Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2422631

EP2422631 - Apparatus and method for chilling or freezing a product [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.04.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK, IT
published on 21.08.2019  [2019/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Linde Aktiengesellschaft
Klosterhofstrasse 1
80331 München / DE
[2012/09]
Inventor(s)01 / Wijlens, Jos
Sperwerlaan 112
4143 AW Leerdam / NL
02 / McCormick, Stephen A.
24 Pebble Ridge Road
Warrington, PA Pennsylvania 18976 / US
 [2012/09]
Representative(s)Hofmann, Andreas , et al
RGTH
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 33 02 11
80062 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/30]Hofmann, Andreas , et al
Richter Werdermann Gerbaulet Hofmann
Patentanwälte
Postfach 33 02 11
80062 München / DE
Former [2013/07]Gellner, Bernd , et al
Linde AG Legal Services Intellectual Property Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Strasse 6-14
82049 Pullach / DE
Former [2012/09]Hofmann, Andreas , et al
Richter Werdermann Gerbaulet Hofmann
Patentanwälte
Postfach 33 02 11
80062 München / DE
Application number, filing date11176030.229.07.2011
[2012/09]
Priority number, dateUS2010087093530.08.2010         Original published format: US 870935
[2012/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2422631
Date:29.02.2012
Language:EN
[2012/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2422631
Date:08.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.11.2011
ClassificationInternational:A23L3/36
[2012/09]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/09]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Kühlen oder Einfrieren von Produkten[2012/09]
English:Apparatus and method for chilling or freezing a product[2012/09]
French:Appareil et procédé de refroidissement ou congélation d'un produit[2012/09]
Examination procedure18.07.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.08.2012Examination requested  [2012/40]
07.12.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.03.2013Fee for grant paid
19.03.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.12.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.12.2013  08.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE
75 Quai d'Orsay
75007 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
KNH Patentanwälte Neumann Heine Taruttis PartG mbB, et al
Postfach 10 33 63
40024 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2019/04]
Former [2015/50]
Opponent(s)01  23.12.2013  08.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE
75 Quai d'Orsay
75007 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
KNH Patentanwälte, et al
Kahlhöfer Neumann Rößler Heine
PartG mbB
Roßstr. 92
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2014/07]
Opponent(s)01  23.12.2013  08.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE
75 Quai d'Orsay
75007 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Mellul-Bendelac, Sylvie Lisette, et al
L'Air Liquide, Service Propriété Intellectuelle, 75, Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
20.03.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.09.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
03.02.2016Date of oral proceedings
16.02.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.02.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition14.04.2016Appeal received No.  T0896/16
24.06.2016Statement of grounds filed
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.07.2011
AL08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
MK08.05.2013
MT08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
RS08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
SM08.05.2013
TR08.05.2013
LU29.07.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
AT29.07.2018
GB29.07.2018
IE29.07.2018
IT29.07.2018
SE30.07.2018
DK31.07.2018
FR31.07.2018
NL01.08.2018
DE01.02.2019
[2019/34]
Former [2019/33]HU29.07.2011
AL08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
MK08.05.2013
MT08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
RS08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
SM08.05.2013
TR08.05.2013
LU29.07.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
AT29.07.2018
GB29.07.2018
IE29.07.2018
SE30.07.2018
FR31.07.2018
NL01.08.2018
DE01.02.2019
Former [2019/23]HU29.07.2011
AL08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
MK08.05.2013
MT08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
RS08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
SM08.05.2013
TR08.05.2013
LU29.07.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
AT29.07.2018
GB29.07.2018
SE30.07.2018
FR31.07.2018
NL01.08.2018
DE01.02.2019
Former [2019/21]HU29.07.2011
AL08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
MK08.05.2013
MT08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
RS08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
SM08.05.2013
TR08.05.2013
LU29.07.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
GB29.07.2018
DE01.02.2019
Former [2018/46]HU29.07.2011
AL08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
MK08.05.2013
MT08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
RS08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
SM08.05.2013
TR08.05.2013
LU29.07.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/34]HU29.07.2011
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
MK08.05.2013
MT08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
RS08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
SM08.05.2013
TR08.05.2013
LU29.07.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/32]BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
MK08.05.2013
MT08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
RS08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
SM08.05.2013
TR08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/24]BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
RS08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
SM08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/20]BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
RS08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2014/14]BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
RS08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/11]BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
RS08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/10]BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RS08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/06]BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RS08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/02]CY08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RS08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/52]CY08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RS08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/51]FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RS08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/50]FI08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RS08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/49]FI08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/48]LT08.05.2013
NO08.08.2013
ES19.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT08.05.2013
NO08.08.2013
PT09.09.2013
Documents cited:Search[XAI]JP2003169596  (HACHIYO ENGNEERING KK; MINAMI SHOKUHIN KK) [X] 1-3,7,15 * abstract * * claims 1,7,8 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0006] - [0007] - [0011] - [0012] - [0016] , [0023] - [0026] - [0029] * [A] 4,5,8-14 [I] 6;
 [XAI]JPH01262763  (MISEKI KK) [X] 1-3,7,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] , [0007] - [0012] - [0021] , [0023] - [0027] - [0029] - [0030] * [A] 4,5,8-14 [I] 6;
 [XA]US6012293  (ANDERSSON BO [SE]) [X] 1-3,6,7,15 * column 1, lines 13-17 * * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 33 * * column 3, lines 8, 42-63 * * column 4, lines 55-56 * * column 5, lines 1-2 * [A] 4,5,8-14;
 [XAI]WO0181843  (TONDEUX PAUL [FR]) [X] 1,3,7,15 * page 1, lines 5-25 * * page 5, lines 5-19 * * page 6, lines 25-30 * * page 7, lines 14-23 * * claim 1 * * figure 1 * [A] 2,4,5,8-14 [I] 6;
 [XAI]FR2792716  (SERAP IND [FR]) [X] 1,3,7,15 * page 1, lines 1-5 * * page 2, lines 16-30 * * page 3, lines 6-26 * * page 4, lines 15-28 * * figures 3-4 * [A] 4,5,8-14 [I] 6;
 [A]US6393859  (OLSSON LENNART [SE] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * column 1, lines 20-54 * * column 3, lines 11-45 *;
 [A]US2006163039  (MARSHALL DUANE [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *