EP2380592 - Antagonist antibody directed against calcitonin gene-related peptide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/43] | Antagonist antibodies directed against calcitonin gene-related peptide and methods using same | ||
[2017/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH Schlüsselstrasse 12 8645 Jona / CH | [2017/30] |
Former [2013/08] | For all designated states Labrys Biologics Inc. 1700 Owens Street No. 595 San Francisco, CA 94158 / US | ||
Former [2011/43] | For all designated states Rinat Neuroscience Corp. 230 East Grand Avenue South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zeller, Joerg Rinat Neuroscience Corp. 230 East Grand Avenue South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 02 /
Poulsen, Kristian, Todd Rinat Neuroscience, Corp. 230 East Grand Avenue South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 03 /
Abdiche, Yasmina, Noubia Rinat Neuroscience Corp. 230 East Grand Avenue South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 04 /
Pons, Jaume Rinat Neuroscience, Corp. 230 East Grand Avenue South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 05 /
Rosenthal, Arnon 150 Normandy Lane Woodside, CA 94062 / US | 06 /
Collier, Sierra, Jones Rinat Neuroscience, Corp. 230 East Grand Avenue South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2011/43] | Representative(s) | Marshall, Cameron John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2018/10] |
Former [2013/08] | Roques, Sarah Elizabeth J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2012/33] | Pfizer European Patent Department 23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | ||
Former [2011/43] | Porter, Jonathan Philip Pfizer European Patent Department 23-25, avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | Application number, filing date | 11166787.9 | 02.11.2006 | [2011/43] | Priority number, date | US20050736623P | 14.11.2005 Original published format: US 736623 P | [2011/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2380592 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2380592 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2380592 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61P5/24, C07K16/26 | [2012/23] | CPC: |
A61K31/4045 (EP,US);
C07K16/18 (NO,US);
A61K39/395 (KR,NO);
A61K39/3955 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P5/24 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07K16/00 (KR);
C07K16/26 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/21 (US);
C07K2317/24 (US);
C07K2317/33 (EP,US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,US);
C07K2317/52 (US);
C07K2317/55 (EP,US);
C07K2317/56 (US);
C07K2317/565 (EP,US);
C07K2317/567 (US);
C07K2317/70 (EP,US);
C07K2317/71 (US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US);
C07K2317/92 (EP,US);
C07K2317/94 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/43] | A61K39/395, C07K14/585, A61P25/00, C07K16/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/10] |
Former [2011/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 06.12.2012 | BA | 06.12.2012 | HR | 06.12.2012 | MK | 06.12.2012 | RS | 06.12.2012 | Title | German: | Antagonist-Antikörper gegen calcitonin-Gen-related-Peptid | [2017/50] | English: | Antagonist antibody directed against calcitonin gene-related peptide | [2017/50] | French: | Anticorps antagoniste orienté contre un peptide lié au gène de la calcitonine | [2017/50] |
Former [2011/43] | Antagonisten-Antikörper gegen calcitonin-Gen-related-Peptid und Verfahren damit | ||
Former [2011/43] | Antagonist antibodies directed against calcitonin gene-related peptide and methods using same | ||
