|
03.05.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2011 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.05.2011 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.05.2011 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
03.05.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.05.2011 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2011 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2011 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
06.05.2011 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2011 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
23.05.2011 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.05.2011 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.05.2011 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2011 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2011 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2011 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2011 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.05.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
28.03.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.11.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.11.2013 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.11.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.01.2014 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.01.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.01.2014 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2014 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.02.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.02.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.02.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.02.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.02.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.02.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.03.2014 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
12.03.2014 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2014 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.03.2014 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2014 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2014 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.07.2014 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.07.2014 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2014 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.2014 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.08.2014 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2014 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2015 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |