Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2487607

EP2487607 - Tool for collaborative edit/search of dynamic objects [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.02.2014
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.02.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.03.2014  [2014/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Open Text S.A.
26, Boulevard Royal
2449 Grand Duchy of Luxembourg / LU
[2012/33]
Inventor(s)01 / Deutsch, Keith
263 Glenwood Avenue
Woodside, California / US
02 / Glazer, David
Maddux Drive
Palo Alto, California 94303 / US
03 / Schneider, Ronald
1700 Sunset Boulder
Colorado 80301 / US
04 / Karpel, Leonard
P.O. Box 2507
Lyons, Colorado 80540 / US
05 / Nordman, Michael
214 Jason way
Mountain View, California / US
 [2012/33]
Representative(s)Driver, Virginia Rozanne
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/33]Driver, Virginia Rozanne
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
Application number, filing date11171754.229.08.2001
[2012/33]
Priority number, dateUS20000228853P29.08.2000         Original published format: US 228853 P
[2012/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2487607
Date:15.08.2012
Language:EN
[2012/33]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2487607
Date:27.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.02.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30, G06F15/16, H04L29/06, H04L29/08
[2012/33]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2012/33]
TitleGerman:Werkzeug zum gemeinsamen Bearbeiten/Suchen von dynamischen Objekten[2012/33]
English:Tool for collaborative edit/search of dynamic objects[2012/33]
French:Outil pour modification/recherche collaborative d'objets dynamiques[2012/33]
Examination procedure14.12.2011Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1}
28.09.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/13]
05.11.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2014/13]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP01968235.0  / EP1323054
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010968235) is  29.06.2009
Request for further processing for:The application was refused due to failure to designate an inventor
06.02.2012Request for further processing filed
06.02.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.03.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
28.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
28.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
28.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
28.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
28.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
28.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
28.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
26.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
19.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201212   M06   Fee paid on   26.10.2012
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0898424  (VICOR INC [US] COLLABORATION PROPERTIES INC [US]) [A] 1,17,20 * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0140] * * paragraph [0174] - paragraph [0176] *
 [XAI]  - SHIH-FU CHANG ET AL, "Next-Generation Content Representation, Creation, and Searching for New-Media Applications in Education", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, IEEE. NEW YORK, US, (19980501), vol. 86, no. 5, ISSN 0018-9219, XP011044010 [X] 1,17,20 * abstract * * page 884, column R, paragraph 3 - page 885, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 886, column L, paragraph L * * page 888, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 888, column r, paragraph l - page 889, paragraph 2 * * page 892, left-hand column, last two paragraphs-right hand column, paragraph 1 * * page 893, left-hand column. section "2)Different Search Modalities a)Text-based query" * * page 894, column r, paragraph l - page 895, column r, paragraph 1 * * page 896, column l, paragraph 2 - column r, paragraph 2 * * page 898, column L, paragraph 1 - page 899, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 900, column L, paragraph 2 * [A] 13 [I] 2-12,14-16,18,19
 [XAI]  - VICTOR O K LI ET AL, "Distributed Multimedia Systems", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, IEEE. NEW YORK, US, (19970701), vol. 85, no. 7, ISSN 0018-9219, XP011043869 [X] 1,17,20 * abstract * * page 1064, column R, paragraph L * * page 1075, right-hand column, section "B. Telecooperation"-page 1076, left-hand column, last paragraph * * page 1078, left-haned column, section "C. Hypermedia Applications"-page 1079, left-hand column, first paragraph * * page 1100, column R, paragraph L - page 1102, column L, paragraph 5 * [A] 13 [I] 2-12,14-16,18,19
 [XAI]  - KAESTLE G ET AL, "Sharing experiences from scientific experiments", SCIENTIFIC AND STATISTICAL DATABASE MANAGEMENT, 1999. ELEVENTH INTERNA TIONAL CONFERENCE ON CLEVELAND, OH, USA 28-30 JULY 1999, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19990728), ISBN 978-0-7695-0046-1, pages 168 - 177, XP010348747 [X] 1,17,20 * abstract * * page 1, column r, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3 * * page 2, right-hand column, section "2.1 XML" * * page 5, section "3.2 Approach" * * page 6, section "4 Prototype Implementation" * * page 7, left-hand column, section "4.2 Active Information Dissemination and Filtering"- page 7, right-hand column, first paragraph * * page 8, section "4.3 Querying and Searching" * [A] 13 [I] 2-12,14-16,18,19

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SSDM.1999.787632
by applicantUS20000228853