Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2391093

EP2391093 - Electronic device and method of controlling the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.08.2016
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[2015/26]
Former [2012/36]For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
20, Yeouido-Dong Yeongdeungpo-Gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
Former [2011/48]For all designated states
LG Electronics
20 Yeouido-dong, Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul
150-721 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Kang, Minhun
c/o LG ELECTRONICS INC.IP GROUP 327-23
Kasan-dong, Kumchon-gu
153-801 Seoul / KR
 [2011/48]
Representative(s)Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
[2015/40]
Former [2013/20]Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Former [2011/48]TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR
Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date11167844.727.05.2011
[2011/48]
Priority number, dateKR2010005000428.05.2010         Original published format: KR 20100050004
[2011/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2391093
Date:30.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2391093
Date:11.01.2012
Language:EN
[2012/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2391093
Date:30.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.12.2011
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/08, G06F3/14
[2012/02]
Former International [2011/48]H04L29/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/40]
Former [2011/48]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Elektronische Vorrichtung und Steuerungsverfahren dafür[2011/48]
English:Electronic device and method of controlling the same[2011/48]
French:Dispositif électronique et son procédé de contrôle[2011/48]
Examination procedure10.07.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.07.2012Examination requested  [2012/34]
11.05.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.08.2015Fee for grant paid
19.08.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.08.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.05.2015
Opposition(s)01.07.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
21.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.05.2011
AL30.09.2015
AT30.09.2015
BE30.09.2015
BG30.09.2015
CY30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
DK30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
MC30.09.2015
MK30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SI30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
SM30.09.2015
TR30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
IE27.05.2016
LU27.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
MT31.05.2016
[2018/47]
Former [2018/38]HU27.05.2011
AT30.09.2015
BE30.09.2015
BG30.09.2015
CY30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
DK30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
MC30.09.2015
MK30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SI30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
SM30.09.2015
TR30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
IE27.05.2016
LU27.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
MT31.05.2016
Former [2018/31]HU27.05.2011
AT30.09.2015
BE30.09.2015
CY30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
DK30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
MC30.09.2015
MK30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SI30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
SM30.09.2015
TR30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
IE27.05.2016
LU27.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
MT31.05.2016
Former [2018/29]HU27.05.2011
AT30.09.2015
BE30.09.2015
CY30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
DK30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
MC30.09.2015
MK30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SI30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
SM30.09.2015
TR30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
IE27.05.2016
LU27.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
Former [2018/28]HU27.05.2011
AT30.09.2015
BE30.09.2015
CY30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
DK30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
MC30.09.2015
MK30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SI30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
SM30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
IE27.05.2016
LU27.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
Former [2017/38]AT30.09.2015
BE30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
DK30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SI30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
IE27.05.2016
LU27.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
Former [2017/07]AT30.09.2015
BE30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
DK30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SI30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
LU27.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
Former [2017/04]AT30.09.2015
BE30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
DK30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SI30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
LU27.05.2016
Former [2017/03]AT30.09.2015
BE30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
DK30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SI30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
Former [2016/49]AT30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
DK30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SI30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/39]AT30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
DK30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/37]AT30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/24]AT30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
Former [2016/23]CZ30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
Former [2016/22]CZ30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
Former [2016/21]ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
Former [2016/20]ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
Former [2016/10]FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
Former [2016/09]FI30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
Former [2016/08]LT30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
Former [2016/07]LT30.09.2015
Documents cited:Search[X]US2008311894  (KLEIN THIERRY E [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 8 * * paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0126] - paragraph [0127] *;
 [A]US2007124474  (MARGULIS NEAL D [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1,4 * * paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0086] *
 [X]  - NORMAN P COLEMAN, "Combat Decision Aid Software (CDAS) For Network Centric Warfare/Effects Based Fires", INTERNET CITATION, (2004), pages 1 - 20, URL: http://www.dtic.mil/ndia/2004armaments/DayII/SessionI/12_Coleman_Netw ork_Centric_Warfare.pdf, (20081209), XP002507447 [X] 1-15 * page 1 * * page 5 - page 6 * * page 10 *
by applicantKR20100050004