Former [2011/43] | Anticorps antagonistes orientés contre un peptide lié au gène de la calcitonine, et procédés d'utilisation correspondants | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 06.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/03] | 20.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.11.2017 | 13.11.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06809207.1 / EP1957106 | Divisional application(s) | EP16154411.9 / EP3069731 | EP16154418.4 / EP3045182 | EP17152503.3 / EP3178493 | EP20200867.8 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060809207) is 20.05.2009 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/07] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 05.05.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 05.05.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.05.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2005234054 (MUELLER STEPHAN G [DE], et al) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0065] , [0066] *; | [Y] - FROBERT Y ET AL, "A sensitive sandwich enzyme immunoassay for calcitonin gene-related peptide (CGRP): characterization and application.", PEPTIDES 1999, (1999), vol. 20, no. 2, ISSN 0196-9781, pages 275 - 284, XP002430636 [Y] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0196-9781(98)00172-7 | [Y] - TAN K K ET AL, "Calcitonin gene-related peptide as an endogenous vasodilator: immunoblockade studies in vivo with an anti-calcitonin gene-related peptide monoclonal antibody and its Fab' fragment.", CLINICAL SCIENCE (LONDON, ENGLAND : 1979) DEC 1995, (199512), vol. 89, no. 6, ISSN 0143-5221, pages 565 - 573, XP009082539 [Y] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/cs0890565 | [A] - BALINT R F ET AL, "ANTIBODY ENGINEERING BY PARSIMONIOUS MUTAGENESIS", GENE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19931227), vol. 137, no. 1, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 109 - 118, XP002031537 [A] 1-13 * page 110, column R * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(93)90258-5 | [A] - LITTLE M ET AL, "Of mice and men: hybridoma and recombinant antibodies", IMMUNOLOGY TODAY, ELSEVIER PUBLICATIONS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (20000801), vol. 21, no. 8, ISSN 0167-5699, pages 364 - 370, XP004215163 [A] 1-13 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-5699(00)01668-6 | [A] - HOLT L J ET AL, "Domain antibodies: proteins for therapy", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER PUBLICATIONS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (200311), vol. 21, no. 11, ISSN 0167-7799, pages 484 - 490, XP004467495 [A] 1-13 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tibtech.2003.08.007 | [A] - DAVIES J ET AL, "Affinity improvement of single antibody VH domains: residues in all three hypervariable regions affect antigen binding", IMMUNOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, NL, (199609), vol. 2, no. 3, ISSN 1380-2933, pages 169 - 179, XP004070292 [A] 1-13 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1380-2933(96)00045-0 | Examination | - TAN K K ET AL, "Demonstration of the neurotransmitter role of calcitonin gene-related peptides (CGRP) by immunoblockade with anti-CGRP monoclonal antibodies.", BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY MAR 1994, (199403), vol. 111, no. 3, ISSN 0007-1188, pages 703 - 710 | - BUCKLEY T L ET AL, "THE PARTIAL INHINITION OF INFLAMMATORY RESPONSES INDUCED BY CAPSAICIN USING THE FAB FRAGMENT OF A SELECTIVE CALCITONIN GENE-RELATED PEPTIDE ANTISERUM IN RABBIT SKIN", NEUROSCIENCE, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19920101), vol. 48, no. 4, doi:10.1016/0306-4522(92)90284-9, ISSN 0306-4522, pages 963 - 968, XP000563679 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0306-4522(92)90284-9 | - Dan Hurley, "News from the American Headache Society Annual Meeting: CGRP Drug Improves Wellness on Headache-Free Days, Study Finds", Neurology Today, doi:10.1097/01.NT.0000489588.15047.0c, (20160707), pages 31 - 31, URL: http://journals.lww.com/neurotodayonline/Fulltext/2016/07070/News_from_the_American_Headache_Society_Annual.8.aspx, (20170425), XP055367323 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/01.NT.0000489588.15047.0c | - WONG H C ET AL, "MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY TO RAT ALPHA-CGRP: PRODUCTION, CHARACTERIZATION, AND IN VIVO IMMUNONEUTRALIZATION ACTIVITY", HYBRIDOMA, LIEBERT, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19930101), vol. 12, no. 1, ISSN 0272-457X, pages 93 - 106, XP009082532 | - PESKAR B M ET AL, "A monoclonal antibody to calcitonin gene-related peptide abolishes capsaicin-induced gastroprotection", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, NL, vol. 250, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0014-2999(93)90645-X, ISSN 0014-2999, (19931130), pages 201 - 203, (19931130), XP025569068 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-2999(93)90645-X | - Max Reinshagen ET AL, "Calcitonin Gene-Related Peptide Mediates the Protective Effect of Sensory Nerves in a Model of Colonic Injury 1", (19980101), URL: http://jpet.aspetjournals.org/content/jpet/286/2/657.full.pdf, (20170418), XP055365033 | - LOUIS S M ET AL, "The role of substance P and calcitonin gene-related peptide in neurogenic plasma extravasation and vasodilatation in the rat", NEUROSCIENCE, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 32, no. 3, doi:10.1016/0306-4522(89)90281-9, ISSN 0306-4522, (19890101), pages 581 - 586, (19890101), XP024383568 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0306-4522(89)90281-9 | - Bigal et al., "Safety, tolerability, and effi cacy of TEV-48125 for preventive treatment of chronic migraine: a multicentre, randomised, double-blind, placebo-controlled, phase 2b study", neurology Articles Lancet Neurol, (20150930), pages 1091 - 100, URL: http://www.thelancet.com/pdfs/journals/laneur/PIIS1474-4422(15)00245-8.pdf, (20171018), XP055416827 | - Bigal et al., "Safety, tolerability, and effi cacy of TEV-48125 for preventive treatment of high-frequency episodic migraine: a multicentre, randomised, double-blind, placebo-controlled, phase 2b study", (20150930), URL: http://www.thelancet.com/pdfs/journals/laneur/PIIS1474-4422(15)00249-5.pdf, (20171016), XP055416829 | by applicant | US3773919 | EP0003089 | US4485045 | US4544545 | US4676980 | US4683195 | US4683202 | WO8704462 | US4754065 | GB2200651 | US4777127 | US4800159 | US4816567 | EP0345242 | WO9007936 | WO9011092 | WO9100360 | WO9102805 | US5013556 | US5047335 | WO9114445 | WO9220373 | EP0519596 | EP0524968 | WO9303769 | WO9306213 | WO9310218 | WO9311230 | US5219740 | WO9319191 | WO9325698 | WO9325234 | US5278299 | WO9403622 | WO9404690 | WO9412649 | WO9423697 | WO9428938 | WO9500655 | WO9507994 | WO9511984 | WO9513796 | US5422120 | WO9530763 | US5500362 | US5510261 | WO9617072 | US5530101 | US5545807 | US5545806 | US5565332 | US5569825 | US5580717 | US5580859 | US5585089 | US5625126 | US5633425 | US5661016 | WO9742338 | US5693761 | US5693762 | US5733743 | US5750373 | US5807715 | US5814482 | US5821337 | US5866692 | US5981568 | WO9958572 | US5997867 | US6054297 | WO0053211 | US6180370 | US6180377 | US6210671 | WO0127160 | US6265150 | US6331415 | US6350861 | US6376471 | US6413942 | US6436908 | WO2004058184 | - WYON ET AL., SCAND. J. UROL. NEPHROL., (2001), vol. 35, pages 92 - 96 | - WYON ET AL., MENOPAUSE, (2000), vol. 7, no. 1, pages 25 - 30 | - FREEDMAN, AM. J. HUMAN BIOL., (2001), vol. 13, pages 453 - 464 | - MURPHY ET AL., 3.SUP.RD INT'! SYMPOSIUM ON RECENT ADVANCES IN UROLOGICAL CANCER DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT-PROCEEDINGS, (1992), pages 3 - 7 | - KATOVICH ET AL., PROCEEDINGS OF THE SOCIETY FOR EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY & MEDICINE, (1990), vol. 193, no. 2, pages 129 - 35 | - BERENDSEN ET AL., EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (2001), vol. 419, no. 1, pages 47 - 54 | - DURHAM, N. ENGL. J. MED., (2004), vol. 350, pages 1073 - 1075 | - GOADSBY ET AL., ANN. NEUROL., (1990), vol. 28, pages 183 - 7 | - LASSEN ET AL., CEPHALALGIA, (2002), vol. 22, pages 54 - 61 | - BRAIN, S. ET AL., TRENDS IN PHARMACOLOGICAL SCIENCES, (2002), vol. 23, pages 51 - 53 | - GOADSBY ET AL., BRAIN, (2002), vol. 125, pages 1392 - 401 | - ARULMANI ET AL., CEPHALALGIA, (2005), vol. 25, pages 1082 - 1090 | - GIFFIN ET AL., CEPHALALGIA, (2003), vol. 23, pages 287 - 292 | - ARULMANI ET AL., EUR. J. PHARMACOL., (2004), vol. 500, pages 315 - 330 | - GOADSBY ET AL., NEW ENGL. J. MED., (2002), vol. 346, no. 4, pages 257 - 275 | - GOADSBY, P.J. ET AL., NEW ENGL. J. MED., (2002), vol. 346, no. 4, pages 257 - 275 | - EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 29, pages 2613 - 2624 | - Methods in Molecular Biology, HUMANA PRESS | - Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, INC. | - Handbook of Experimental