Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2549759

EP2549759 - Method and system for facilitating color balance synchronization between a plurality of video cameras as well as method and system for obtaining object tracking between two or more video cameras [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Axis AB
Emdalavägen 14
223 69 Lund / SE
[2013/04]
Inventor(s)01 / Ranbro, Mikael
Långåkravägen 53
241 35 Eslöv / SE
 [2013/04]
Representative(s)AWA Sweden AB
P.O. Box 1066
251 10 Helsingborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [2016/02]Awapatent AB
P.O. Box 1066
251 10 Helsingborg / SE
Former [2013/04]Johansson, Magnus
Awapatent AB
Box 1066
251 10 Helsingborg / SE
Application number, filing date11174494.219.07.2011
[2013/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2549759
Date:23.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2549759
Date:13.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.10.2011
ClassificationInternational:G06T7/40, H04N9/73
[2015/35]
Former International [2013/04]H04N9/73, H04N7/18, G06T7/00, G06K9/64
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/04]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zur Erleichterung der Farbausgleichssynchronisation zwischen mehreren Videokameras und Verfahren und System zum Erhalten einer Gegenstandsnachverfolgung zwischen zwei oder mehr Videokameras[2013/04]
English:Method and system for facilitating color balance synchronization between a plurality of video cameras as well as method and system for obtaining object tracking between two or more video cameras[2013/04]
French:Procédé et système pour faciliter la synchronisation de l'équilibre des couleurs entre une pluralité de caméras vidéo et procédé et système pour obtenir le suivi d'objets entre deux caméras vidéo ou plus[2013/04]
Examination procedure21.08.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.08.2012Examination requested  [2013/04]
24.05.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.06.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.08.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.11.2015Fee for grant paid
13.11.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.11.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.05.2013
Opposition(s)14.10.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
14.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU19.07.2011
AL13.01.2016
AT13.01.2016
BE13.01.2016
CY13.01.2016
CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
MC13.01.2016
MK13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SI13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
SM13.01.2016
TR13.01.2016
BG13.04.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
IE19.07.2016
LU19.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
MT31.07.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU19.07.2011
AT13.01.2016
BE13.01.2016
CY13.01.2016
CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
MC13.01.2016
MK13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SI13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
SM13.01.2016
TR13.01.2016
BG13.04.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
IE19.07.2016
LU19.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
MT31.07.2016
Former [2018/29]HU19.07.2011
AT13.01.2016
BE13.01.2016
CY13.01.2016
CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
MC13.01.2016
MK13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SI13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
SM13.01.2016
TR13.01.2016
BG13.04.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
IE19.07.2016
LU19.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
Former [2018/28]HU19.07.2011
AT13.01.2016
BE13.01.2016
CY13.01.2016
CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
MC13.01.2016
MK13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SI13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
SM13.01.2016
BG13.04.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
IE19.07.2016
LU19.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
Former [2017/41]AT13.01.2016
BE13.01.2016
CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
MC13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SI13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
SM13.01.2016
BG13.04.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
IE19.07.2016
LU19.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
Former [2017/19]AT13.01.2016
BE13.01.2016
CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
MC13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SI13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
SM13.01.2016
BG13.04.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
Former [2017/16]AT13.01.2016
BE13.01.2016
CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
MC13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SI13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
SM13.01.2016
BG13.04.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
Former [2017/03]AT13.01.2016
BE13.01.2016
CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
SM13.01.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
Former [2016/50]AT13.01.2016
CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
SM13.01.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
Former [2016/49]AT13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
Former [2016/46]AT13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
Former [2016/39]AT13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
Former [2016/38]AT13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
Former [2016/36]AT13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
Former [2016/35]ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
Former [2016/30]NL13.01.2016
Documents cited:Search[IY]EP1973074  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1,3-6,8,9,12,15 * the whole document * [Y] 2,7,10,11,13,14;
 [YA]EP1862941  (AXIS AB [SE]) [Y] 2,7,10,11,13,14 * the whole document * [A] 1,3-6,8,9,12,15;
 [A]  - PICCARDI M ET AL, "Track matching over disjoint camera views based on an incremental major color spectrum histogram", PROCEEDINGS. IEEE CONFERENCE ON ADVANCED VIDEO AND SIGNAL BASED SURVEILLANCE, 2005. COMO, ITALY SEPT. 15-16, 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20050915), doi:10.1109/AVSS.2005.1577258, ISBN 978-0-7803-9385-1, pages 147 - 152, XP010881165 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/AVSS.2005.1577258
by applicantUS2010080477
 US7099510
    - C. STAUFFER, W.E.L. GRIMSON, "Adaptive background mixture models for real-time tracking", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION (CVPR, (1999), pages 246 - 252, URL: http://www.ai.mit.edu/projects/vsam/Publications/stauffer-Cvpr98-track.pdf
    - HENRY SCHNEIDERMAN, TAKEO KANADE, A STATISTICAL METHOD FOR 3D OBJECT DETECTION APPLIED TO FACES AND CARS, URL: http://www.cs.cmu.edu/afs/cs.cmu.edu/user/hws/www/CVPROO.pdf