Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2386291 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2386291



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 205
06.12.2019 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
03.12.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
03.12.2019 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
03.12.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
03.12.2019 Withdrawal of an appeal Appeal 1
25.10.2019 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
21.10.2019 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
18.09.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
10.09.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
09.09.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
04.09.2019 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
02.05.2019 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
26.03.2019 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
14.03.2019 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
27.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
27.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
27.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
27.02.2019 Claims Appeal 1
27.02.2019 Claims Appeal 1
27.02.2019 Claims Appeal 1
27.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
27.02.2019 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
27.02.2019 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
27.02.2019 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
03.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
03.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
03.01.2019 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
13.11.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
05.11.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
05.11.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
05.11.2018 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
05.11.2018 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
05.11.2018 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 5
05.11.2018 Means of redress Search / examination 2
05.11.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
05.11.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
05.11.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
04.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.10.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
17.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.09.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 4
06.03.2018 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
23.02.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
23.02.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
23.02.2018 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
23.02.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
16.05.2017 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
25.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.10.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
18.07.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
18.07.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.03.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.03.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.01.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
23.01.2013 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.01.2013 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.10.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
25.10.2012 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
24.10.2012 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
19.09.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
19.09.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.08.2012 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 1
08.08.2012 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 1
18.06.2012 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
18.05.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
18.05.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
18.05.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
15.05.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
15.05.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
15.05.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
15.05.2012 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
21.11.2011 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
16.11.2011 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
19.10.2011 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.10.2011 European search opinion Search / examination 5
19.10.2011 European search report Search / examination 2
19.10.2011 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
22.08.2011 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
17.08.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
16.08.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
17.05.2011 Abstract Search / examination 1
17.05.2011 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
17.05.2011 Claims Search / examination 1
17.05.2011 Description Search / examination 21
17.05.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
17.05.2011 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4
31.05.2000 Priority document Search / examination 24