blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2420541 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2420541



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 914
14.01.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.01.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.01.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
08.01.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.01.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.01.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.01.2019 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
02.01.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.01.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.01.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.01.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.12.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
18.12.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
13.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
13.12.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
13.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
13.12.2018 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
12.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
12.12.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.12.2018 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
10.12.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 27
05.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
05.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
05.12.2018 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 1
04.12.2018 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 2
03.12.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.12.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
03.12.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
30.11.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.11.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.11.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.11.2018 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
28.11.2018 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.11.2018 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.11.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.11.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.11.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.11.2018 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Opposition 24
15.11.2018 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
15.11.2018 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 2
11.10.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
10.10.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
10.10.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.10.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.10.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.10.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.10.2018 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
05.10.2018 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
05.10.2018 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
05.10.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.10.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.04.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
04.04.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
04.04.2018 Rejection of request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
23.03.2018 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
22.03.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
19.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
19.03.2018 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 28
13.09.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
13.09.2017 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
13.09.2017 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
13.09.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
24.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
20.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
20.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
20.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
20.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
20.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
20.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
20.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
20.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
20.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
20.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
20.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
20.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
20.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
20.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
20.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
20.03.2017 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
20.03.2017 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
20.03.2017 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 14
20.03.2017 Claims Opposition 3
20.03.2017 Claims Opposition 3
20.03.2017 Claims Opposition 3
20.03.2017 Claims Opposition 3
20.03.2017 Claims Opposition 3
20.03.2017 Claims Opposition 3
20.03.2017 Claims Opposition 3
20.03.2017 Claims Opposition 3
20.03.2017 Claims Opposition 3
20.03.2017 Claims Opposition 3
20.03.2017 Claims Opposition 3
20.03.2017 Claims Opposition 3
20.03.2017 Claims Opposition 3
20.03.2017 Claims Opposition 3
20.03.2017 Claims Opposition 3
20.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 3
20.03.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
20.03.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
20.03.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
20.03.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
20.03.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
20.03.2017 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 31
10.11.2016 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
10.11.2016 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
24.10.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.10.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.10.2016 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
30.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
30.09.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
30.09.2016 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
30.09.2016 Notice of opposition Opposition 27
30.09.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
30.09.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 82
30.09.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
30.09.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
30.09.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
30.09.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
30.09.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
30.09.2016 Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure Opposition 30
30.09.2016 Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure Opposition 18
30.12.2015 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
03.12.2015 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
16.09.2015 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
16.09.2015 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
16.09.2015 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
16.09.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
07.05.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
07.05.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
07.05.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
07.05.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 82
12.03.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
07.01.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
17.12.2013 Description Search / examination 11
17.12.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.11.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
21.11.2013 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.11.2013 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.10.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
22.10.2013 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.10.2013 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.08.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
05.08.2013 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.06.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
10.04.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
10.04.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.08.2012 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 3
27.02.2012 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
25.01.2012 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
25.01.2012 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
23.01.2012 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.01.2012 European search opinion Search / examination 1
23.01.2012 European search report Search / examination 3
08.11.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
08.11.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
08.11.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
29.08.2011 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.06.2011 Abstract Search / examination 1
14.06.2011 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
14.06.2011 Description Search / examination 79
14.06.2011 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 4
14.06.2011 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 4
17.05.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 64