blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2420542


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
17.08.2018 Patent maintained (B2 publication) published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
17.08.2018 Change - German title published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
17.08.2018 Change - French title published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
08.08.2018 New entry: Fee for printing new specification paid
24.04.2018 New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
20.04.2018 New entry: Legal effect of interlocutory decision
13.10.2017 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
29.06.2017 Change: Appeal number
20.06.2017 New entry: Appeal number
20.06.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
02.04.2017 New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision
02.04.2017 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.03.2017 Change - German title published on  12.04.2017  [2017/15]
10.03.2017 Change - French title published on  12.04.2017  [2017/15]
24.10.2016 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
10.10.2016 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
12.09.2016 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
05.09.2016 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
05.09.2016 Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
05.09.2016 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
29.07.2016 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
08.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.08.2016  [2016/32]
20.05.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.06.2016  [2016/25]
26.10.2015 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
09.10.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.11.2015  [2015/46]
19.08.2015 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
31.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.09.2015  [2015/36]
10.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.08.2015  [2015/33]
29.05.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.07.2015  [2015/27]
22.05.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.06.2015  [2015/26]
24.04.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.05.2015  [2015/22]
06.04.2015 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
13.03.2015 Opposition filed published on  15.04.2015  [2015/16]
13.02.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.03.2015  [2015/12]
06.02.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.03.2015  [2015/11]
30.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.03.2015  [2015/10]
16.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.02.2015  [2015/08]
05.12.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.01.2015  [2015/02]
14.11.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]
07.11.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
31.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
24.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
17.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.11.2014  [2014/47]
25.04.2014 (Expected) grant published on  28.05.2014  [2014/22]
25.04.2014 Change - German title published on  28.05.2014  [2014/22]
25.04.2014 Change - French title published on  28.05.2014  [2014/22]
23.04.2014 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
15.04.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
15.04.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
27.11.2013 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
05.11.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.11.2013 Change - classification published on  04.12.2013  [2013/49]
01.11.2013 Change - classification published on  04.12.2013  [2013/49]
23.08.2013 New entry: Reply to examination report
12.04.2013 First examination report
09.04.2013 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
30.10.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.09.2012 Amendment by applicant
31.08.2012 Request for examination filed published on  03.10.2012  [2012/40]
22.02.2012 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  22.02.2012  [2012/08]
28.10.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.08.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid