blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2417899 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2417899



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 139
03.09.2014 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
30.10.2013 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
04.10.2013 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
13.09.2013 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
13.09.2013 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
13.09.2013 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
13.09.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
02.08.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
02.08.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
02.08.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
02.08.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 25
16.05.2013 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 3
14.05.2013 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 3
11.05.2013 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
11.05.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
10.05.2013 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
10.05.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
10.05.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
19.12.2012 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
17.12.2012 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
13.12.2012 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
10.12.2012 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 4
19.11.2012 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
15.10.2012 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
15.10.2012 European search opinion Search / examination 3
15.10.2012 European search report Search / examination 2
18.01.2012 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
18.08.2011 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
18.08.2011 Priority document Search / examination 27
17.08.2011 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 2
10.08.2011 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.08.2011 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
10.08.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
10.08.2011 Description Search / examination 18
10.08.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
10.08.2011 Drawings Search / examination 5
10.08.2011 Priority search results Search / examination 3
10.08.2011 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4