blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2390900

EP2390900 - Mass spectrometer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2024
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.02.2023
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.10.2022
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JEOL LTD.
1-2, Musashino 3-chome
Akishima
Tokyo 196-8558 / JP
[2023/11]
Former [2011/48]For all designated states
JEOL Ltd.
1-2, Musashino 3-chome Akishima
Tokyo 196-8558 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Junkei, Kou
c/o JEOL LTD.
1-2 Musashino 3-chome
Akishima-shi
Tokyo 196-8558 / JP
 [2023/11]
Former [2011/48]01 / Junkei, Kou
c/o JEOL LTD
1-2 Musashino 3-chome
Akishima-shi
Tokyo 196-8558 / JP
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[2023/11]
Former [2014/02]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2011/48]Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al
Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date11167521.125.05.2011
[2011/48]
Priority number, dateJP2010011916925.05.2010         Original published format: JP 2010119169
[2011/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2390900
Date:30.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2390900
Date:04.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2390900
Date:15.03.2023
Language:EN
[2023/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.09.2017
ClassificationIPC:H01J49/42, H01J49/00
[2017/40]
CPC:
H01J49/4215 (EP,US); H01J49/0031 (EP,US); H01J49/004 (EP,US);
H01J49/422 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2011/48]H01J49/42
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/20]
Former [2011/48]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Massenspektrometer[2011/48]
English:Mass spectrometer[2011/48]
French:Spectromètre de masse[2011/48]
Examination procedure25.05.2011Date on which the examining division has become responsible
04.04.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.04.2018Examination requested  [2018/20]
28.02.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.07.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2022Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.01.2023Fee for grant paid
30.01.2023Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.01.2023Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.02.2020
Opposition(s)18.12.2023No opposition filed within time limit [2024/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
26.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
23.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
24.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
25.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
23.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
30.03.2020Renewal fee patent year 10
18.05.2021Renewal fee patent year 11
25.05.2022Renewal fee patent year 12
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.03.2023
CZ15.03.2023
DK15.03.2023
EE15.03.2023
ES15.03.2023
FI15.03.2023
HR15.03.2023
IT15.03.2023
LT15.03.2023
LV15.03.2023
MC15.03.2023
NL15.03.2023
PL15.03.2023
RO15.03.2023
RS15.03.2023
SE15.03.2023
SI15.03.2023
SK15.03.2023
SM15.03.2023
IE25.05.2023
LU25.05.2023
BE31.05.2023
CH31.05.2023
FR31.05.2023
LI31.05.2023
NO15.06.2023
GR16.06.2023
IS15.07.2023
PT17.07.2023
[2024/26]
Former [2024/24]AT15.03.2023
CZ15.03.2023
DK15.03.2023
EE15.03.2023
ES15.03.2023
FI15.03.2023
HR15.03.2023
LT15.03.2023
LV15.03.2023
MC15.03.2023
