blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2557375

EP2557375 - Cleaning apparatus for the surface cleaning of solar modules [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.05.2015
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Manu Systems AG
Brunnstraße 25
93053 Regensburg-Graß / DE
[2013/26]
Former [2013/07]For all designated states
Hochschule Regensburg
Prüfeninger Str. 58
93049 Regensburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Johansen, Søren Peter
Bakkegard
Ibjergvej 15
5792 Aarslev / DK
02 / Monkman, Gareth
Waldweidenweg 10
93053 Regensburg / DE
03 / Schumm, Michael
Rathausstrasse 5a
96114 Hirschaid / DE
04 / Treiber, Daniel
Kleinfeld 14
94359 Loitzendorf / DE
05 / Patzak, Adrian
Schlierseestrasse 9
81541 München / DE
06 / Kilbertus, Sebastian
Hauptstrasse 60a
93105 Tegernheim / DE
 [2014/11]
Former [2013/07]01 / Johansen, Søren Peter
Bakkegard
Ibjergvej 15
5792 Aarslev / DK
02 / Monkman, Gareth
Waldweidenweg 10
93053 Regensburg / DE
03 / Schumm, Michael
Rathausstrasse 5a
96114 Hirschaid / DE
04 / Treiber, Daniel
Kleinfeld 14
94359 Loitzendorf / DE
05 / Patzak, Adrian
Schlierseestrasse 9
81541 München / DE
06 / Kilbertus, Sebastian
Hauptstrasse 60a
93105 Tegernheim / DE
Representative(s)Hannke, Christian
Hannke Bittner & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB
Prüfeninger Straße 1
93049 Regensburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/30]Hannke, Christian
Hannke Bittner & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Prüfeninger Strasse 1
93049 Regensburg / DE
Former [2013/07]Hannke, Christian
Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ägidienplatz 7
93047 Regensburg / DE
Application number, filing date11176962.609.08.2011
[2013/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2557375
Date:13.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2557375
Date:23.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.12.2011
ClassificationIPC:F24J2/46
[2013/07]
CPC:
F24S40/20 (EP); Y02B10/20 (EP); Y02E10/40 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/07]
TitleGerman:Reinigungsvorrichtung zur Oberflächenreinigung von Solarmodulen[2013/07]
English:Cleaning apparatus for the surface cleaning of solar modules[2013/07]
French:Appareil de nettoyage pour le nettoyage de surface de modules solaires[2013/07]
Examination procedure24.09.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.07.2013Examination requested  [2013/35]
11.02.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.06.2014Fee for grant paid
11.06.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.06.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.02.2014
Opposition(s)24.04.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU09.08.2011
AL23.07.2014
AT23.07.2014
BE23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
IT23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
MK23.07.2014
MT23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
SM23.07.2014
TR23.07.2014
IE09.08.2014
LU09.08.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU09.08.2011
AT23.07.2014
BE23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
IT23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
MK23.07.2014
MT23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
SM23.07.2014
TR23.07.2014
IE09.08.2014
LU09.08.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2016/33]HU09.08.2011
AT23.07.2014
BE23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
IT23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
MT23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
SM23.07.2014
TR23.07.2014
IE09.08.2014
LU09.08.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2016/32]HU09.08.2011
AT23.07.2014
BE23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
IT23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
MT23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
SM23.07.2014
IE09.08.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2016/28]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
IT23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
MT23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
SM23.07.2014
IE09.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2016/22]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
IT23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
SM23.07.2014
IE09.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2015/50]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
IT23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
IE09.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2015/37]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
IT23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
IE09.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2015/23]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
IT23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SK23.07.2014
BE31.08.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2015/22]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
IT23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
BE31.08.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2015/20]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
BE31.08.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2015/19]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
BE31.08.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2015/12]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2015/11]CY23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2015/10]ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
Former [2015/09]FI23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
Former [2015/08]LT23.07.2014
Documents cited:Search[X]DE202009009020U  (SCHIFFERS GUIDO [DE]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0010] - [0015]; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]DE102010008131  (SCANSONIC MI GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0014] - [0025] - [0 39] - [0041]; figure 1 *;
 [X]KR20090090722  (JUNG HAE GWON [KR], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [X]DE202009012816U  (EHLEUTER FRANZ [DE]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0014] - [0026] - [0 44] - [0053]; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]WO2004091816  (INST LUFT & KAELTETECHNIK GGMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.