blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2384628


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
29.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
13.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
01.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.10.2017  [2017/40]
18.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.09.2017  [2017/38]
16.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
15.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.08.2016  [2016/33]
06.05.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.06.2016  [2016/23]
15.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.05.2016  [2016/20]
08.01.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.02.2016  [2016/06]
06.11.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.12.2015  [2015/50]
03.07.2015 No opposition filed within time limit published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
08.05.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.06.2015  [2015/24]
01.05.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.06.2015  [2015/23]
24.04.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.05.2015  [2015/22]
13.02.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.03.2015  [2015/12]
06.02.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.03.2015  [2015/11]
30.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.03.2015  [2015/10]
23.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.02.2015  [2015/09]
16.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.02.2015  [2015/08]
25.07.2014 (Expected) grant published on  27.08.2014  [2014/35]
18.07.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
18.07.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
15.07.2014 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
06.05.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.03.2014 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
04.02.2014 Change: Reply to examination report
24.01.2014 Change - German title published on  26.02.2014  [2014/09]
24.01.2014 Change - English title published on  26.02.2014  [2014/09]
24.01.2014 Change - French title published on  26.02.2014  [2014/09]
18.01.2014 New entry: Reply to examination report
10.01.2014 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
10.01.2014 First examination report
05.04.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.05.2012 Amendment by applicant
15.12.2011 Amendment by applicant
23.11.2011 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  09.11.2011  [2011/45]
11.11.2011 Request for examination filed published on  14.12.2011  [2011/50]
04.11.2011 Amendment by applicant