Immunology | - KOHLER, MILSTEIN, NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495 | - MCCAFFERTY ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 348, pages 552 - 554 | - VAUGHAN ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 14, pages 309 - 314 | - SHEETS ET AL., PNAS, (1998), vol. 95, pages 6157 - 6162 | - HOOGENBOOM, WINTER, J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 227, page 381 | - MARKS ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 222, page 581 | - COLE ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies and Cancer Therapy, ALAN R. LISS, (1985), page 77 | - BOERNER ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 147, no. 1, pages 86 - 95 | - AL-LAZIKANI ET AL., J. MOLEC. BIOL., (1997), vol. 273, pages 927 - 948 | - RAVETCH, KINET, ANN. REV. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 9, pages 457 - 92 | - CAPEL ET AL., IMMUNOMETHODS, (1994), vol. 4, pages 25 - 34 | - DE HAAS ET AL., J. LAB. CLIN. MED., (1995), vol. 126, pages 330 - 41 | - GUYER ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1976), vol. 117, page 587 | - KIM ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 24, page 249 | - GAZZANO-SANTORO ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1996), vol. 202, page 163 | - CLYNES ET AL., PNAS, (1998), vol. 95, pages 652 - 656 | - EPSTEIN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1985), vol. 82, page 3688 | - HWANG ET AL., PROC. NATL ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, page 4030 | - GOADSBY ET AL., N. ENGL. J. MED., (2002), vol. 346, pages 257 - 270 | - TAN ET AL., CLIN. SCI., (1995), vol. 89, pages 565 - 73 | - PLOURDE ET AL., PEPTIDES, (1993), vol. 14, pages 1225 - 1229 | - EUR. J. LMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 29, pages 2613 - 2624 | - KARLSSON, R. ROOS, H. FAGERSTAM, L. PETERSSON, B., METHODS ENZYMOLOGY, (1994), vol. 6, pages 99 - 110 | - KOHLER, B., MILSTEIN, C., NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, pages 495 - 497 | - BUCK, D. W. ET AL., IN VITRO, (1982), vol. 18, pages 377 - 381 | - WINTER ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 349, pages 293 - 299 | - LOBUGLIO ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 4220 - 4224 | - SHAW ET AL., J IMMUNOL., (1987), vol. 138, pages 4534 - 4538 | - BROWN ET AL., CANCER RES., (1987), vol. 47, pages 3577 - 3583 | - RIECHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, pages 323 - 327 | - VERHOEYEN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, pages 1534 - 1536 | - JONES ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 321, pages 522 - 525 | - DAUGHERTY ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1991), vol. 19, pages 2471 - 2476 | - WINTER ET AL., ANNU. REV. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 12, pages 433 - 455 | - MCCAFFERTY ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 348, pages 552 - 553 | - JOHNSON, KEVIN S., CHISWELL, DAVID J., CURRENT OPINION IN STRUCTURAL BIOLOGY, (1993), vol. 3, pages 564 - 571 | - CLACKSON ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 352, pages 624 - 628 | - MARK ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 222, pages 581 - 597 | - GRIFFITH ET AL., EMBO J., (1993), vol. 12, pages 725 - 734 | - MARKS ET AL., BIO/TECHNOL., (1992), vol. 10, pages 779 - 783 | - WATERHOUSE ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1993), vol. 21, pages 2265 - 2266 | - PEETERS ET AL., VACCINE, (2001), vol. 19, page 2756 | - LONBERG, N., D. HUSZAR, LNT.REV.LMMUNOL, (1995), vol. 13, page 65 | - POLLOCK ET AL., J LMMUNAL METHODS, (1999), vol. 231, page 147 | - MORRISON ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI., (1984), vol. 81, page 6851 | - ESCOTT ET AL., BR. J. PHARMACOL., (1993), vol. 110, pages 772 - 776 | - REUTER ET AL., FUNCTIONAL NEUROLOGY, (2000), page 3 | - FINDEIS ET AL., TRENDS BIOTECHNOL., (1993), vol. 11, page 202 | - WU ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1988), vol. 263, page 621 | - WU ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, page 542 | - ZENKE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, page 3655 | - WU ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1991), vol. 