Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2388946

EP2388946 - Apparatus and method for providing HARQ in a wireless communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/47]Apparatus and method for providing HARQ for ranging in a wireless communication system
[2018/46]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.10.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.09.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT
published on 15.01.2020 [2020/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR
[2012/39]
Former [2011/47]For all designated states
SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Son, Yeong-Moon
No. 203-1302, Taeyeong Desian APT
Yeongdeok-dong
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / Jang, Jae-Hyuk
No.106-503, Sinmaetan Weve Haneulchae APT
Maetan 3-dong
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
03 / Shim, Jae-Jeong
No. 203-1304, Jeongdeunmaneul Donga 2 Danji APT
Jeongja-dong
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2011/47]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2019/14]
Former [2011/47]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date11166824.020.05.2011
[2011/47]
Priority number, dateKR2010004779823.05.2010         Original published format: KR 20100047798
KR2010005902722.06.2010         Original published format: KR 20100059027
[2011/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2388946
Date:23.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2388946
Date:05.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2388946
Date:03.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04L1/18
[2011/47]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/33]
Former [2011/47]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Bereitstellung von HARQ in einem drahtlosen Kommunikationssystem[2018/46]
English:Apparatus and method for providing HARQ in a wireless communication system[2018/46]
French:Appareil et procédé pour fournir HARQ dans un système de communication sans fil[2018/46]
Former [2011/47]Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Bereitstellung von HARQ zur Verwendung in einem drahtlosen Kommunikationssystem
Former [2011/47]Apparatus and method for providing HARQ for ranging in a wireless communication system
Former [2011/47]Appareil et procédé pour fournir un HARQ de télémétrie dans un système de communication sans fil
Examination procedure20.05.2011Date on which the examining division has become responsible
03.07.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/33]
07.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.10.2018
11.10.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
23.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.11.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
03.12.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.02.2019Fee for grant paid
20.02.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.02.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.09.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
29.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
23.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL03.04.2019
AT03.04.2019
CZ03.04.2019
ES03.04.2019
FI03.04.2019
HR03.04.2019
LT03.04.2019
LV03.04.2019
NL03.04.2019
PL03.04.2019
RS03.04.2019
SE03.04.2019
BG03.07.2019
NO03.07.2019
GR04.07.2019
PT03.08.2019
[2020/03]
Former [2019/52]AL03.04.2019
CZ03.04.2019
ES03.04.2019
FI03.04.2019
HR03.04.2019
LT03.04.2019
LV03.04.2019
NL03.04.2019
PL03.04.2019
RS03.04.2019
SE03.04.2019
BG03.07.2019
NO03.07.2019
GR04.07.2019
PT03.08.2019
Former [2019/51]AL03.04.2019
CZ03.04.2019
ES03.04.2019
FI03.04.2019
HR03.04.2019
LT03.04.2019
LV03.04.2019
NL03.04.2019
RS03.04.2019
SE03.04.2019
BG03.07.2019
NO03.07.2019
GR04.07.2019
PT03.08.2019
Former [2019/50]AL03.04.2019
CZ03.04.2019
ES03.04.2019
FI03.04.2019
HR03.04.2019
LT03.04.2019
LV03.04.2019
NL03.04.2019
RS03.04.2019
SE03.04.2019
NO03.07.2019
GR04.07.2019
PT03.08.2019
Former [2019/49]AL03.04.2019
CZ03.04.2019
ES03.04.2019
FI03.04.2019
HR03.04.2019
LT03.04.2019
NL03.04.2019
SE03.04.2019
NO03.07.2019
PT03.08.2019
Former [2019/48]ES03.04.2019
FI03.04.2019
LT03.04.2019
NL03.04.2019
SE03.04.2019
NO03.07.2019
PT03.08.2019
Former [2019/47]ES03.04.2019
FI03.04.2019
LT03.04.2019
NL03.04.2019
NO03.07.2019
Former [2019/44]NL03.04.2019
Documents cited:Search[YA]CN101400144  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 1-3,5-7,9-15 * figure 2 * * pages 14-17 * [A] 4,8;
 [Y]US2007104177  (HWANG DONG-OH [KR] ET AL) [Y] 1-3,5-7,9-15 * figures 3, 4 * * paragraphs [0013] - [0014] * * paragraphs [0022] - [0031] * * paragraphs [0049] - [0059] * * abstract *;
 [A]US2008298315  (IHM BIN CHUL [KR] ET AL) [A] 1,3,7,9 * paragraph [0021] *;
 [A]KR20080081118  (POSDATA CO LTD [KR]) [A] 4,8 * paragraph [0050] *