blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2557376

EP2557376 - Cleaning brush for the surface cleaning of solar modules [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.01.2015
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Manu Systems AG
Brunnstraße 25
93053 Regensburg-Graß / DE
[2013/26]
Former [2013/07]For all designated states
Hochschule Regensburg
Prüfeninger Str. 58
93049 Regensburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Johansen, Søren Peter
Bakkegard
Ibjergvej 15
5792 Aarslev / DK
 [2013/07]
Representative(s)Hannke, Christian
Hannke Bittner & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB
Prüfeninger Straße 1
93049 Regensburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/12]Hannke, Christian
Hannke Bittner & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Prüfeninger Strasse 1
93049 Regensburg / DE
Former [2013/07]Hannke, Christian
Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ägidienplatz 7
93047 Regensburg / DE
Application number, filing date11176966.709.08.2011
[2013/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2557376
Date:13.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2557376
Date:19.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.12.2011
ClassificationIPC:F24J2/46
[2013/07]
CPC:
F24S40/20 (EP); Y02E10/40 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/07]
TitleGerman:Reinigungsbürste zur Oberflächenreinigung von Solarmodulen[2013/07]
English:Cleaning brush for the surface cleaning of solar modules[2013/07]
French:Brosse de nettoyage pour le nettoyage de la surface de modules solaires[2013/07]
Examination procedure08.10.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.06.2013Examination requested  [2013/31]
21.11.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.01.2014Fee for grant paid
31.01.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.11.2013
Opposition(s)22.12.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2015/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU09.08.2011
AL19.03.2014
AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
IT19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
MK19.03.2014
MT19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
TR19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
GR20.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
IE09.08.2014
LU09.08.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU09.08.2011
AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
IT19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
MK19.03.2014
MT19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
TR19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
GR20.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
IE09.08.2014
LU09.08.2014
Former [2016/33]HU09.08.2011
AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
IT19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
MT19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
TR19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
GR20.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
IE09.08.2014
LU09.08.2014
Former [2016/32]HU09.08.2011
AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
IT19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
MT19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
GR20.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
IE09.08.2014
LU09.08.2014
Former [2016/28]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
IT19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
MT19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
GR20.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
IE09.08.2014
LU09.08.2014
Former [2016/22]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
IT19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
IE09.08.2014
LU09.08.2014
Former [2015/37]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
IT19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
IE09.08.2014
LU09.08.2014
Former [2015/36]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
IT19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
LU09.08.2014
Former [2015/19]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
IT19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
LU09.08.2014
Former [2015/18]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
IT19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2015/08]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2015/02]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2014/51]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
Former [2014/50]BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
Former [2014/49]BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
Former [2014/48]BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
Former [2014/46]BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
NO19.06.2014
Former [2014/41]CY19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
NO19.06.2014
Former [2014/37]CY19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
NO19.06.2014
Former [2014/36]LT19.03.2014
NO19.06.2014
Documents cited:Search[X]DE202009009020U  (SCHIFFERS GUIDO [DE]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0010] - [0015]; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]DE202009012816U  (EHLEUTER FRANZ [DE]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0014] - [0026] - [0 44] - [0053]; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]DE102010008131  (SCANSONIC MI GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0014] - [0025] - [0 39] - [0041] *;
 [A]KR20090090722  (JUNG HAE GWON [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2004091816  (INST LUFT & KAELTETECHNIK GGMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.