Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2416468

EP2416468 - Method for balancing a battery and battery management system implementing such a method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.06.2014
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.06.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.07.2014  [2014/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
E4V
10 Boulevard Jean Mermoz
92200 Neuilly/Seine / FR
[2012/06]
Inventor(s)01 / Bossard, Olivier
43 allée du Sauvignon
33610 CANEJAN / FR
02 / Favot, Adrien
13 allée des Grives
33127 MARTIGNAS SUR JALLES / FR
 [2012/06]
Representative(s)Coquel, Jean-Marc
Schmit-Chretien-Schihin SNC
111, cours de Médoc
CS 40009
F-33070 Bordeaux Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2012/06]Coquel, Jean-Marc
Schmit-Chretien-Schihin SNC 111, cours de Médoc CS 40009
F-33070 Bordeaux Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date11175959.329.07.2011
[2012/06]
Priority number, dateFR2010005647405.08.2010         Original published format: FR 1056474
[2012/06]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2416468
Date:08.02.2012
Language:FR
[2012/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2416468
Date:11.09.2013
Language:FR
[2013/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:H02J7/00, H01M10/44
[2012/06]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Batterieausgleichsverfahren und Steuerungssystem dafür[2012/06]
English:Method for balancing a battery and battery management system implementing such a method[2012/06]
French:Procédé d'équilibrage pour batterie électrique et système de gestion pour batterie mettant en ouvre un tel procédé[2012/06]
Examination procedure01.02.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/28]
10.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/13]
25.02.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2014/28]
11.03.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201303   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2009096419  (WHITE DANIEL J [US], et al) [X] 1,6 * the whole document * [Y] 2,5 [I] 4;
 [A]US6014013  (SUPPANZ BRADLEY J [US], et al) [A] 1,4,6 * abstract * * column 3, line 66 - column 5, line 4; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2002146617  (JOHNSON PHILIP STANLEY [US], et al) [A] 1,4,6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [0020] - [0028] *;
 [Y]US6034506  (HALL JOHN C [US]) [Y] 2 * figure 3 *;
 [Y]US6441583  (PERELLE MICHEL [FR]) [Y] 5 * column 5, line 52 - column 6, line 9; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2009302803  (OH JEON KEUN [KR], et al) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3997830  (NEWELL RICHARD ABBOTT, et al) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6121752  (KITAHARA JUN [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *