Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2386291

EP2386291 - Vaginally administrable progesterone-containing tablets and method for preparing same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.10.2016
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2019Deletion: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ferring BV
Polaris Avenue 144
2132 JX Hoofddorp / NL
[2011/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Jossifoff, Azariah
Safir Street 5
52622, Ramat Gan / IL
 [2011/46]
Representative(s)Bates, Philip Ian
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/46]Bates, Philip Ian
Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London
WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date11166346.417.11.1999
[2011/46]
Priority number, dateIL1998012712918.11.1998         Original published format: IL 12712998
[2011/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2386291
Date:16.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.10.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/02, A61K9/20, A61K9/46, A61P15/12, A61K9/00, A61K31/57, A61K45/06
[2011/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2011/46]
TitleGerman:Vaginal verabreichbare Progesteron enthaltende Tabletten sowie Verfahren zu deren Herstellung[2011/46]
English:Vaginally administrable progesterone-containing tablets and method for preparing same[2011/46]
French:Comprimés vaginaux contenant de la progestérone, et procédé de préparation associé[2011/47]
Examination procedure15.05.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.05.2012Examination requested  [2012/26]
19.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.03.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.10.2018Date of oral proceedings
05.11.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
05.11.2018Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination03.01.2019Appeal received No.  T0836/19
27.02.2019Statement of grounds filed
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP99972096.4  / EP1131052
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19990972096) is  28.05.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
14.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
13.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
18.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 15
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 16
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 17
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 18
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 19
29.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 20
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5084277  (GRECO JOHN C [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 2, column 3 - page 3, column 10; examples 1-14; claims 1-25, 38 *;
 [Y]US5116619  (GRECO JOHN C [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 2 - page 3; examples 1-14; claims 1-28 *;
 [XY]EP0088394  (EISAI CO LTD [JP]) [X] 14,15 * page 1 - page 1; examples 1-5; claims 1-4 * [Y] 1-15;
 [Y]US4252787  (SHERMAN KENNETH N, et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 3 - column 12 *;
 [X]EP0027731  (ORTHO PHARMA CORP [US]) [X] 14,15 * claims 1-10 *;
 [X]US4187286  (MARCUS BERTRAM J [US]) [X] 14,15 * claims 1-10 *;
 [T]US2005008694  (JOSSIFOFF AZARIAH [IL]) [T] 1-15 * page 2 - page 4; examples 1-4 *
by applicantUS5084277
 US5116619
    - LOBO, AM. J. OBSTET. GYNECOL., (1992), vol. 166, pages 1997 - 2004
    - FAHRAEUS ET AL., EUR. J. CLIN. INVEST., (1983), vol. 13, pages 447 - 453
    - OTTOSSON ET AL., AM. J. OBSTET. GYNECOL., (1985), vol. 151, pages 746 - 750
    - KNOPP, AM. J. OBSTET. GYNECOL., (1988), vol. 158, pages 1630 - 1643
    - CROOK ET AL., AM. J. OBSTET. GYNECOL., (1992), vol. 166, pages 950 - 954
    - JIANG ET AL., EUR. J. PHARMACOL., (1992), vol. 211, pages 163 - 167
    - ADLERCREUTZ ET AL., J. STEROID BIOCHEM., (1980), vol. 13, pages 231 - 244
    - ARAFAT ET AL., AM. J. OBSTET. GYNECOL., (1988), vol. 159, pages 1203 - 1209
    - WHITEHEAD ET AL., BRIT. MED. J., (1980), vol. 280, pages 825 - 827
    - OTTOSSON ET AL., BR. J. OBSTET. GYNECOL., (1984), vol. 91, pages 1111 - 1119
    - PADWICK ET AL., FERTIL. STERIL., (1986), vol. 46, pages 402 - 407
    - NAHOUL ET AL., MATUNTAS, (1993), vol. 16, pages 183 - 202
    - NILLUS ET AL., AM. J. OBSTET. GYNECOL., (1971), vol. 110, pages 470 - 477
    - CHAKMAKJIAN ET AL., J. REPROD. MED., (1987), vol. 32, pages 443 - 448
    - DEVROEY ET AL., INT. J. FERTIL, (1989), vol. 34, pages 188 - 193
    - PRICE ET AL., FERTIL. STERIL., (1983), vol. 39, pages 490 - 493
    - NORMAN ET AL., FERTIL. STERIL., (1991), vol. 56, pages 1034 - 1039
    - ARCHER ET AL., AM. J. OBSTET. GYNECOL, (1995), vol. 173, pages 471 - 478
    - DEVROEY ET AL., INT. J. FERTIL., (1989), vol. 34, pages 188 - 193
    - SMITZ ET AL., HUM. REPROD., (1992), vol. 2, pages 309 - 314
    - MILES ET AL., FERTIL. STERIL., (1994), vol. 62, pages 485 - 490
    - FANCHIN ET AL., OBSTET. GYNECOL., (1997), vol. 90, pages 396 - 401
    - ROSS ET AL., AM. J. OBSTET. GYNECOL., (1997), vol. 177, pages 937 - 941
    - BOURGAIN ET AL., HUM. REPROD., (1990), vol. 5, pages 537 - 543
    - VILLANUEVE ET AL., FERTIL. STERIL., (1981), vol. 35, pages 433 - 437