NL15.03.2023
PL15.03.2023
RO15.03.2023
RS15.03.2023
SE15.03.2023
SI15.03.2023
SK15.03.2023
SM15.03.2023
IE25.05.2023
LU25.05.2023
BE31.05.2023
CH31.05.2023
FR31.05.2023
LI31.05.2023
NO15.06.2023
GR16.06.2023
IS15.07.2023
PT17.07.2023
Former [2024/21]AT15.03.2023
CZ15.03.2023
DK15.03.2023
EE15.03.2023
ES15.03.2023
FI15.03.2023
HR15.03.2023
LT15.03.2023
LV15.03.2023
MC15.03.2023
NL15.03.2023
PL15.03.2023
RO15.03.2023
RS15.03.2023
SE15.03.2023
SI15.03.2023
SK15.03.2023
SM15.03.2023
IE25.05.2023
LU25.05.2023
CH31.05.2023
LI31.05.2023
NO15.06.2023
GR16.06.2023
IS15.07.2023
PT17.07.2023
Former [2024/10]AT15.03.2023
CZ15.03.2023
DK15.03.2023
EE15.03.2023
ES15.03.2023
FI15.03.2023
HR15.03.2023
LT15.03.2023
LV15.03.2023
MC15.03.2023
NL15.03.2023
PL15.03.2023
RO15.03.2023
RS15.03.2023
SE15.03.2023
SI15.03.2023
SK15.03.2023
SM15.03.2023
LU25.05.2023
CH31.05.2023
LI31.05.2023
NO15.06.2023
GR16.06.2023
IS15.07.2023
PT17.07.2023
Former [2024/09]AT15.03.2023
CZ15.03.2023
DK15.03.2023
EE15.03.2023
ES15.03.2023
FI15.03.2023
HR15.03.2023
LT15.03.2023
LV15.03.2023
MC15.03.2023
NL15.03.2023
PL15.03.2023
RO15.03.2023
RS15.03.2023
SE15.03.2023
SK15.03.2023
SM15.03.2023
LU25.05.2023
CH31.05.2023
LI31.05.2023
NO15.06.2023
GR16.06.2023
IS15.07.2023
PT17.07.2023
Former [2024/08]AT15.03.2023
CZ15.03.2023
EE15.03.2023
ES15.03.2023
FI15.03.2023
HR15.03.2023
LT15.03.2023
LV15.03.2023
MC15.03.2023
NL15.03.2023
PL15.03.2023
RO15.03.2023
RS15.03.2023
SE15.03.2023
SK15.03.2023
SM15.03.2023
LU25.05.2023
NO15.06.2023
GR16.06.2023
IS15.07.2023
PT17.07.2023
Former [2023/50]AT15.03.2023
CZ15.03.2023
EE15.03.2023
ES15.03.2023
FI15.03.2023
HR15.03.2023
LT15.03.2023
LV15.03.2023
NL15.03.2023
PL15.03.2023
RO15.03.2023
RS15.03.2023
SE15.03.2023
SK15.03.2023
SM15.03.2023
NO15.06.2023
GR16.06.2023
IS15.07.2023
PT17.07.2023
Former [2023/49]AT15.03.2023
CZ15.03.2023
EE15.03.2023
ES15.03.2023
FI15.03.2023
HR15.03.2023
LT15.03.2023
LV15.03.2023
NL15.03.2023
RO15.03.2023
RS15.03.2023
SE15.03.2023
SM15.03.2023
NO15.06.2023
GR16.06.2023
PT17.07.2023
Former [2023/48]AT15.03.2023
EE15.03.2023
ES15.03.2023
FI15.03.2023
HR15.03.2023
LT15.03.2023
LV15.03.2023
NL15.03.2023
RS15.03.2023
SE15.03.2023
SM15.03.2023
NO15.06.2023
GR16.06.2023
PT17.07.2023
Former [2023/46]ES15.03.2023
FI15.03.2023
HR15.03.2023
LT15.03.2023
LV15.03.2023
NL15.03.2023
RS15.03.2023
SE15.03.2023
SM15.03.2023
NO15.06.2023
GR16.06.2023
PT17.07.2023
Former [2023/38]FI15.03.2023
HR15.03.2023
LT15.03.2023
LV15.03.2023
NL15.03.2023
RS15.03.2023
SE15.03.2023
NO15.06.2023
GR16.06.2023
Former [2023/37]FI15.03.2023
HR15.03.2023
LT15.03.2023
LV15.03.2023
RS15.03.2023
SE15.03.2023
NO15.06.2023
GR16.06.2023
Former [2023/36]FI15.03.2023
HR15.03.2023
LT15.03.2023
LV15.03.2023
RS15.03.2023
SE15.03.2023
NO15.06.2023
Former [2023/35]HR15.03.2023
LT15.03.2023
RS15.03.2023
NO15.06.2023
Former [2023/34]LT15.03.2023
RS15.03.2023
Former [2023/33]LT15.03.2023
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2003071206  (BELOV MIKHAIL [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7-10,18 * paragraphs [0025] - [0029]; figures 1,2,7 * [I] 3-6,11-18;
 [A]US2008142706  (MICHELMANN KARSTEN [DE]) [A] 1-18* the whole document *;
 [XAI]GB2445169  (THERMO ELECTRON [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,7-10,12 * page 12, line 21 - page 15, line 18; figure 1 * [A] 6,18 [I] 3-5,11,13-17
ExaminationUS2009302215
by applicantUS4963736
 US5248875
 US6111250
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.