Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2420542

EP2420542 - Article and method of coating [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  17.08.2018
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2018Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 19.09.2018  [2018/38]
17.08.2018Change - German titlepublished on 19.09.2018  [2018/38]
17.08.2018Change - French titlepublished on 19.09.2018  [2018/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Valspar Sourcing, Inc.
901 3rd Ave. South P.O. Box 1461
Minneapolis, MN 55440-1461 / US
[2012/08]
Inventor(s)01 / O'Brian, Robert M.
163 Ridge Road
Monongahela, PA 15063 / US
02 / Rardon, Daniel E.
5972 Alder Street
Pittsburgh, PA 15232 / US
03 / Spynda, Rachael Ann
135 Weller Drive
Wexford, PA 15090 / US
04 / Bartley, III., George K.
168 Raymond Street
Burgettstown, PA 15021 / US
05 / Evans, Richard H.
1801 St. James Place
Wexford, PA 15090 / US
 [2012/08]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2018/38]
Former [2014/22]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Former [2012/08]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date11169891.618.10.2005
[2012/08]
Priority number, dateUS20040620639P20.10.2004         Original published format: US 620639 P
[2012/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2420542
Date:22.02.2012
Language:EN
[2012/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2420542
Date:28.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/22]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP2420542
Date:19.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.01.2012
ClassificationInternational:C09D151/08, B65D17/00, B05D5/00, B65B3/04, C08F2/22, C08F265/00, C08F283/00, C08F291/00, B65D25/14, C09D133/10, C09D151/00, C09D4/06
[2013/49]
Former International [2012/08]C09D151/08, B65D17/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/38]
Former [2012/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Gegenstand und Beschichtungsverfahren[2018/38]
English:Article and method of coating[2012/08]
French:Article et procédé de revêtement[2018/38]
Former [2012/08]Artikeln und Beschichtungsverfahren
Former [2012/08]Articles et procédés de revêtement
Examination procedure22.08.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.08.2012Examination requested  [2012/40]
10.04.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.08.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.04.2014Fee for grant paid
08.04.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.04.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05825629.8  / EP1819789
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.03.2015  09.03.2015  ADMISSIBLE
PPG Industries, Inc.
One PPG Place
Pittsburgh, Pa.15272 / US
Opponent's representative
f & e patent, et al
Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 [2015/16]
07.04.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.10.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.02.2017Date of oral proceedings
03.04.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
03.04.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
14.08.2017Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
25.04.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
06.08.2018Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition13.06.2017Appeal received No.  T1464/17
14.08.2017Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
11.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
11.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
11.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
25.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
25.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
28.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.10.2005
AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
BG28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
IS28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SI28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
TR28.05.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
IE18.10.2014
LU18.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
[2016/32]
Former [2016/25]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
BG28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SI28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
IE18.10.2014
LU18.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
Former [2015/46]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SI28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
IE18.10.2014
LU18.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
Former [2015/36]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SI28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
LU18.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
Former [2015/33]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
LU18.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
Former [2015/27]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
LU18.10.2014
Former [2015/26]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
LU18.10.2014
Former [2015/22]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
IT28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2015/12]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2015/11]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
PL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2015/10]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2015/08]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2015/02]AT28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
GR29.08.2014
PT29.09.2014
Former [2014/51]AT28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
GR29.08.2014
Former [2014/50]CY28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
SE28.05.2014
GR29.08.2014
Former [2014/49]CY28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
Former [2014/48]CY28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
Former [2014/47]CY28.05.2014
Documents cited:Search[YD]US4692491  (RANKA AJAY I [US], et al) [YD] 1-15 * column 4, line 29 - line 37 * * examples F, 17; table I *;
 [Y]US3991216  (CHRISTENSON ROGER M, et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [YD]US4647612  (RANKA AJAY I [US], et al) [YD] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [Y]GB1513866  (PPG INDUSTRIES INC) [Y] 1-15 * page 4, line 18 - line 24 * * page 5, line 10 - line 17 * * page 5, line 31 - line 62 * * page 6, line 25 - line 38; example -; claim - *;
 [A]US5939482  (KRIESSMANN INGO [AT], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2152065  (INMONT CORP) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4600737  (GEORGALAS NICK [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 49 - line 51 *
by applicantUS4692491
 US3479310
 US4147679
 US2633458
 US20040620639
OppositionWO2006045017
 GB2397578
 WO2004090020
 EP0389915
 US4692491
 EP0747442
 US4198330
 EP0308115
 US3705164
    - WO 2006 045017 A1 (DISCLOSURE AS ORIGINALLY FILED OF THE PARENT APPLICATION TO THE CONTESTED PATENT) (27.04.2006), & WO2006045017 A1 00000000
    - US 608620,639 (Priority document)
    - Japanese Patent Application Laid-Open Publication 7-188353 (English translation)(25.07.1995)
    - Japanese Patent Application Laid-Open Publication 7-188 353 (Original)
    - Declaration of Mr. O'Brien