Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2391093 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201110147867 EP11167844



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9081477Global Dossier 14.07.2015B2
US2011296339 01.12.2011A1
Priority number Date
KR20100050004 28.05.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR101690232BGlobal Dossier 27.12.2016B1
KR20110130603 06.12.2011A
Priority number Date
KR20100050004 28.05.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN102262503BGlobal Dossier 13.08.2014B
CN102262503 30.11.2011A
Priority number Date
KR20100050004 28.05.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2391093Global Dossier 30.09.2015B1
EP2391093 11.01.2012A3
EP2391093 30.11.2011A2
Priority number Date
KR20100050004 28.05.2010