blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2420542 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2420542



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1181
23.08.2018 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
23.08.2018 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
20.08.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.08.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.08.2018 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
20.08.2018 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
13.08.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
06.08.2018 Clean copy of claims in the opposition procedure Opposition 2
06.08.2018 Clean copy of description pages in the opposition procedure Opposition 16
06.08.2018 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 2
06.08.2018 French translation of claims Opposition 2
06.08.2018 German translation of the claims Opposition 2
06.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
25.04.2018 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
25.04.2018 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
25.04.2018 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
25.04.2018 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
16.04.2018 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
03.11.2017 Refund of fees Appeal 1
24.10.2017 F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition Appeal 1
24.10.2017 F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition Appeal 1
04.09.2017 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
14.08.2017 Withdrawal of an appeal Appeal 1
30.06.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
30.06.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
19.06.2017 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
13.06.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
13.06.2017 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
04.05.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.04.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.04.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.04.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.04.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
03.04.2017 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
03.04.2017 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 13
03.04.2017 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
03.04.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
03.04.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
03.04.2017 Means of redress Opposition 2
03.04.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
03.04.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
03.04.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
03.04.2017 OPPODREX with handwritten amendments Opposition 39
03.04.2017 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
03.04.2017 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 98
03.04.2017 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 18
10.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.03.2017 Clean copy of claims in the opposition procedure Opposition 2
03.03.2017 Clean copy of description pages in the opposition procedure Opposition 16
03.03.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.02.2017 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 19
04.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
23.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
23.12.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 27
22.12.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.12.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.10.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.10.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.10.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.10.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.10.2016 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
13.10.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.10.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.10.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.09.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
27.09.2016 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 2
16.09.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.09.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.09.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.09.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.09.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.09.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.09.2016 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
13.09.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.09.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.08.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
03.08.2016 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 2
01.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.07.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 7
20.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.07.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.07.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.07.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
19.07.2016 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
19.07.2016 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
19.07.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.07.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.10.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
19.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
19.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
19.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
19.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
19.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
19.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
19.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
19.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
19.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
19.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
19.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
19.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
19.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
19.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
19.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
19.10.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
19.10.2015 Claims Opposition 3
19.10.2015 Claims Opposition 3
19.10.2015 Claims Opposition 3
19.10.2015 Claims Opposition 3
19.10.2015 Claims Opposition 3
19.10.2015 Claims Opposition 3
19.10.2015 Claims Opposition 3
19.10.2015 Claims Opposition 3
19.10.2015 Claims Opposition 3
19.10.2015 Claims Opposition 3
19.10.2015 Claims Opposition 3
19.10.2015 Claims Opposition 3
19.10.2015 Claims Opposition 3
19.10.2015 Claims Opposition 3
19.10.2015 Claims Opposition 3
19.10.2015 Claims Opposition 3
19.10.2015 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 26
24.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.08.2015 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
17.08.2015 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
16.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.04.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.04.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
07.04.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
12.03.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
12.03.2015 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
02.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
02.03.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
02.03.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 24
02.03.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
02.03.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.03.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
02.03.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
02.03.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
02.03.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
02.03.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 63
02.03.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 82
02.03.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
02.03.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 46
02.03.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 64
02.03.2015 Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure Opposition 26
07.01.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
28.05.2014 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
02.05.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
28.04.2014 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
08.04.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
08.04.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
08.04.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
08.04.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
28.11.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
28.11.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
28.11.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
28.11.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 82
20.08.2013 Description Search / examination 16
20.08.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.06.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
10.04.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
10.04.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.08.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
22.08.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
27.02.2012 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
08.02.2012 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
25.01.2012 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
25.01.2012 European search opinion Search / examination 1
25.01.2012 European search report Search / examination 3
25.01.2012 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
08.11.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
08.11.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
08.11.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
29.08.2011 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.06.2011 Abstract Search / examination 1
14.06.2011 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
14.06.2011 Description Search / examination 79
14.06.2011 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 4
14.06.2011 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 4
17.05.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 64