blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2420541


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
02.01.2019 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
19.12.2018 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
19.12.2018 Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
19.12.2018 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
07.12.2018 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
30.11.2018 Change - applicant published on  02.01.2019  [2019/01]
30.11.2018 Change - inventor published on  02.01.2019  [2019/01]
23.11.2018 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
23.11.2018 Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
23.11.2018 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
15.10.2018 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
17.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
13.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.08.2018  [2018/33]
06.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.08.2018  [2018/32]
15.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.07.2018  [2018/29]
08.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.07.2018  [2018/28]
30.03.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report in opposition
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
20.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.11.2017  [2017/47]
22.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
12.09.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report in opposition + time limit
21.03.2017 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.03.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.04.2017  [2017/15]
16.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
09.11.2016 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
14.10.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.11.2016  [2016/46]
07.10.2016 Opposition filed published on  09.11.2016  [2016/45]
19.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.09.2016  [2016/38]
12.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.09.2016  [2016/37]
05.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.09.2016  [2016/36]
22.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.08.2016  [2016/34]
20.05.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.06.2016  [2016/25]
13.05.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.06.2016  [2016/24]
15.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.05.2016  [2016/20]
18.12.2015 Change - divisional application(s) published on  20.01.2016  [2016/03]
27.11.2015 (Expected) grant published on  30.12.2015  [2015/53]
03.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.09.2015 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
23.09.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
23.09.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
06.05.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
20.03.2015 Change - German title published on  22.04.2015  [2015/17]
20.03.2015 Change - English title published on  22.04.2015  [2015/17]
20.03.2015 Change - French title published on  22.04.2015  [2015/17]
30.10.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.12.2013 New entry: Reply to examination report
25.11.2013 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
05.11.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.10.2013 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
09.08.2013 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.04.2013 First examination report
09.04.2013 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
30.10.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.09.2012 Amendment by applicant
31.08.2012 Request for examination filed published on  03.10.2012  [2012/40]
22.02.2012 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  22.02.2012  [2012/08]
28.10.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.08.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid