blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2384628 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2384628



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 272
01.07.2015 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
29.08.2014 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
05.08.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
05.08.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
05.08.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
31.07.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
15.07.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
15.07.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
15.07.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
15.07.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
15.07.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
15.07.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
24.04.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
24.04.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
12.03.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
12.03.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
12.03.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
12.03.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 23
04.02.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
04.02.2014 Claims Search / examination 4
04.02.2014 Description Search / examination 2
04.02.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.02.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.02.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
03.02.2014 Claims Search / examination 4
03.02.2014 Description Search / examination 2
03.02.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.01.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
10.01.2014 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
10.01.2014 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
09.01.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
09.01.2014 Claims Search / examination 4
09.01.2014 Description Search / examination 2
09.01.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.01.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
07.01.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
07.01.2014 Claims Search / examination 4
07.01.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.01.2014 Examination started Search / examination 1
20.11.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
20.11.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
20.11.2013 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
20.11.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
18.11.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
18.11.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
18.11.2013 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
18.11.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
28.03.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
15.05.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 15
08.05.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
08.05.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
08.05.2012 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
08.05.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
08.05.2012 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
08.05.2012 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
14.11.2011 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
02.11.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
02.11.2011 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
12.10.2011 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
01.06.2011 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
23.05.2011 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.05.2011 European search opinion Search / examination 4
23.05.2011 European search report Search / examination 3
09.05.2011 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 10
06.05.2011 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
06.05.2011 Priority document Search / examination 44
03.05.2011 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.05.2011 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
03.05.2011 Claims Search / examination 4
03.05.2011 Description Search / examination 14
03.05.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.05.2011 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
03.05.2011 Drawings Search / examination 4
03.05.2011 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5