Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2425825

EP2425825 - Pharmaceutical preparation containing oxycodone and naloxone [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.12.2018
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.2019Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 10.07.2019  [2019/28]
Applicant(s)For:AT  BE  BG  CY  EE  GR  HU  LU  MC  NL  RO  TR 
EURO-CELTIQUE S.A.
1, rue Jean Piret
2350 Luxembourg / LU
For:CH  LI 
Mundipharma Medical Company Hamilton, Bermuda, Basel Branch
St. Alban-Rheinweg 74
4020 Basel / CH
For:CZ  SI  SK 
Mundipharma Medical CEE GmbH
Apollogasse 16-18
1070 Vienna / AT
For:DE 
Mundipharma GmbH
De Saint-Exupéry-Straße 10
60549 Frankfurt am Main / DE
For:DK 
Mundipharma A/S
Frydenlundsvej 30, bygning E
2950 Vedbæk / DK
For:ES 
Mundipharma Pharmaceuticals S.L.
Edificio Coronales, Bahía de Pollensa 11
28042 Madrid / ES
For:FI 
Mundipharma OY
Rajatorpantie 41 C
01640 Vantaa / FI
For:FR 
Mundipharma SAS
100 Avenue de Suffren
75015 Paris / FR
For:IE 
Mundipharma Pharmaceuticals Limited
Millbank House
Arkle Road
Sandyford
Dublin 18 / IE
For:IT 
Mundipharma Pharmaceuticals S.r.l
Via Filippo Turati 40
20121 Milano / IT
For:PT 
Mundipharma Farmacêutica Lda.
Rua Claudio Galeno, Edif. Alloga
Cabra Figa
2635 Rio de Mouro / PT
For:SE 
Mundipharma AB
Mölndalsvägen 30 B 4tr
412 63 Gothenburg / SE
For:GB 
Napp Pharmaceutical Holdings Limited
Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge
CB4 0AB / GB
[2019/13]
Former [2017/47]For:AT  BE  BG  CY  EE  GR  HU  LU  MC  NL  RO  TR 
EURO-CELTIQUE S.A.
1, rue Jean Piret
2350 Luxembourg / LU
For:CH  LI 
Mundipharma Medical Company Hamilton, Bermuda, Basel Branch
St. Alban-Rheinweg 74
4020 Basel / CH
For:CZ  SI  SK 
Mundipharma Medical CEE GmbH
Apollogasse 16-18
1070 Vienna / AT
For:DE 
Mundipharma GmbH
Mundipharma Strasse 2
65549 Limburg / DE
For:DK 
Mundipharma A/S
Frydenlundsvej 30, bygning E
2950 Vedbæk / DK
For:ES 
Mundipharma Pharmaceuticals S.L.
Edificio Coronales, Bahía de Pollensa 11
28042 Madrid / ES
For:FI 
Mundipharma OY
Rajatorpantie 41 C
01640 Vantaa / FI
For:FR 
Mundipharma SAS
100 Avenue de Suffren
75015 Paris / FR
For:IE 
Mundipharma Pharmaceuticals Limited
Millbank House
Arkle Road
Sandyford
Dublin 18 / IE
For:IT 
Mundipharma Pharmaceuticals S.r.l
Via Filippo Turati 40
20121 Milano / IT
For:PT 
Mundipharma Farmacêutica Lda.
Rua Claudio Galeno, Edif. Alloga
Cabra Figa
2635 Rio de Mouro / PT
For:SE 
Mundipharma AB
Mölndalsvägen 30 B 4tr
412 63 Gothenburg / SE
For:GB 
Napp Pharmaceutical Holdings Limited
Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge
CB4 0AB / GB
Former [2016/26]For all designated states
EURO-CELTIQUE S.A.
1, rue Jean Piret
2350 Luxembourg / LU
Former [2012/10]For all designated states
EURO-CELTIQUE S.A.
