blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2417899


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
29.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
15.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.08.2016  [2016/33]
08.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.08.2016  [2016/32]
10.06.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.07.2016  [2016/28]
29.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.06.2016  [2016/22]
27.03.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.04.2015  [2015/18]
27.02.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.04.2015  [2015/14]
05.09.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
05.09.2014 No opposition filed within time limit published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
08.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.09.2014  [2014/37]
01.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.09.2014  [2014/36]
06.06.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.07.2014  [2014/28]
23.05.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.06.2014  [2014/26]
16.05.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.06.2014  [2014/25]
09.05.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.06.2014  [2014/24]
02.05.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.06.2014  [2014/23]
25.04.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.05.2014  [2014/22]
11.04.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.05.2014  [2014/20]
27.09.2013 (Expected) grant published on  30.10.2013  [2013/44]
20.09.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
20.09.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
26.08.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.08.2013 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
17.05.2013 Request for examination filed published on  19.06.2013  [2013/25]
15.05.2013 Amendment by applicant
21.12.2012 Change - representative published on  23.01.2013  [2013/04]
12.10.2012 Publication of search report published on  14.11.2012  [2012/46]
12.10.2012 Change - classification published on  14.11.2012  [2012/46]
12.10.2012 Change - classification published on  14.11.2012  [2012/46]
15.02.2012 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  15.02.2012  [2012/07]