Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2543653

EP2543653 - Method for manufacturing a matt ceramic [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.03.2014
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
14.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Comadur S.A.
Col-des-Roches 33
2400 Le Locle / CH
[2013/02]
Inventor(s)01 / Boucard, Sylvain
6, route des Fins
25130 Villers-le-Lac / FR
02 / Hawrylko, Jean-Mary
8, rue des Chasaux
25800 Valdahon / FR
 [2013/02]
Representative(s)Goulette, Ludivine , et al
ICB
Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA
Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3
2001 Neuchâtel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2013/02]Couillard, Yann Luc Raymond , et al
ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3
2001 Neuchâtel / CH
Application number, filing date11172580.004.07.2011
[2013/02]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2543653
Date:09.01.2013
Language:FR
[2013/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2543653
Date:23.04.2014
Language:FR
[2014/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.11.2011
ClassificationInternational:C04B41/91, G04B37/22
[2013/02]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/02]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung einer matten Keramik[2013/02]
English:Method for manufacturing a matt ceramic[2013/02]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'une céramique mate non marquante[2013/02]
Examination procedure01.02.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.07.2013Examination requested  [2013/33]
19.08.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.08.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.10.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.12.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.03.2014Fee for grant paid
13.03.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.08.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.01.2015  28.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
G. et F. Châtelain SA
Allée du Laser 18
2300 La Chaux-de-Fonds / CH
Opponent's representative
Saam, Christophe
P&TS SA
Av. J.-J. Rousseau 4
P.O. Box 2848
2001 Neuchâtel / CH
 [2015/10]
27.02.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.07.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.03.2017Date of oral proceedings
26.05.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
26.05.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition11.07.2017Appeal received No.  T1575/17
03.10.2017Statement of grounds filed
10.09.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU04.07.2011
AL23.04.2014
AT23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
ES23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
IT23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
MC23.04.2014
MK23.04.2014
MT23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
RO23.04.2014
RS23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
SI23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
SM23.04.2014
TR23.04.2014
IE04.07.2014
LU04.07.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
BE31.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
GB04.07.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU04.07.2011
AT23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
ES23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
IT23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
MC23.04.2014
MK23.04.2014
MT23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
RO23.04.2014
RS23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
SI23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
SM23.04.2014
TR23.04.2014
IE04.07.2014
LU04.07.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
BE31.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
GB04.07.2015
Former [2016/33]HU04.07.2011
AT23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
ES23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
IT23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
MC23.04.2014
MT23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
RO23.04.2014
RS23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
SI23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
SM23.04.2014
TR23.04.2014
IE04.07.2014
LU04.07.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
BE31.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
GB04.07.2015
Former [2016/32]HU04.07.2011
AT23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
ES23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
IT23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
MC23.04.2014
MT23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
RO23.04.2014
RS23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
SI23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
SM23.04.2014
IE04.07.2014
LU04.07.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
BE31.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
GB04.07.2015
Former [2016/28]AT23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
ES23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
IT23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
MC23.04.2014
MT23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
RO23.04.2014
RS23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
SI23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
SM23.04.2014
IE04.07.2014
LU04.07.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
GB04.07.2015
Former [2016/23]AT23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
ES23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
IT23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
MC23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
RO23.04.2014
RS23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
SI23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
SM23.04.2014
IE04.07.2014
LU04.07.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
GB04.07.2015
Former [2016/22]AT23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
ES23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
IT23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
MC23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
RO23.04.2014
RS23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
SI23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
SM23.04.2014
IE04.07.2014
LU04.07.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
Former [2016/21]AT23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
ES23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
IT23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
MC23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
RO23.04.2014
RS23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
SI23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
IE04.07.2014
LU04.07.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
Former [2015/37]AT23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
ES23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
IT23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
RO23.04.2014
RS23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
SI23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
IE04.07.2014
LU04.07.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
Former [2015/36]AT23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
ES23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
IT23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
RO23.04.2014
RS23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
SI23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
LU04.07.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
Former [2015/18]AT23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
ES23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
IT23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
RO23.04.2014
RS23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
LU04.07.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
Former [2015/13]AT23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
ES23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
RO23.04.2014
RS23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
LU04.07.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
Former [2015/11]AT23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
ES23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
RO23.04.2014
RS23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
Former [2015/10]AT23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
ES23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
RS23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
Former [2015/08]AT23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
ES23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
RS23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
Former [2014/52]AT23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
ES23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
RS23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
Former [2014/51]AT23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
ES23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
Former [2014/50]CY23.04.2014
ES23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
Former [2014/49]CY23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
Former [2014/48]CY23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
Former [2014/47]CY23.04.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]CH696906  (COMADUR SA [CH]) [A] 1-9 * claim - * * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP1840108  (COMADUR SA [CH]) [A] 1-9 * claim - *;
 [A]US2003128903  (YASUDA YOSHITERU [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0025] * * figures 1B, 2B * * example 1 *