2, avenue Charles de Gaulle
1653 Luxembourg / LU
Inventor(s)01 / Brögmann, Bianca
Bad Nauheimerstr. 21
64289 Darmstadt / DE
02 / Mühlau, Silke
Wielandstrasse 13
88400 Biberach
Riss / DE
03 / Spitzley, Christof
Am Linsengraben 2
65627 Elbtal / DE
 [2012/10]
Representative(s)Bühler, Dirk
Maiwald Patentanwalts- und
Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/46]Bühler, Dirk
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
Former [2012/10]Bühler, Dirk
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date11177520.104.04.2003
[2012/10]
Priority number, dateDE2002101513105.04.2002         Original published format: DE 10215131
DE2002101506705.04.2002         Original published format: DE 10215067
[2012/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2425825
Date:07.03.2012
Language:EN
[2012/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2425825
Date:16.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/46]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP2425825
Date:01.03.2017
[2017/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.02.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/20, A61K9/16, A61K31/485
[2012/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2012/10]
Extension statesAL12.08.2011
LT12.08.2011
LV12.08.2011
MK12.08.2011
TitleGerman:Pharmazeutische Zubereitung mit Oxycodon und Naloxon[2012/10]
English:Pharmaceutical preparation containing oxycodone and naloxone[2012/10]
French:Préparation pharmaceutique contenant de l'oxycodone et de la naloxone[2012/10]
Examination procedure12.08.2011Examination requested  [2012/10]
18.10.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
02.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.12.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.03.2016Observations by third parties
02.06.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.06.2016Observations by third parties
21.06.2016Fee for grant paid
21.06.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.06.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
28.06.2016Observations by third parties
30.11.2016Request for correction of the decision to grant filed
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP03720424.5  / EP1492505
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030720424) is  26.08.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.03.2017  14.08.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Develco Pharma Schweiz AG
Hohenrainstr. 12D
4133 Pratteln / CH
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
 02  07.04.2017  12.04.2017  ADMISSIBLE
KRKA, d.d., Novo mesto
Smarjeska cesta 6
8501 Novo Mesto / SI
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 03  13.04.2017  25.04.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Acino Supply AG
Pfeffingerring 205
4147 Aesch BL / CH
Opponent's representative
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Brienner Strasse 1
80333 München / DE
 04  10.05.2017  16.05.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG / Sandoz International GmbH
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner, et al
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
 05  29.05.2017  06.06.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Europe Ltd
Building 2, 1st Floor
Croxley Green Business Park
Watford
Hertfordshire WD18 8YA / GB
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 06  23.06.2017  28.06.2017  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Kernebeck, Thomas
Kernebeck Patentanwalts GmbH
Stiftstraße 2
60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 07  08.08.2017  11.08.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
P.O. Box 3190
49131 Petah Tiqva / IL
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP, et al
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 08  08.08.2017  11.08.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Intas Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
2nd Floor Chinubhai Centre
Ashram Road
Ahmedabad 380009
GUJ / IN
Opponent's representative
Sharp, Christopher William, et al
Pinsent Masons LLP
30 Crown Place
Earl Street
London EC2A 4ES / GB
 09  04.08.2017  10.08.2017  ADMISSIBLE
G. L. Pharma GmbH
Schlossplatz 1
8502 Lannach / AT
Opponent's representative
Keschmann, Marc, et al
Haffner und Keschmann Patentanwälte GmbH
Schottengasse 3a
1010 Wien / AT
 10  11.08.2017  17.08.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Ethypharm
194 Bureaux de la Colline
Bât D
92213 Saint-Cloud / FR
Opponent's representative
Regimbeau, et al
