Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2417899

EP2417899 - Shaft element for an endoscopic instrument [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.09.2014
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG
Mittelstraße 8
78532 Tuttlingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/07]For all designated states
Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG
Mittelstraße 8
78532 Tuttlingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Bühs, Florian
Eisenacher Str. 109
10777 Berlin / DE
 [2012/07]
Representative(s)Fugmann, Winfried , et al
Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG
Mittelstrasse 8
78532 Tuttlingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/04]Fugmann, Winfried , et al
Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG Mittelstrasse 8
78532 Tuttlingen / DE
Former [2012/07]Straub, Bernd
Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG Patent Management Mittelstrasse 8
78532 Tuttlingen / DE
Application number, filing date11177169.710.08.2011
[2012/07]
Priority number, dateDE2010103437813.08.2010         Original published format: DE102010034378
[2012/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2417899
Date:15.02.2012
Language:DE
[2012/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2417899
Date:14.11.2012
Language:DE
[2012/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2417899
Date:30.10.2013
Language:DE
[2013/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.10.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61B1/008, A61B1/005
[2012/46]
Former International [2012/07]A61B1/008
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/07]
TitleGerman:Schaftelement für ein endoskopisches Instrument[2012/07]
English:Shaft element for an endoscopic instrument[2012/07]
French:Elément d'arbre pour un instrument endoscopique[2012/07]
Examination procedure10.05.2013Examination requested  [2013/25]
14.05.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.08.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.09.2013Fee for grant paid
13.09.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.08.2013
Opposition(s)31.07.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.08.2011
AL30.10.2013
BG30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
MC30.10.2013
MK30.10.2013
MT30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
RS30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SI30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
SM30.10.2013
TR30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
GR31.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU10.08.2011
BG30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
MC30.10.2013
MK30.10.2013
MT30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
RS30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SI30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
SM30.10.2013
TR30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
GR31.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
Former [2016/33]HU10.08.2011
BG30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
MC30.10.2013
MT30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
RS30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SI30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
SM30.10.2013
TR30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
GR31.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
Former [2016/32]HU10.08.2011
BG30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
MC30.10.2013
MT30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
RS30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SI30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
SM30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
GR31.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
Former [2016/28]BG30.10.2013
CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
MC30.10.2013
MT30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
RS30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SI30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
SM30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
GR31.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
Former [2016/22]CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
MC30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
RS30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SI30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
SM30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
Former [2015/18]CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
MC30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
RS30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SI30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
Former [2015/14]CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
RS30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SI30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
Former [2014/41]CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
DK30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
RS30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
Former [2014/37]CY30.10.2013
CZ30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
PL30.10.2013
RO30.10.2013
RS30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
SK30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
Former [2014/36]CY30.10.2013
EE30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
RS30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
Former [2014/28]CY30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
RS30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
PT28.02.2014
Former [2014/26]CY30.10.2013
ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
RS30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
Former [2014/25]ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
LV30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
RS30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
Former [2014/24]ES30.10.2013
FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
RS30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
Former [2014/23]FI30.10.2013
HR30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
IS28.02.2014
Former [2014/22]FI30.10.2013
LT30.10.2013
NL30.10.2013
SE30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
Former [2014/20]LT30.10.2013
NO30.01.2014
Documents cited:Search[XDY]US2003023142  (GRABOVER EDWARD A [US], et al) [XD] 1,3-7,9-11 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 0006 * * page 1, paragraph 0021 - page 2, paragraph 0031 * * page 3, paragraph 0035 * [Y] 2,8;
 [XDY]US6036636  (MOTOKI NOBUYUKI [JP], et al) [XD] 1,3-6,9,10 * abstract * * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 32 * * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 55 * * column 6, line 45 - line 53 * * column 7, line 28 - line 51 * [Y] 2,8;
 [Y]US2007135803  (BELSON AMIR [US]) [Y] 2,8 * abstract * * paragraph [0239] - paragraph [0257] *;
 [AD]US2008027285  (YASUNAGA SHINJI [JP]) [AD] 1-11 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 0009 - paragraph 0017 * * page 2, paragraph 0026 - paragraph 0029 * * page 3, paragraph 0036 - paragraph 0049 *;
 [A]US4790624  (VAN HOYE MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * column 18, line 29 - line 52 *
by applicantDE102007001580
 US6780151
 US2005131279
 US2008027285
 US6036636
 US2009171154
 DE29907430U