Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2537918

EP2537918 - Consumer products with lipase comprising coated particles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip24.03.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.04.2017  [2017/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
IP Department One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2012/52]
Inventor(s)01 / Lant, Joseph
18 Netherwitton Way
Gosforth
Newcastle upon Tyne NE3 5RP / GB
02 / Souter, Philip Frank
The Nook The Green
Longhorsely
Morpeth, NE65 8UP / GB
03 / Simonsen, Ole
Runebergs Alle 3
2860 Soeborg / DK
04 / Hansen, Carsten Hoerslev
Hasselhaven 2
3500 Vaerloese / DK
05 / Erlandsen, Luise
Midgaard 3
3600 Frederikssund / DK
 [2012/52]
Representative(s)Peet, Jillian Wendy
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited
Whitley Road
Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne
NE12 9TS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/52]Peet, Jillian Wendy
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne
NE12 9TS / GB
Application number, filing date11170618.020.06.2011
[2012/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2537918
Date:26.12.2012
Language:EN
[2012/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.2011
ClassificationInternational:C11D17/00, C11D3/39, C11D3/386
[2012/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verbraucherprodukte mit lipasenhaltigen beschichteten Partikeln[2012/52]
English:Consumer products with lipase comprising coated particles[2012/52]
French:Produits de consommation avec particules enrobées comprenant une lipase[2012/52]
Examination procedure15.10.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.10.2013Examination requested  [2013/47]
13.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.11.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/17]
19.12.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/17]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.07.2016
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
LV, DE, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL
15.10.2013Request for further processing filed
15.10.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.10.2013Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
15.10.2013Request for further processing filed
15.10.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.10.2013Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
15.10.2013Request for further processing filed
15.10.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.10.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
05.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
02.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2009118329  (NOVOZYMES AS [DK]; BORUP FLEMMING [DK]; CALLISEN THOMAS HOENGER [DK];) [I] 1-17 * claim - * * page 13, line 20 - line 23 * * page 5, line 3 - line 10 * * page 6, line 21 - page 7, line 13 * * Examples 2,5,8,9 (Final Coat #2 #3) *
by applicantWO2009019075
 WO2009118329
 US2001031714
 WO9937746
 WO9723606
 WO9528469
 WO9528468
 WO9528466
 EP0390446
 US4106991
 EP0170360
 EP0304441
 EP0304442
 WO9212645
 WO9716076
 WO9739116
 US4016040
 US4713245
 EP0170360
 EP0304332
 EP0304331
 WO9009440
 WO9009428
 WO8908694
 WO8908695
 WO0001793
 EP0304332
 EP0458849
 EP0458845
 WO8707292
 WO9106638
 WO9213030
 WO9307260
 WO9307263
 WO9638527
 WO9616151
 WO0125412
 WO0220746
 WO0228369
 US5879920
 US5324649
 US4689297
 US6348442
 EP0206417
 EP0193829
 DE4344215
 DE4322229
 DE263790
 JPS61162185
 JPS58179492
 WO9707202
 WO0060063
 WO2006090335
 EP0218272
 EP0331376
 GB1372034
 WO9506720
 WO9627002
 WO9612012
 JPS6474992
 WO9116422
 WO03076580
 WO2009007510
 WO9613580
 WO0034450
 WO0192502
 GB1296839
 WO9402597
 WO9418314
 WO9510603
 WO9526397
 WO9623873
 WO9743424
 WO0060060
 WO0166712
 WO2006002643
 WO8906279
 WO8906270
 WO9425583
 WO9219729
 WO9820115
 WO9820116
 WO9834946
 US4435307
 EP0495257
 WO9629397
 WO9812307
 WO9117243
 WO9407998
 WO9117244
 WO02099091
 WO2004053039
 JP2000210081
 WO9902663
 WO0162903
 US6124127
 WO9927083
 WO9927084
 WO0206442
 WO02092741
 WO03095638
 WO9964619
 WO9817767
 US5360569
 US5360568
 US5576282
 US5817614
 WO2005047264
 US5753599
 US6649085
 US4430243
 US5597936
 US5595967
 US7501389
 US6225464
 WO0032601
 EP1109965
 EP1259522
 EP1240378
 EP1240379
 US6306812
 US6326348
 US7208459
 US2009247449
 US6312936
 US5679630
 US4760025
 US7262042
 WO2009021867
 WO2005052161
 WO2005052146
 WO2007044993
 US5352604
 US7153818
 WO9700324
 EP1022334
 WO9623874
 US5856164
 WO9923211
 US6093562
 US6939702
 US2009217464
 US4990280
 US2003087791
 US2003087790
 US2005003983
 US2004048764
 US4762636
 US6291412
 US2005227891
 EP1070115
 US5879584
 US5691297
 US5574005
 US5569645
 US5565422
 US5516448
 US5489392
 US5486303
 US5869438
 WO2004003188
 WO2007001262
    - C. E. CAPES, Handbook of Powder Technology; Particle size enlargement, ELSEVIER, (1980), vol. 1
    - Powdered detergents; Surfactant Science Series, MARCEL DEKKER, (1998), vol. 7 1, pages 140 - 142
    - Powdered detergents; Surfactant Science Series, MARCEL DEKKER, (1998), vol. 71, pages 140 - 142
    - DARTOIS ET AL., BIOCHEMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (1993), vol. 1131, pages 253 - 360
    - H. KONTKANEN ET AL., APP. ENVIRON. MICROBIOLOGY, (2009), pages 2148 - 2157
    - H. KONTKANEN ET AL., ENZYME MICROB TECHNOL., (2006), vol. 39, pages 265 - 273
    - TETRAHEDRON, (1992), vol. 49, no. 2, pages 423 - 38
    - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1987), vol. 28, no. 48, pages 6061 - 6064
    - THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1990), vol. 55, no. 4, pages 1254 - 61
    - JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, (1994), pages 2569 - 70
    - POLISH JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, (2003), vol. 77, no. 5, pages 577 - 590
    - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1994), vol. 35, no. 34, pages 6329 - 30
 DK2002PA00473
 WO2009EP56875
 WO2003DK00456