Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2397754

EP2397754 - Carrier body for construction elements or circuits [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.11.2015
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG, CY, HU, PT, TR
published on 15.11.2017  [2017/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CeramTec GmbH
CeramTec-Platz 1-9
73207 Plochingen / DE
[2011/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Kluge, Dr. Claus Peter
Ludwigsfelder Straße 36
95195 Röslau / DE
 [2011/51]
Representative(s)Uppena, Franz
Chemetall GmbH Patente, Marken & Lizenzen Trakehner Strasse 3
60487 Frankfurt/Main / DE
[2011/51]
Application number, filing date11177204.222.03.2007
[2011/51]
Priority number, dateDE2006101387323.03.2006         Original published format: DE102006013873
DE2006105596524.11.2006         Original published format: DE102006055965
DE2006105841708.12.2006         Original published format: DE102006058417
[2011/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2397754
Date:21.12.2011
Language:DE
[2011/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2397754
Date:26.06.2013
Language:DE
[2013/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2397754
Date:24.12.2014
Language:DE
[2014/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01L23/373, H01L23/367, F21K99/00, F21V29/00, F21Y101/02, F21Y105/00
[2013/26]
Former International [2011/51]F21V29/00, // F21Y101/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/51]
TitleGerman:Trägerkörper für Bauelemente oder Schaltungen[2011/51]
English:Carrier body for construction elements or circuits[2011/51]
French:Corps de support pour composants ou circuits[2014/32]
Former [2011/51]Corps de support pour composants ou commutateurs
Examination procedure11.08.2011Examination requested  [2011/51]
19.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.02.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
17.04.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.11.2014Fee for grant paid
13.11.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.11.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07727202.9  / EP2002476
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070727202) is  18.09.2009
Opposition(s)25.09.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/49]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
17.04.2014Request for further processing filed
17.04.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.05.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
02.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.03.2007
BG24.12.2014
CY24.12.2014
EE24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
MC24.12.2014
MT24.12.2014
PL24.12.2014
RO24.12.2014
SK24.12.2014
TR24.12.2014
IE22.03.2015
LU22.03.2015
GR25.03.2015
IS24.04.2015
PT24.04.2015
[2017/39]
Former [2017/03]EE24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
MC24.12.2014
MT24.12.2014
PL24.12.2014
RO24.12.2014
SK24.12.2014
IE22.03.2015
LU22.03.2015
GR25.03.2015
IS24.04.2015
Former [2016/07]EE24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
MC24.12.2014
PL24.12.2014
RO24.12.2014
SK24.12.2014
IE22.03.2015
LU22.03.2015
GR25.03.2015
IS24.04.2015
Former [2015/47]EE24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
MC24.12.2014
PL24.12.2014
RO24.12.2014
SK24.12.2014
LU22.03.2015
GR25.03.2015
IS24.04.2015
Former [2015/46]EE24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
MC24.12.2014
PL24.12.2014
RO24.12.2014
SK24.12.2014
GR25.03.2015
IS24.04.2015
Former [2015/38]EE24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
PL24.12.2014
RO24.12.2014
SK24.12.2014
GR25.03.2015
IS24.04.2015
Former [2015/37]EE24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
PL24.12.2014
RO24.12.2014
SK24.12.2014
GR25.03.2015
Former [2015/36]EE24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
RO24.12.2014
GR25.03.2015
Former [2015/35]EE24.12.2014
FI24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
GR25.03.2015
Former [2015/24]FI24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
LV24.12.2014
GR25.03.2015
Former [2015/23]FI24.12.2014
LT24.12.2014
Former [2015/20]LT24.12.2014
Documents cited:Search[IY]WO2005004246  (MIYAHARA KENICHIRO [JP]) [I] 6,7 * Abschnitte, die die Vorrichtungen in den Figuren 3, 5, 7 beschreiben;; figures 3,5,7 * [Y] 1-5;
 [Y]WO02058142  (CONTI TEMIC MICROELECTRONIC [DE], et al) [Y] 1 * column 6, line 5 - column 7, line 19; figures 2,3 *;
 [Y]DE10344547  (WARNKING ELEKTROTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [Y] 2-5 * paragraphs [0022] - [0031]; figures 1-4 *