Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2458804

EP2458804 - Methods and apparatus related to using a wireless terminal scrambling identifier [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.02.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2012/22]
Inventor(s)01 / Anigstein Alejandro, Pablo
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US
02 / Hande, Prashanth
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US
03 / Li, Junyi
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US
04 / Laroia, Rajiv
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US
05 / Uppala, Sathyadev Venkata
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US
 [2012/22]
Representative(s)Wegner, Hans
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2019/33]
Former [2012/22]Wegner, Hans
Bardehle Pagenberg
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date11164554.513.04.2007
[2012/22]
Priority number, dateUS20060792021P14.04.2006         Original published format: US 792021 P
US20060792223P14.04.2006         Original published format: US 792223 P
US2006048660914.07.2006         Original published format: US 486609
[2012/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2458804
Date:30.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2458804
Date:13.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2458804
Date:14.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04L5/02, H04L27/26, H04B1/69, H04B1/707, H04L5/00
[2014/33]
Former International [2012/22]H04L27/26, H04L5/00, H04B1/707, H04B1/69
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2012/22]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung im Zusammenhang mit der Verwendung eines Verschlüsselungsidentifikators eines drahtlosen Endgeräts[2012/22]
English:Methods and apparatus related to using a wireless terminal scrambling identifier[2012/22]
French:Procédés et appareil associés à l'utilisation d'un identifiant de brouillage de terminal sans fil[2012/22]
Examination procedure03.05.2011Examination requested  [2012/22]
24.09.2011Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
23.11.2011Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
29.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.07.2019Fee for grant paid
03.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07760663.0  / EP2014008
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070760663) is  23.04.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
03.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
03.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
21.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
26.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
08.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
10.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
09.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
08.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0565506  (ERICSSON GE MOBILE COMMUNICAT [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 3, line 19 - line 22 * * page 7, line 4 - line 40 * * page 11, line 54 - line 59 * * page 15, line 6 - line 36 * * page 16, line 24 - line 57 *;
 [X]WO9949695  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-13,15 * abstract * * page 3, line 13 - line 21 * * page 4, line 8 - line 17 * * page 9, line 3 - line 19 * * page 10, line 15 - page 11, line 26 * * page 13, line 11 - line 16 *;
 [X]EP1146762  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-13,15 * abstract * * page 1, line 4 - line 14 * * page 2, line 3 - line 21 * * page 3, line 9 - line 13 * * page 5, line 21 - page 6, line 3 *
 [X]  - PIL KWAN KIM ET AL, "An OFDM-CDMA scheme using orthogonal code multiplexing and its parallel interference cancellation receiver", SPREAD SPECTRUM TECHNIQUES AND APPLICATIONS, 2002 IEEE SEVENTH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON SEPT. 2-5, 2002, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20020902), vol. 2, ISBN 0-7803-7627-7, pages 368 - 372, XP010615493 [X] 1-15 * abstract *