Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2420541

EP2420541 - Methods of coating a food or beverage can [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2012/08]Methods of coating
[2015/17]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.11.2015
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.01.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SWIMC LLC
101 West Prospect Avenue
Cleveland, Ohio 44115 / US
[2019/01]
Former [2012/08]For all designated states
Valspar Sourcing, Inc.
901 3rd Ave. South P.O. Box 1461
Minneapolis, MN 55440-1461 / US
Inventor(s)01 / O'Brian, Robert
163 Ridge Road
Monongahela, PA 15063 / US
02 / Rardon, Daniel E.
5972 Alder Street
Pittsburgh, PA 15232 / US
03 / Spynda, Rachael Ann
135 Weller Drive
Wexford, PA 15090 / US
04 / Bartley, III., George K.
168 Raymond Street
Burgettstown, PA 15021 / US
05 / Evans, Richard H.
1801 St. James Place
Wexford, PA 15090 / US
 [2012/08]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2016/01]
Former [2012/08]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date11169890.818.10.2005
[2012/08]
Priority number, dateUS20040620639P20.10.2004         Original published format: US 620639 P
[2012/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2420541
Date:22.02.2012
Language:EN
[2012/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2420541
Date:30.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/53]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.01.2012
ClassificationInternational:C09D151/08, B65D17/00
[2012/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/01]
Former [2012/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Beschichtung einer Lebensmittel- oder Getränkedose[2015/17]
English:Methods of coating a food or beverage can[2015/17]
French:Procédés de revêtement d'une boite de conserve pour aliments ou une canette pour boissons[2015/17]
Former [2012/08]Beschichtungsverfahren
Former [2012/08]Methods of coating
Former [2012/08]Procédés de revêtement
Examination procedure22.08.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.08.2012Examination requested  [2012/40]
10.04.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
17.12.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.09.2015Fee for grant paid
16.09.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.09.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05825629.8  / EP1819789
Divisional application(s)EP15199749.1  / EP3037488
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.09.2016  06.10.2016  ADMISSIBLE
PPG Indudtries, Inc
One PPG Place
Pittsburgh PA 15272 / US
Opponent's representative
Heiroth, Sebastian, et al
Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/45]
Opponent(s)01  30.09.2016  06.10.2016  ADMISSIBLE
PPG Indudtries, Inc
One PPG Place
Pittsburgh PA 15272 / US
Opponent's representative
Heiroth, Sebastian, et al
Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Braunsberger Feld 29
DE-51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
10.11.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.03.2017Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
19.03.2018Reply to a communication from the opposition division
09.10.2019Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
11.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
11.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
11.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
25.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
25.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
28.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
27.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
27.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.10.2005
BE30.12.2015
BG30.12.2015
CY30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
TR30.12.2015
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
IE18.10.2016
LU18.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
[2018/38]
Former [2018/29]HU18.10.2005
BE30.12.2015
CY30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
TR30.12.2015
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
IE18.10.2016
LU18.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
Former [2018/28]HU18.10.2005
BE30.12.2015
CY30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
IE18.10.2016
LU18.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
Former [2017/51]BE30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
IE18.10.2016
LU18.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
Former [2017/43]BE30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
LU18.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
Former [2017/15]BE30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2017/03]BE30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2016/46]CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2016/38]CZ30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2016/36]CZ30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
GR31.03.2016
Former [2016/34]CZ30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
GR31.03.2016
Former [2016/25]FI30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
GR31.03.2016
Former [2016/24]FI30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
GR31.03.2016
Former [2016/20]LT30.12.2015
Documents cited:Search[Y]US3991216  (CHRISTENSON ROGER M, et al) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [Y]GB1513866  (PPG INDUSTRIES INC) [Y] 1-16 * page 4, line 18 - line 24 * * page 5, line 10 - line 17 * * page 5, line 31 - line 62 * * page 6, line 25 - line 38; example -; claim - *;
 [YD]US4647612  (RANKA AJAY I [US], et al) [YD] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [YD]US4692491  (RANKA AJAY I [US], et al) [YD] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5939482  (KRIESSMANN INGO [AT], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2152065  (INMONT CORP) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4600737  (GEORGALAS NICK [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 1, line 49 - line 51 *
by applicantUS4692491
 US3479310
 US4147679
 US2633458
 US20040620639
OppositionWO2006045017
 EP0389915
 JPH0543830
 JPS5339387
 US4647612
 US5714539
 US4289674
 US4148670
 US2004044117
    - T.A. TURNER, "Canmaking-The Technology of Metal Protection and Decoration", Packaging Technology and Science, (19980000), vol. 11, pages 301 - 302, XP055312178