/31]
09.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.07.2017  [2017/28]
27.02.2017 Change - representative
17.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
11.11.2016 (Expected) grant published on  14.12.2016  [2016/50]
07.11.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
07.11.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
04.11.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
28.06.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
04.04.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.02.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
15.12.2015 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.09.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
17.04.2015 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
09.04.2015 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
09.04.2015 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
05.04.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.04.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
20.01.2015 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
04.10.2014 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.06.2014 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
27.05.2014 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
20.05.2014 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
20.05.2014 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
16.05.2014 New entry: Reply to examination report
05.03.2014 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
28.02.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.01.2014 Change - representative published on  12.02.2014  [2014/07]
29.10.2013 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
26.07.2013 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
26.07.2013 First examination report
13.03.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.10.2012 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
09.10.2012 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
28.09.2012 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
28.09.2012 Amendment by applicant
16.07.2012 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
08.06.2012 Request for examination filed published on  11.07.2012  [2012/28]
13.03.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.01.2012 Change - representative published on  29.02.2012  [2012/09]
07.12.2011 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  07.12.2011  [2011/49]