blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2361725 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2361725



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 540
23.11.2017 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
24.05.2017 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
23.05.2017 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
19.05.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 8
19.05.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
19.05.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
17.05.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
17.05.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
17.05.2017 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 2
15.05.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
10.05.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.04.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.04.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
28.02.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
23.02.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.02.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.02.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.02.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
17.02.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
17.02.2017 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 4
14.02.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
08.02.2017 F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
18.01.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.01.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
12.01.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
04.01.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.12.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.12.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 13
20.10.2016 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
17.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
17.10.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 5
07.09.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
07.09.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
01.09.2016 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
29.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
29.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
29.08.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
12.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.06.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.06.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.06.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.06.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.06.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
17.06.2016 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
17.06.2016 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
17.06.2016 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 8
17.06.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
17.06.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
17.06.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
17.06.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
17.06.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
17.06.2016 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.05.2016 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
16.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
16.05.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
06.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
02.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
02.05.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.04.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.04.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
18.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.03.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
11.01.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.01.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
29.12.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.12.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.12.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.12.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.12.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
17.12.2015 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
17.12.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
17.12.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.12.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.08.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
05.06.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
04.05.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.05.2015 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 9
16.03.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.03.2015 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
25.02.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.02.2015 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
24.02.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
16.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
16.02.2015 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
23.01.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
23.10.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
23.10.2014 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
14.07.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.07.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
07.07.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
07.07.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.07.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 11
03.07.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 25
03.07.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
03.07.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
03.07.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
03.07.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
03.07.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
03.07.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 23
03.07.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
03.07.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
03.07.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
03.07.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
03.07.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 35
03.07.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
03.07.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
03.07.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
03.07.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
03.07.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
03.07.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
03.07.2014 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
18.12.2013 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
21.11.2013 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
08.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.11.2013 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
08.11.2013 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
08.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
17.10.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
14.10.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
14.10.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
14.10.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
14.10.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
14.10.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 11
09.10.2013 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 3
09.10.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
02.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.10.2013 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
02.10.2013 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
02.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.10.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
04.09.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.08.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
02.07.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
02.07.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
02.07.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
02.07.2013 Description Search / examination 1
02.07.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.07.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
08.04.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
03.04.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.04.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
03.04.2013 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.01.2013 Annex to a communication Search / examination 7
11.01.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
11.01.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.11.2012 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.02.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.02.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.02.2012 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 2
03.01.2012 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
20.12.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
20.12.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
20.12.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
20.12.2011 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
20.12.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
20.12.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
08.09.2011 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
05.09.2011 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
10.08.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.08.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.08.2011 Miscellaneous requests for changes concerning the applicant Search / examination 1
03.08.2011 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
01.08.2011 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
05.07.2011 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
05.07.2011 European search opinion Search / examination 3
05.07.2011 European search report Search / examination 2
28.06.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.06.2011 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
28.06.2011 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 2
28.06.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
28.06.2011 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
25.05.2011 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
13.05.2011 Abstract Search / examination 1
13.05.2011 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
13.05.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
13.05.2011 Description Search / examination 5
13.05.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.05.2011 Drawings Search / examination 3
13.05.2011 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
26.05.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 18