Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2548943

EP2548943 - Clamping insert for cell culture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.03.2017
Database last updated on 20.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.09.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE, LU, SI
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CSEM Centre Suisse d'Electronique et de Microtechnique SA - Recherche et Développement
Rue Jaquet-Droz 1
2002 Neuchâtel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2013/04]For all designated states
CSEM Centre Suisse d'Electronique et de Microtechnique SA - Recherche et Développement
Rue Jaquet-Droz 1
2002 Neuchâtel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Angeloni Suter, Silvia
Rue de la Perrière 2
2002 Neuchâtel / CH
02 / Liley, Martha
Bourguillards 12
2072 Saint-Blaise / CH
 [2013/04]
Representative(s)Gevers SA
Rue des Noyers 11
2000 Neuchâtel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2013/04]GLN SA
Avenue Edouard-Dubois 20
2000 Neuchâtel / CH
Application number, filing date11174937.021.07.2011
[2013/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2548943
Date:23.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2548943
Date:11.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP12.12.2011
ClassificationInternational:C12M1/00, C12M1/12
[2015/52]
Former International [2013/04]C12M3/06, C12M1/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/19]
Former [2013/04]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Klemmeinsatz für Zellkultur[2013/04]
English:Clamping insert for cell culture[2013/04]
French:Insert de serrage pour culture cellulaire[2013/04]
Examination procedure23.07.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.07.2013Examination requested  [2013/35]
20.08.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.12.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.09.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.03.2016Fee for grant paid
24.03.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.03.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.08.2014
Opposition(s)14.02.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
28.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
IE21.07.2016
LU21.07.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
[2017/37]
Former [2017/17]AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/11]AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/10]BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
BE31.07.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/07]DK11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
BE31.07.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/03]ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
BE31.07.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2016/52]ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2008076170  (ANNALA TUIJA [FI], et al) [X] 1,7,9,14 * claims 1-3 * * paragraph [0031] * [Y] 2,8,10-13 [I] 3-6,15;
 [YA]EP0239697  (COSTAR CORP [US]) [Y] 2 * abstract * * figure 2 * [A] 1,3-15;
 [YA]US5795775  (LAHM WILLIAM J [US], et al) [Y] 8 * claims 1-2 * [A] 1-7,9-15;
 [YA]US2008009027  (FRAKER CHRISTOPHER A [US], et al) [Y] 10-12 * claims 1,3 * [A] 1-9,13-15;
 [YA]EP1416042  (KYOKUTO PHARMACEUTICAL IND CO [JP]) [Y] 13 * paragraph [0132] * [A] 1-12,14,15;
 [A]US5652142  (BARKER SUSAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5104804  (HUMPHRIES GILLIAN M K [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5139951  (BUTZ DAVID [MA], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
ExaminationJP2007167002
    1, vol. 2007, no. 48, Database accession no. 2007-490448,
by applicant   MADOU, M. J, Fundamental of Microfabrication and Nanotechnology, CRC PRESS,