Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2416239

EP2416239 - Controlling device mounted on portable type terminal device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.02.2017
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
15-1 Naeshiro-cho
Mizuho-ku
Nagoya, Aichi 467-8561 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2012/06]For all designated states
Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
15-1 Naeshiro-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya, Aichi 467-8561 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sakurai, Kunihiko
BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
Intellectual Property Dept.
1-1-1 Kawagishi
Mizuho-ku
Nagoya, Aichi 467-8562 / JP
 [2012/06]
Representative(s)J A Kemp LLP
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/06]Smith, Samuel Leonard
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date11176471.803.08.2011
[2012/06]
Priority number, dateJP2010017733906.08.2010         Original published format: JP 2010177339
[2012/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2416239
Date:08.02.2012
Language:EN
[2012/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2416239
Date:17.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/12
[2012/06]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Auf tragbare Endgerätevorrichtung montierte Steuerungsvorrichtung[2012/06]
English:Controlling device mounted on portable type terminal device[2012/06]
French:Contrôle de dispositif monté sur un dispositif de terminal de type portable[2012/06]
Examination procedure15.01.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.01.2014Examination requested  [2014/10]
07.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.04.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.2018Date of oral proceedings
23.07.2018Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
31.07.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination28.09.2018Appeal received No.  T0049/19
29.11.2018Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)EP19177083.3
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.10.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
13.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
11.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
14.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
15.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[I]EP1469668  (SONY CORP [JP]) [I] 1-8 * figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0041] *
by applicantJP2001156893