Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2468863

EP2468863 - Therapeutic peptides [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.05.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.06.2013  [2013/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The University of Bristol
Senate House Tyndall Avenue Bristol
BS8 1TH / GB
[2012/26]
Inventor(s)01 / Virji, Mumtaz
The University of Bristol, Department of Pathology and Microbiology
School of Medical Sciences
University Walk
Bristol, BS8 1TD / GB
 [2012/26]
Representative(s)Heaton, Joanne Marie
Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins
1 St. Augustine's Place
Bristol BS1 4UD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/15]Heaton, Joanne Marie
Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place
Bristol BS1 4UD / GB
Former [2012/26]McQueen, Andrew Peter
Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place
Bristol BS1 4UD / GB
Application number, filing date11170229.615.04.2005
[2012/26]
Priority number, dateGB2004000839015.04.2004         Original published format: GB 0408390
GB2004001959403.09.2004         Original published format: GB 0419594
[2012/26]
Previously filed application, dateWO2005GB0146515.04.2005
[2012/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2468863
Date:27.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.05.2012
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/11, C07K14/47, C07K14/705, A61K38/04, A61K38/16, A61K38/17, G01N33/53
[2012/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2012/26]
TitleGerman:Therapeutische Peptide[2012/26]
English:Therapeutic peptides[2012/26]
French:Peptides thérapeutiques[2012/26]
Examination procedure03.01.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/25]
04.02.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2013/25]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05735984.6  / EP1735446
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
26.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
26.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9828333  (THE BOARD OF REGENTS, THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYST; HANSEN, ERIC, J; A) [X] 12-16 * table 7 * * page 12, line 19 - line 21 * [Y] 1-11;
 [XPY]WO2004031236  (UNIV BRISTOL [GB]; VIRJI MUMTAZ [GB]) [XP] 12-16 * claim 1 * [Y] 1-11
 [Y]  - HILL DARRYL J ET AL, "A novel cell-binding mechanism of Moraxella catarrhalis ubiquitous surface protein UspA: Specific targeting of the N-domain of carcinoembryonic antigen-related cell adhesion molecules by UspA1.", MOLECULAR MICROBIOLOGY, (200304), vol. 48, no. 1, ISSN 0950-382X, pages 117 - 129, XP002372059 [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * page 126, column 1, line 45 - line 48 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2958.2003.03433.x
 [A]  - LAFONTAINE ERIC R ET AL, "The UspA1 protein and a second type of UspA2 protein mediate adherence of Moraxella catarrhalis to human epithelial cells in vitro", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (200003), vol. 182, no. 5, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 1364 - 1373, XP002371321 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * * Sequence with AC number Q9KX38 in database TrEMBL,1.10.2000 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JB.182.5.1364-1373.2000
 [A]  - COPE LESLIE D ET AL, "Characterization of the Moraxella catarrhalis uspA1 and uspA2 genes and their encoded products", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (199907), vol. 181, no. 13, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 4026 - 4034, XP002371322 [A] 1-16
 [XPY]  - HILL DARRYL J ET AL, "Carcinoembryonic antigen-related cell adhesion molecule (CEACAM)-binding recombinant polypeptide confers protection against infection by respiratory and urogenital pathogens", MOLECULAR MICROBIOLOGY, (200503), vol. 55, no. 5, ISSN 0950-382X, pages 1515 - 1527, XP002371323 [XP] 12-16 * abstract * * page 1516, column 2, paragraph 2 * * figure 1 * [Y] 1-11

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2958.2005.04487.x
by applicant   - VAN ALPHEN, L.; VAN HAM, S. M., REV MED MICROBIOL, (1994), vol. 5, page 245
    - FOXWELL, A. R. ET AL., MICROBIOL MOL BIOL REV, (1998), vol. 62, page 294
    - VAN ALPHEN, L. ET AL., AM J RESPIR CRIT CARE MED, (1995), vol. 151, page 2094
    - KARALUS, R. ET AL., MICROBES & INFECTION, (2000), vol. 2, page 5
    - KRAFT, M., CLIN CHEST MED, (2000), vol. 21, page 301
    - VIRJI, M. ET AL., MOL MICROBIOL, (1996), vol. 22, page 929
    - VIRJI, M. ET AL., MOL MICROBIOL, (1996), vol. 22, page 941
    - VIRJI, M. ET AL., MOL MICROBIOL, (1999), vol. 34, page 538
    - VIRJI, M. ET AL., MOL MICROBIOL, (2000), vol. 36, page 784
    - HILL, D. ET AL., MOL MICROBIOL, (2001), vol. 39, page 850
    - HAMMARSTRÖM, S., CANCER BIOL, (1999), vol. 9, page 67
    - STEPHENS, D. S., CLIN MICROBIOL REV, (1989), vol. 2, page 104
    - VIRJI, M. ET AL., MOL MICROBIOL, (1991), vol. 5, page 1831
    - ACHTMAN, M., TRENDS MICROBIOL, (1995), vol. 3, page 186
    - MERZ, A. J.; SO,M., ANNU REV CELL DEV BIOL, (2000), vol. 16, page 423
    - WOODS, J. P.; CANNON, J. G., INFECT IMMUN, (1990), vol. 58, page 569
    - WANG, L-F; YU, M., Methods Mol Biol, HUMANA PRESS, (1996), vol. 66, page 269
    - COLMAN-LEMER, Trends Guide, (2000), page 56
    - BEAUCHEMIN, N. ET AL., EXP CELL RES, (1999), vol. 252, pages 243 - 249
    - BOULTON I.C.; GRAY-OWEN S.D., NAT IMMUNOL, (2002), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 229 - 36
    - CHEN T. ET AL., J LEUKOC BIOL, (2001), vol. 70, no. 2, pages 335 - 40
    - LAFONTAINE, E.R. ET AL., J BACTERIOL, (2000), vol. 182, pages 1364 - 1373
    - VIRJI, M., TRENDS IN MICROBIOLOGY, (2001), vol. 9, pages 258 - 259
    - VIRJI, M. ET AL., MOL MICROBIOL, (1995), vol. 18, pages 741 - 754
    - HILL, D.J.; VIRJI, M., MOL MICROBIOL, (2003), vol. 48, pages 117 - 129
    - HOLM, M.M. ET AL., INFECT IMMUN, (2004), vol. 72, pages 1906 - 1913
    - VIRJI, M. ET AL., MICROB PATHOG, (1990), vol. 9, pages 441 - 450
    - LANGERMANN, S. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 276, pages 607 - 611
    - OFEK, I. ET AL., FEMS IMMUNOL MED MICROBIOL, (2003), vol. 38, pages 181 - 191
    - SIMON, P.M. ET AL., INFECT IMMUN, (1997), vol. 65, pages 750 - 757
    - IDANPAAN-HEIKKILI, I. ET AL., J INFECT DIS, (1997), vol. 176, pages 704 - 712
    - KELLY, G.C. ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (1999), vol. 17, pages 42 - 47
    - GAN, B.S. ET AL., J INFECT DIS, (2002), vol. 185, pages 1369 - 1372
    - REID, G.; BURTON, J., MICROBES INFECT, (2002), vol. 4, pages 319 - 324
    - PINYON, R.A. ET AL., J INFECT DIS, (2004), vol. 189, pages 1547 - 1555
    - REID, G. ET AL., TRENDS MICROBIOL, (2001), vol. 9, pages 424 - 428
    - TOLEMAN, M. ET AL., CELL MICROBIOL, (2002), vol. 3, pages 33 - 44
    - BUDT, M. ET AL., BIOL CHEM, (2002), vol. 383, pages 803 - 812