blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2417899
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9039607Global Dossier 26.05.2015B2
US2012041266 16.02.2012A1
Priority number Date
DE102010034378 13.08.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2417899Global Dossier 30.10.2013B1
EP2417899 14.11.2012A3
EP2417899 15.02.2012A2
Priority number Date
DE102010034378 13.08.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE102010034378 16.02.2012A1
Priority number Date
DE102010034378 13.08.2010