Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2391093 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2391093



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 297
03.08.2016 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
30.09.2015 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
03.09.2015 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
19.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.08.2015 French translation of claims Search / examination 8
19.08.2015 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
19.08.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
15.07.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
26.05.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
19.05.2015 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 1
11.05.2015 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
11.05.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
11.05.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
11.05.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
11.05.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 65
07.04.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
11.12.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
21.08.2014 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.08.2014 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
18.03.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
07.08.2012 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 1
02.08.2012 Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant Search / examination 1
26.07.2012 Request for correction Search / examination 1
24.07.2012 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
20.07.2012 Request for correction Search / examination 3
10.07.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
10.07.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
10.07.2012 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
10.07.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
10.07.2012 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
16.01.2012 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
14.12.2011 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
14.12.2011 European search opinion Search / examination 3
14.12.2011 European search report Search / examination 2
03.11.2011 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
01.08.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 85
27.05.2011 Abstract Search / examination 1
27.05.2011 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
27.05.2011 Claims Search / examination 5
27.05.2011 Description Search / examination 33
27.05.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
27.05.2011 Drawings Search / examination 26
27.05.2011 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4