Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2388437

EP2388437 - Cooling circuit flow path for a turbine section airfoil [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.12.2012
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
10.04.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
United Technologies Corporation
10 Farm Springs Road
Farmington, CT 06032 / US
[2016/43]
Former [2011/47]For all designated states
United Technologies Corporation
One Financial Plaza
Hartford, CT 06101 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Propheter-Hinckley, Tracy A.
44 Oak Forest Drive
Manchester, CT 06042 / US
02 / Chon, Young H.
30 Lemay Street
West Hartford CT 06107 / US
03 / Bridges, Joseph W.
8 Pent Road
Durham, CT 06422 / US
 [2011/51]
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/47]Leckey, David Herbert
Dehns 10 Salisbury Square London
Greater London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date11176354.607.11.2007
[2011/47]
Priority number, dateUS2007062206011.01.2007         Original published format: US 622060
[2011/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2388437
Date:23.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2388437
Date:16.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.10.2011
ClassificationInternational:F01D5/18
[2011/47]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2011/47]
TitleGerman:Kühlkreis-Durchflussweg für ein Turbinensektionsprofil[2011/47]
English:Cooling circuit flow path for a turbine section airfoil[2011/47]
French:Trajectoire de flux de circuit de refroidissement pour surface portante de turbine[2011/47]
Examination procedure17.05.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.05.2012Examination requested  [2012/26]
27.07.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.11.2012Fee for grant paid
23.11.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07254393.7  / EP1944467
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.10.2013  29.10.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1
80333 München / DE
 [2017/48]
Former [2013/49]
Opponent(s)01  16.10.2013  29.10.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
22.11.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
28.05.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.05.2015Date of oral proceedings
05.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
16.06.2015Reply to a communication from the opposition division
23.12.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
23.12.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition22.02.2016Appeal received No.  T0440/16
26.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
24.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
02.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
13.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0971095  (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,8-15 * paragraphs [0014] , [0019]; figure 2; claim 1 *;
 [X]US6206638  (GLYNN CHRISTOPHER C [US] ET AL) [X] 1-5,8-15 * column 6, line 2 - column 7, line 21; figure 2 *;
 [X]US5536143  (JACALA ARIEL [US] ET AL) [X] 1-5,8-12 * column 11, lines 10-19; figure 14A *