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
 [2019/28]
Former [2018/44]
Opponent(s)01  17.03.2017  14.08.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Develco Pharma Schweiz AG
Hohenrainstr. 12D
4133 Pratteln / CH
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
 02  07.04.2017  12.04.2017  ADMISSIBLE
KRKA, d.d., Novo mesto
Smarjeska cesta 6
8501 Novo Mesto / SI
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 03  13.04.2017  25.04.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Acino Supply AG
Pfeffingerring 205
4147 Aesch BL / CH
Opponent's representative
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Brienner Strasse 1
80333 München / DE
 04  10.05.2017  16.05.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG / Sandoz International GmbH
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
 05  29.05.2017  06.06.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Europe Ltd
Building 2, 1st Floor
Croxley Green Business Park
Watford
Hertfordshire WD18 8YA / GB
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 06  23.06.2017  28.06.2017  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Kernebeck, Thomas
Kernebeck Patentanwalts GmbH
Stiftstraße 2
60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 07  08.08.2017  11.08.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
P.O. Box 3190
49131 Petah Tiqva / IL
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP, et al
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 08  08.08.2017  11.08.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Intas Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
2nd Floor Chinubhai Centre
Ashram Road
Ahmedabad 380009
GUJ / IN
Opponent's representative
Sharp, Christopher William, et al
Pinsent Masons LLP
30 Crown Place
Earl Street
London EC2A 4ES / GB
 09  04.08.2017  10.08.2017  ADMISSIBLE
G. L. Pharma GmbH
Schlossplatz 1
8502 Lannach / AT
Opponent's representative
Keschmann, Marc, et al
Haffner und Keschmann Patentanwälte GmbH
Schottengasse 3a
1010 Wien / AT
 10  11.08.2017  17.08.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Ethypharm
194 Bureaux de la Colline
Bât D
92213 Saint-Cloud / FR
Opponent's representative
Regimbeau, et al
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Former [2018/25]
Opponent(s)01  17.03.2017  14.08.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Develco Pharma Schweiz AG
Hohenrainstr. 12D
4133 Pratteln / CH
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
 02  07.04.2017  12.04.2017  ADMISSIBLE
KRKA, d.d., Novo mesto
Smarjeska cesta 6
8501 Novo Mesto / SI
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 03  13.04.2017  25.04.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Acino Supply AG
Pfeffingerring 205
4147 Aesch BL / CH
Opponent's representative
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Brienner Strasse 1
80333 München / DE
 04  10.05.2017  16.05.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG / Sandoz International GmbH
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
 05  29.05.2017  06.06.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Europe Ltd
Building 2, 1st Floor
Croxley Green Business Park
Watford
Hertfordshire WD18 8YA / GB
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 06  23.06.2017  28.06.2017  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Kernebeck, Thomas
Kernebeck Patentanwalts GmbH
Stiftstraße 2
60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 07  08.08.2017  11.08.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
P.O. Box 3190
49131 Petah Tiqva / IL
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP, et al
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 08  08.08.2017  11.08.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Intas Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
2nd Floor Chinubhai Centre
Ashram Road
Ahmedabad 380009
GUJ / IN
Opponent's representative
Murray, Adrian D'Coligny, et al
Pinsent Masons LLP
30 Crown Place
Earl Street
London EC2A 4ES / GB
 09  04.08.2017  10.08.2017  ADMISSIBLE
G. L. Pharma GmbH
Schlossplatz 1
8502 Lannach / AT
Opponent's representative
Keschmann, Marc, et al
Haffner und Keschmann Patentanwälte GmbH
Schottengasse 3a
1010 Wien / AT
 10  11.08.2017  17.08.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Ethypharm
194 Bureaux de la Colline
Bât D
92213 Saint-Cloud / FR
Opponent's representative
Regimbeau, et al
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Former [2017/51]
Opponent(s)01  17.03.2017  14.08.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Develco Pharma Schweiz AG
