Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2384628

EP2384628 - APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING DOUGH, PARTICULARLY OF THE BREAD BAKING TYPE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/45]Apparatus for processing dough, particularly of the bread baking type
[2014/09]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.07.2015
Database last updated on 23.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Turri F.LLI S.R.L.
Via Alcide De Gasperi, 1428
45023 Costa Di Rovigo (RO) / IT
[2011/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Saggioro, Andrea
Via Galleria Pasteur, 5
45100, Rovigo / IT
 [2011/45]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2011/45]Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners (IT)
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date11164652.703.05.2011
[2011/45]
Priority number, dateIT2010PD0014305.05.2010         Original published format: IT PD20100143
[2011/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2384628
Date:09.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2384628
Date:27.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.05.2011
ClassificationInternational:A21C3/02
[2011/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/45]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE VERARBEITUNG VON TEIG, INSBESONDERE VON TEIG ZUM BACKEN VON BROT[2014/09]
English:APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING DOUGH, PARTICULARLY OF THE BREAD BAKING TYPE[2014/09]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE PÂTE, EN PARTICULIER DE PÂTE À PAIN[2014/09]
Former [2011/45]Vorrichtung für die Verarbeitung von Teig, insbesondere von Teig zum Backen von Brot
Former [2011/45]Apparatus for processing dough, particularly of the bread baking type
Former [2011/45]Dispositf pour le traitement de pâte, en particulier du type cuissson de pain
Examination procedure02.11.2011Examination requested  [2011/50]
08.05.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
03.02.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.03.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.07.2014Fee for grant paid
15.07.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.07.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.01.2014
Opposition(s)28.05.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
24.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.05.2011
AL27.08.2014
BE27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
MK27.08.2014
MT27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
RS27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
SM27.08.2014
TR27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
GB03.05.2015
IE03.05.2015
LU03.05.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU03.05.2011
BE27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
MK27.08.2014
MT27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
RS27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
SM27.08.2014
TR27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
GB03.05.2015
IE03.05.2015
LU03.05.2015
Former [2017/38]HU03.05.2011
BE27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
MT27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
RS27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
SM27.08.2014
TR27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
GB03.05.2015
IE03.05.2015
LU03.05.2015
Former [2017/03]BE27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
MT27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
RS27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
GB03.05.2015
IE03.05.2015
LU03.05.2015
Former [2016/33]BE27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
RS27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
GB03.05.2015
IE03.05.2015
LU03.05.2015
Former [2016/23]CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
RS27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
GB03.05.2015
IE03.05.2015
LU03.05.2015
Former [2016/20]CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
RS27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
IE03.05.2015
LU03.05.2015
Former [2016/06]CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
RS27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
LU03.05.2015
Former [2015/50]CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
RS27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/24]CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
RS27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/23]CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
RS27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/22]CY27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
RS27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/12]CY27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
RS27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/10]FI27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
Former [2015/09]FI27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
Former [2015/08]LT27.08.2014
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0744126  (RHEON AUTOMATIC MACHINERY CO [JP]) [Y] 1-8,10-12 * column 1, line 3 - line 5; figure 15 * * column 1, line 32 - line 47 * * column 3, line 9 - line 13 * * column 3, line 18 - line 22 * * column 3, line 27 - line 42 * * column 5, line 20 - line 38 *;
 [Y]GB860154  (VER BACKEREIMASCHINENWERKE VEB) [Y] 1-8,10-12 * page 1, line 10 - line 14; figure 1 * * page 1, line 25 - line 56 *;
 [Y]US5180593  (MISTRETTA JOSEPH L [US] ET AL) [Y] 10,11 * column 1, line 6 - line 9; figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 23 - line 28 * * column 1, line 63 - line 66 * * column 2, line 31 - line 44 * * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 13 *;
 [Y]US2006162580  (LOWRY STANLEY N [US] ET AL) [Y] 11 * paragraphs [0001] , [0085] *;
 [A]US2005170031  (LAMBAUER PETER [AT] ET AL) [A] 1,3,4,11 * paragraph [0001]; figures 3,16,17,19 * * paragraphs [0031] , [0039] , [0042] *;
 [A]EP1174032  (RHEON AUTOMATIC MACHINERY CO [JP]) [A] 1,2,9,10,12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] , [0022] , [0023]; figures 1-10 * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0087] *