Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2360198

EP2360198 - Filled polymer composite and synthetic building material compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.07.2012
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.08.2012  [2012/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Century-Board USA LLC
9190 Butterfly Court
Fort Myers, FL 33919 / US
[2011/34]
Inventor(s)01 / Brown, Wade, H.
288 Patternote Road
Mooresville, North Carolina 28117 / US
 [2011/48]
Former [2011/34]01 / Brown, Wade, H.
9190 Butterfly Court
Fort Myers, FL 33919 / US
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/34]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date11165942.121.01.2005
[2011/34]
Priority number, dateUS2004076401223.01.2004         Original published format: US 764012
[2011/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2360198
Date:24.08.2011
Language:EN
[2011/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.07.2011
ClassificationInternational:C08G18/08, C08G18/48, C08K3/22, C08K7/14, E04C2/00, C08J5/04
[2011/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/34]
TitleGerman:Gefüllter Polymerverbundwerkstoff und synthetische Baumaterialzusammensetzungen[2011/34]
English:Filled polymer composite and synthetic building material compositions[2011/34]
French:Composite polymère additionné d'une charge et compositions pour matériau de construction synthétique[2011/34]
Examination procedure25.02.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/34]
03.04.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2012/34]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05711595.8  / EP1716283
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050711595) is  11.05.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
07.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
07.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
07.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
07.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201208   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XDAI]US4661533  (STOBBY WILLIAM G [US]) [XD] 1,2,5,6 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 10 * * example 1; table I * [A] 8-15 [I] 3,4,7;
 [XA]US4005035  (DEAVER DANN T) [X] 12-15 * column 1, line 7 - column 2, line 61 * * column 4, line 6 - column 6, line 19 * * examples I,X; table A * [A] 1-11;
 [A]US4680214  (FRISCH KURT C [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 32 - column 4, line 47 * * column 5, line 8 - column 6, line 68 * * column 7, line 31 - column 8, line 30 * * column 9, lines 1-68 * * examples 1-10; tables I-V *;
 [A]US4251428  (RECKER KLAUS, et al) [A] 1-15 * examples 1-3 * * column 1, lines 8-40 * * column 11, lines 34-60 *
by applicantUS5302634
 US5369147
 US5604260
 US4661533