blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2392592 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP07734344 EP11162543 EP11162616



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9522939Global Dossier 20.12.2016B2
US2014286972 25.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
US29626008 06.10.2008
ES200600955 12.04.2006
WO2007IB01025 11.04.2007
US201414198293 05.03.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8697083Global Dossier 15.04.2014B2
US2009304727 10.12.2009A1
Priority number Date
ES200600955 12.04.2006
WO2007IB01025 11.04.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5373597BGlobal Dossier 18.12.2013B2
JP2009533046 17.09.2009A
Priority number Date
ES200600955 12.04.2006
WO2007IB01025 11.04.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2363409Global Dossier 07.09.2011A1
Priority number Date
EP07734344 11.04.2007
ES200600955 12.04.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2007798Global Dossier 30.09.2015B1
EP2007798 31.12.2008A1
Priority number Date
ES200600955 12.04.2006
WO2007IB01025 11.04.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2646900Global Dossier 14.06.2016C
CA2646900 18.10.2007A1
Priority number Date
ES200600955 12.04.2006
WO2007IB01025 11.04.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2392592Global Dossier 14.12.2016B1
EP2392592 07.12.2011A1
Priority number Date
EP07734344 11.04.2007
ES200600955 12.04.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BRPI0710649 23.08.2011A2
Priority number Date
ES200600955 12.04.2006
WO2007IB01025 11.04.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN101421296B 02.01.2013B
CN101421296 29.04.2009A
Priority number Date
ES200600955 12.04.2006
WO2007IB01025 11.04.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103059140B 28.09.2016B
CN103059140 24.04.2013A
Priority number Date
ES200600955 12.04.2006
CN200780013384 11.04.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2550705T 11.11.2015T3
Priority number Date
ES200600955 12.04.2006
WO2007IB01025 11.04.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX2008013050 14.01.2009A
Priority number Date
ES200600955 12.04.2006
WO2007IB01025 11.04.2007
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2007116316Global Dossier 18.10.2007A1
Priority number Date
ES200600955 12.04.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2016104796Global Dossier 09.06.2016A
Priority number Date
ES200600955 12.04.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP6148088BGlobal Dossier 14.06.2017B2
JP2013233149 21.11.2013A
Priority number Date
ES200600955 12.04.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2307381 23.10.2009B1
ES2307381R 01.12.2008R
ES2307381 16.11.2008A2
Priority number Date
ES200600955 12.04.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT2007798E 13.11.2015E
Priority number Date
ES200600955 12.04.2006
TypeType Earlier application
 EP2007798