Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2549531

EP2549531 - Lead frame for semiconductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.12.2013
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.12.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.01.2014  [2014/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NXP B.V.
High Tech Campus 60
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
[2013/04]
Inventor(s)01 / Yandoc, Ricardo, L
c/o NXP Semiconductors
IP & L
Betchworth House
57-65 Station Road
Redhil, Surrey RH1 1D / GB
02 / Heyes, David
c/o NXP Semidconductors
IP & L
Betchworth House
57-65 Station Road
Redhill, Surrey RH1 1DL / GB
03 / Lictao, Crispulo, E.
c/o NXP Semiconductors
IP & L
Betchworth House
57-65 Station Road
Redhill, Surrey RH1 1DL / GB
04 / Cacanindin, Wilson
c/o NXP Semiconductors
IP & L
Betchworth House
57-65 Station Road
Redhill, Surrey RH1 1DL / GB
05 / Fenol, Florante, B.
NXP Semicoductors
IP & L
Betchworth House
57-65 Station Road
Redhill, Surrey RH1 1DL / GB
 [2013/04]
Representative(s)Crawford, Andrew
NXP B.V.
Intellectual Property & Licensing
Red Central
60 High Street
Redhill, Surrey RH1 1SH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/04]Crawford, Andrew
NXP Semiconductors
Intellectual Property and Licensing
Red Central
60 High Street
Redhill, Surrey RH1 1SH / GB
Application number, filing date11174865.321.07.2011
[2013/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2549531
Date:23.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.01.2012
ClassificationInternational:H01L23/495
[2013/04]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/04]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Leitungsrahmen für Halbleiterbauelement[2013/04]
English:Lead frame for semiconductor device[2013/04]
French:Cadre de connexion pour dispositif semi-conducteur[2013/04]
Examination procedure24.07.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/04]
29.08.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2014/04]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201303   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XYI]JPS59150458  (TOSHIBA KK) [X] 1-5,9 * abstract * [Y] 6 [I] 7,8;
 [X]JP2007128998  (SHARP KK) [X] 1-5,9 * abstract *;
 [YA]JP2007311829  (RENESAS TECH CORP) [Y] 6 * abstract * [A] 1
by applicantUS6853057