Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2391093


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
19.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
17.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
13.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.08.2018  [2018/33]
06.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.08.2018  [2018/32]
29.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
15.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.07.2018  [2018/29]
08.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.07.2018  [2018/28]
18.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.09.2017  [2017/38]
13.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
23.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.01.2017  [2017/04]
16.12.2016 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
04.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
26.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.09.2016  [2016/39]
12.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.09.2016  [2016/37]
05.08.2016 No opposition filed within time limit published on  07.09.2016  [2016/36]
20.05.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.06.2016  [2016/25]
13.05.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.06.2016  [2016/24]
06.05.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.06.2016  [2016/23]
29.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.06.2016  [2016/22]
22.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.05.2016  [2016/21]
15.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.05.2016  [2016/20]
12.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.03.2016  [2016/11]
05.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.03.2016  [2016/10]
29.01.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.03.2016  [2016/09]
22.01.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.02.2016  [2016/08]
15.01.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.02.2016  [2016/07]
28.08.2015 (Expected) grant published on  30.09.2015  [2015/40]
21.08.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
21.08.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
19.08.2015 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
26.05.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.05.2015 Change - applicant published on  24.06.2015  [2015/26]
11.05.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
01.04.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.06.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.04.2013 Change - representative published on  15.05.2013  [2013/20]
03.08.2012 Change - applicant published on  05.09.2012  [2012/36]
20.07.2012 Request for examination filed published on  22.08.2012  [2012/34]
18.07.2012 Amendment by applicant
09.12.2011 Publication of search report published on  11.01.2012  [2012/02]
09.12.2011 Change - classification published on  11.01.2012  [2012/02]
09.12.2011 Change - classification published on  11.01.2012  [2012/02]
30.11.2011 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  30.11.2011  [2011/48]