Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2388388

EP2388388 - Finishing for a staircase or step, and kit for forming such finishing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.11.2015
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.12.2015  [2015/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Flooring Industries Limited, SARL
10b, Rue des Mérovingiens (ZI Bourmicht)
8070 Bertrange / LU
[2011/47]
Inventor(s)01 / Vanhastel, Luc
Felix d'Hoopstraat 88
8700, Tielt / BE
 [2011/47]
Representative(s)Schacht, Benny Marcel Corneel
Mohawk International Services, BVBA
Patent department
Ooigemstraat 3
8710 Wielsbeke / BE
[N/P]
Former [2011/47]Schacht, Benny Marcel Corneel
Unilin Industries, BVBA
Patent Department
Ooigemstraat 3
8710 Wielsbeke / BE
Application number, filing date11165645.011.05.2011
[2011/47]
Priority number, dateBE2010000029618.05.2010         Original published format: BE 201000296
BE2010000058304.10.2010         Original published format: BE 201000583
[2011/47]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2388388
Date:23.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.09.2011
ClassificationInternational:E04F11/16
[2011/47]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/47]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Anordnung für eine Treppe oder Stufe und Set zur Bildung einer solchen Anordnung[2011/47]
English:Finishing for a staircase or step, and kit for forming such finishing[2011/47]
French:Profilé de finition pour un escalier ou une marche, et ensemble pour former une telle finition[2011/47]
Examination procedure05.04.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.04.2012Examination requested  [2012/20]
27.02.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.07.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/51]
07.08.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2015/51]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.02.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
22.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201505   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]DE202009017769U  (SONDERMANN FRANK [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * figures 1,3,8,9 * [I] 3;
 [I]JP2005207063  (TOYO PLYWOOD CO LTD) [I] 1-6 * figures 1,2,3,4 *;
 [XAI]EP1681402  (FLOORING IND LTD [IE]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * figures 1-3 * [A] 7-11 [I] 3;
 [X]FR2881158  (DEPRO FRANCE SARL [FR]) [X] 7,10-12 * page 16, line 3 - line 6; figures 6,7 *;
 [X]WO2007142841  (PFLEIDERER SCHEIZ AG [CH], et al) [X] 7-12 * figures 33a,34 *;
 [X]ES2328204  (PERFILSTAR S A [ES]) [X] 7-13 * figures 1-4,5 *;
 [I]EP1746217  (FINANC YVES JUDEL SOC [FR]) [I] 7-10,12-14 * figure 1 *;
 [X]DE29518994U  (MERKT HEIDEMARIE [DE]) [X] 7-10,12-14 * figure 5 *
by applicantEP1681402
 DE4325998
 US2005229517
 WO2006093866
 WO2007139595
 WO2007142841
 EP1836363
 WO9747834