266, page 338 | - JOLLY, CANCER GENE THERAPY, (1994), vol. 1, page 51 | - KIMURA, HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1994), vol. 5, page 845 | - CONNELLY, HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1995), vol. 1, page 185 | - KAPLITT, NATURE GENETICS, (1994), vol. 6, page 148 | - CURIEL, HUM. GENE THER., (1992), vol. 3, page 147 | - WU, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1989), vol. 264, page 16985 | - PHILIP, MOL. CELL BIOL., (1994), vol. 14, page 2411 | - WOFFENDIN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1994), vol. 91, page 1581 | - BIRD ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 423 - 426 | - HOLLIGER, P. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448 | - POLJAK, R. J. ET AL., STRUCTURE, (1994), vol. 2, pages 1121 - 1123 | - SURESH ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1986), vol. 121, page 210 | - MILLSTEIN, CUELLO, NATURE, (1983), vol. 305, pages 537 - 539 | - JEFFERIS, LUND, CHEM. IMMUNOL., (1997), vol. 65, pages 111 - 128 | - WRIGHT, MORRISON, TIBTECH, (1997), vol. 15, pages 26 - 32 | - BOYD ET AL., MOL. IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 32, pages 1311 - 1318 | - WITTWE, HOWARD, BIOCHEM., (1990), vol. 29, pages 4175 - 4180 | - WYSS, WAGNER, CURRENT OPIN. BIOTECH., (1996), vol. 7, pages 409 - 416 | - UMANA ET AL., MATURE BIOTECH., (1999), vol. 17, pages 176 - 180 | - HSE ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, pages 9062 - 9070 | - MORGAN ET AL., IMMUNOLOGY, (1995), vol. 86, pages 319 - 324 | - LUND ET AL., J. IMMUNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 157, pages 4963 - 9 | - LDUSOGIE, J. IMMUNOLOGY, (2000), vol. 164, pages 4178 - 4184 | - TAO ET AL., J. IMMUNOLOGY, (1989), vol. 143, pages 2595 - 2601 | - JEFFERIS ET AL., IMMUNOLOGICAL REVIEWS, (1998), vol. 163, pages 59 - 76 | - MARKS ET AL., BIOFTECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 779 - 783 | - BARBAS ET AL., PROC NAT. ACAD. SCI, (1994), vol. 91, pages 3809 - 3813 | - SCHIER ET AL., GENE, (1995), vol. 169, pages 147 - 155 | - YELTON ET AL., J, IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 155, pages 1994 - 2004 | - JACKSON ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 154, no. 7, pages 3310 - 9 | - HAWKINS ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 226, pages 889 - 896 | - BALINT ET AL., GENE, (1993), vol. 137, no. 1, pages 109 - 18 | - "A model of evolutionary change in proteins - Matrices for detecting distant relationships", DAYHOFF, M.O., Atlas of Protein Sequence and Structure, NATIONAL BIOMEDICAL RESEARCH FOUNDATION, (1978), vol. 5, pages 345 - 358 | - "Unified Approach to Alignment and Phylogenes", HEIN J., Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, INC., (1990), vol. 183, pages 626 - 645 | - HIGGINS, D.G., SHARP, P.M., CABIOS, (1989), vol. 5, pages 151 - 153 | - MYERS, E.W., MULLER W., CABIOS, (1988), vol. 4, pages 11 - 17 | - ROBINSON, E.D., COMB. THEOR., (1971), vol. 11, page 105 | - SANTOU, N., NES, M., MOL. BIOL. EVOL., (1987), vol. 4, pages 406 - 425 | - WILBUR, W.J., LIPMAN, D.J., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1983), vol. 80, pages 726 - 730 | - GEERLIGS HJ ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1989), vol. 124, pages 95 - 102 | - KENNEY JS ET AL., J. LMMUNOL. METHODS, (1989), vol. 121, pages 157 - 166 | - WICHER K ET AL., INT. ARCH. ALLERGY APPL, IMMUNOL., (1989), vol. 89, pages 128 - 135 | - ZIMMERMANN ET AL., PEPTIDES, (1995), vol. 16, pages 421 - 4 | - MALLEE ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, pages 14294 - 8 | - TAN ET AL., CLIN. SCI., (1995), vol. 89, pages 656 - 73 | - BARBAS, Phage display: a laboratory manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (2001), page 2.10 | - WILLIAMSON ET AL., CEPHALALGIA, (1997), vol. 17, no. 4, pages 518 - 24 | - SIPE ET AL., BRAIN RES., (2004), vol. 1028, no. 2, pages 191 - 202 | - MERCHENTHALER ET AL., MATURITAS, (1998), vol. 30, pages 307 - 316 | - KATOVICH ET AL., BRAIN RES., (1989), vol. 494, pages 85 - 94 | - SIMPKINS ET AL., LIFE SCIENCES, (1983), vol. 32, pages 1957 - 1966 | GB19980009951 | WO1999GB01441 |