Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2554415

EP2554415 - Roof system for a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.12.2016
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.03.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
11.03.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Inalfa Roof Systems Group B.V.
Maasheseweg 83
5804 AB Venray / NL
[2013/06]
Inventor(s)01 / Nellen, Marcel Johan Christiaan
Vloetweg 15
5815 AR MERSELO / NL
02 / Geurts, Ruud
Mariaplein 12 B3
5988 CJ Helden / NL
 [2013/06]
Representative(s)De Vries & Metman
Overschiestraat 180
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
[2014/09]
Former [2013/06]De Vries & Metman
Overschiestraat 180
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
Application number, filing date11176299.302.08.2011
[2013/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2554415
Date:06.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2554415
Date:26.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.02.2012
ClassificationInternational:B60J7/02, B60J7/043
[2013/06]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/06]
TitleGerman:Dachanordnung für ein Fahrzeug[2013/06]
English:Roof system for a vehicle[2013/06]
French:Système de toit pour véhicule[2013/06]
Examination procedure04.07.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.07.2013Examination requested  [2013/33]
01.10.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.01.2014Fee for grant paid
02.01.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP14155790.0  / EP2740622
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.10.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  14.11.2014  19.11.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Webasto SE
Kraillinger Str. 5
82131 Stockdorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Epping - Hermann - Fischer, et al
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schloßschmidstraße 5
80639 München / DE
 [2014/52]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
12.01.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.07.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
15.12.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
15.12.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition09.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0397/17
12.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
21.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU02.08.2011
AL26.02.2014
AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
MK26.02.2014
MT26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
RS26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
SM26.02.2014
TR26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
GR27.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
IE02.08.2014
LU02.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU02.08.2011
AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
MK26.02.2014
MT26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
RS26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
SM26.02.2014
TR26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
GR27.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
IE02.08.2014
LU02.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
Former [2016/33]HU02.08.2011
AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
MT26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
RS26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
SM26.02.2014
TR26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
GR27.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
IE02.08.2014
LU02.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
Former [2016/32]HU02.08.2011
AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
MT26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
RS26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
SM26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
GR27.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
IE02.08.2014
LU02.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
Former [2016/28]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
MT26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
RS26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
SM26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
GR27.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
IE02.08.2014
LU02.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
Former [2016/22]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
RS26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
SM26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
IE02.08.2014
LU02.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
Former [2015/37]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
RS26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
IE02.08.2014
LU02.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
Former [2015/24]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
RS26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
LU02.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
Former [2015/20]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
RS26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
LU02.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
Former [2015/19]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
RS26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
LU02.08.2014
Former [2015/18]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
RS26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/50]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
RS26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/49]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
RS26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/48]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
RS26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/42]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
RS26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/41]AT26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
RS26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/39]AT26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/37]AT26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/36]LT26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP1790515  (ARVINMERITOR GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,8,9,13 * pages 26,28,29 * * figure 7 * [I] 6,7;
 [AD]US7828376  (NELLEN MARCEL JOHAN CHRISTIAAN [NL]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1741588  (INALFA ROOF SYS GROUP BV [NL]) [A] 1 * figure 5 *
by applicantUS7828376