Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2386291


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
24.01.2020 Refusal of application published on  26.02.2020 [2020/09]
18.01.2020 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
03.12.2019 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
04.09.2019 Change: Date of oral proceedings
04.09.2019 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
22.03.2019 Change: Appeal number
27.02.2019 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal
04.01.2019 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
04.01.2019 New entry: Appeal number
03.12.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.11.2018 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.11.2018 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
22.02.2018 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
15.11.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.11.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.10.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
27.07.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
13.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.11.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.11.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.03.2013 New entry: Reply to examination report
24.01.2013 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
16.11.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.09.2012 First examination report
18.09.2012 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
25.05.2012 Request for examination filed published on  27.06.2012  [2012/26]
16.05.2012 Amendment by applicant
23.11.2011 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  16.11.2011  [2011/46]
17.11.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.10.2011 Change - French title published on  23.11.2011  [2011/47]