Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2361504

EP2361504 - Combinations of 4-bromo-2-(4-chlorophenyl)-5-(trifluoromethyl)-1H-pyrrole-3-carbonitrile and metal compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.12.2012
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
09.04.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Janssen Pharmaceutica NV
Turnhoutseweg 30
2340 Beerse / BE
[2011/35]
Inventor(s)01 / Kempen, Tony Mathilde Jozef
c/o Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V.
Turnhoutseweg 30
2340 Beerse / BE
 [2011/35]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2013/05]Verberckmoes, Filip Gerard
Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V.
J&J Patent Law Department
Turnhoutseweg 30
2340 Beerse / BE
Former [2011/35]Verberckmoes, Filip Gerard
Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V., J&J Patent Law Department, Turnhoutseweg 30
2340 Beerse / BE
Application number, filing date11166915.631.01.2007
[2011/35]
Priority number, dateEP2006010112401.02.2006         Original published format: EP 06101124
[2011/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2361504
Date:31.08.2011
Language:EN
[2011/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2361504
Date:28.03.2012
Language:EN
[2012/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2361504
Date:30.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.02.2012
ClassificationInternational:A01N43/36, A01N59/20, A01P9/00, A01P13/00, B27K3/52, C02F1/50
[2012/13]
Former International [2011/35]A01N43/36, A01N59/20, A01P9/00, A01P13/00, C09D5/16, B27K3/52, C02F1/50
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/35]
Extension statesAL24.04.2012
BA24.04.2012
HR24.04.2012
MK24.04.2012
RS24.04.2012
TitleGerman:Kombinationen aus 4-Bromo-2-(4-Chlorophenyl)-5-(Trifluoromethyl)-1h-Pyrrol-3-Carbonitril und Metallverbindungen[2011/35]
English:Combinations of 4-bromo-2-(4-chlorophenyl)-5-(trifluoromethyl)-1H-pyrrole-3-carbonitrile and metal compounds[2011/35]
French:Combinaisons de 4-bromo-2-(4-chlorophenyl)-5-(trifluoromethyl)-1h-pyrrole-3-carbonitrile et de composés métalliques[2011/35]
Examination procedure24.04.2012Examination requested  [2012/23]
24.09.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.12.2012Fee for grant paid
17.12.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07712141.6  / EP1981340
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070712141) is  15.06.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.10.2013   
Akzo Nobel Coatings International B.V.
Velperweg 76
6824 BM Arnhem / NL
Opponent's representative
Akzo Nobel IP Department, et al
Velperweg 76
6824 BM Arnhem / NL
 [2013/50]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
09.12.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.06.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.02.2015Date of oral proceedings
19.03.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
19.03.2015Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition01.05.2015Appeal received No.  T0965/15
27.07.2015Statement of grounds filed
20.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
20.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
20.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU31.01.2007
AT30.01.2013
CY30.01.2013
CZ30.01.2013
EE30.01.2013
LT30.01.2013
LV30.01.2013
RO30.01.2013
SI30.01.2013
SK30.01.2013
CH31.01.2013
IE31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
LU31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
BG30.04.2013
IS30.05.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2014/07]AT30.01.2013
CY30.01.2013
CZ30.01.2013
EE30.01.2013
LT30.01.2013
LV30.01.2013
RO30.01.2013
SI30.01.2013
SK30.01.2013
CH31.01.2013
IE31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
BG30.04.2013
IS30.05.2013
Former [2013/52]AT30.01.2013
CY30.01.2013
CZ30.01.2013
EE30.01.2013
LT30.01.2013
LV30.01.2013
RO30.01.2013
SI30.01.2013
SK30.01.2013
CH31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
BG30.04.2013
IS30.05.2013
Former [2013/49]AT30.01.2013
CZ30.01.2013
EE30.01.2013
LT30.01.2013
LV30.01.2013
RO30.01.2013
SI30.01.2013
SK30.01.2013
CH31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
BG30.04.2013
IS30.05.2013
Former [2013/48]AT30.01.2013
EE30.01.2013
LT30.01.2013
LV30.01.2013
SI30.01.2013
CH31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
BG30.04.2013
IS30.05.2013
Former [2013/38]AT30.01.2013
LT30.01.2013
LV30.01.2013
SI30.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
BG30.04.2013
IS30.05.2013
Former [2013/37]AT30.01.2013
LT30.01.2013
SI30.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
BG30.04.2013
IS30.05.2013
Former [2013/36]AT30.01.2013
LT30.01.2013
BG30.04.2013
IS30.05.2013
Former [2013/34]LT30.01.2013
BG30.04.2013
IS30.05.2013
Former [2013/33]LT30.01.2013
Documents cited:Search[AD]WO03039256  (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0831134  (SIGMA COATINGS BV [NL]) [A] 1-15 * page 2, line 3 - line 36 * * page 2, line 55 - page 3, line 17 * * page 4, line 40 - line 47 * * example - *
by applicantEP0312723
 EP0746979
 WO03039256
    - KULL F.C. ET AL., APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY, (1961), vol. 9, pages 538 - 541