Hohenrainstr. 12D
1433 Pratteln / CH
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
 02  07.04.2017  12.04.2017  ADMISSIBLE
KRKA, d.d., Novo mesto
Smarjeska cesta 6
8501 Novo Mesto / SI
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 03  13.04.2017  25.04.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Acino Supply AG
Pfeffingerring 205
4147 Aesch BL / CH
Opponent's representative
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Brienner Strasse 1
80333 München / DE
 04  10.05.2017  16.05.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG / Sandoz International GmbH
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
 05  29.05.2017  06.06.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Europe Ltd
Building 2, 1st Floor
Croxley Green Business Park
Watford
Hertfordshire WD18 8YA / GB
Opponent's representative
Dean, John Paul, et al
JD IP Limited
Spring Farm The Street
Regil
Bristol BS40 8BB / GB
 06  23.06.2017  28.06.2017  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Kernebeck, Thomas
Kernebeck Patentanwalts GmbH
Stiftstraße 2
60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 07  08.08.2017  11.08.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
P.O. Box 3190
49131 Petah Tiqva / IL
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP, et al
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 08  08.08.2017  11.08.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Intas Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
2nd Floor Chinubhai Centre
Ashram Road
Ahmedabad 380009
GUJ / IN
Opponent's representative
Murray, Adrian D'Coligny, et al
Pinsent Masons LLP
30 Crown Place
Earl Street
London EC2A 4ES / GB
 09  04.08.2017  10.08.2017  ADMISSIBLE
G. L. Pharma GmbH
Schlossplatz 1
8502 Lannach / AT
Opponent's representative
Keschmann, Marc, et al
Haffner und Keschmann Patentanwälte GmbH
Schottengasse 3a
1010 Wien / AT
 10  11.08.2017  17.08.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Ethypharm
194 Bureaux de la Colline
Bât D
92213 Saint-Cloud / FR
Opponent's representative
Regimbeau, et al
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Former [2017/47]
Opponent(s)01  17.03.2017  14.08.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Develco Pharma Schweiz AG
Hohenrainstr. 12D
1433 Pratteln / CH
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
 02  07.04.2017  12.04.2017  ADMISSIBLE
KRKA, d.d., Novo mesto
Smarjeska cesta 6
8501 Novo Mesto / SI
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 03  13.04.2017  25.04.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Acino Supply AG
Pfeffingerring 205
4147 Aesch BL / CH
Opponent's representative
Breuer, Markus, et al
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Brienner Str. 1
80333 München / DE
 04  10.05.2017  16.05.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG / Sandoz International GmbH
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
 05  29.05.2017  06.06.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Europe Ltd
Building 2, 1st Floor
Croxley Green Business Park
Watford
Hertfordshire WD18 8YA / GB
Opponent's representative
Dean, John Paul, et al
JD IP Limited
Spring Farm The Street
Regil
Bristol BS40 8BB / GB
 06  23.06.2017  28.06.2017  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Kernebeck, Thomas
Kernebeck Patentanwalts GmbH
Stiftstraße 2
60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 07  08.08.2017  11.08.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
P.O. Box 3190
49131 Petah Tiqva / IL
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP, et al
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 08  08.08.2017  11.08.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Intas Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
2nd Floor Chinubhai Centre
Ashram Road
Ahmedabad 380009
GUJ / IN
Opponent's representative
Murray, Adrian D'Coligny, et al
Pinsent Masons LLP
30 Crown Place
Earl Street
London EC2A 4ES / GB
 09  04.08.2017  10.08.2017  ADMISSIBLE
G. L. Pharma GmbH
Schlossplatz 1
8502 Lannach / AT
Opponent's representative
Keschmann, Marc, et al
Haffner und Keschmann Patentanwälte GmbH
Schottengasse 3a
1010 Wien / AT
 10  11.08.2017  17.08.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Ethypharm
194 Bureaux de la Colline
Bât D
92213 Saint-Cloud / FR
Opponent's representative
Regimbeau, et al
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Former [2017/38]
Opponent(s)01  17.03.2017  14.08.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Develco Pharma Schweiz AG
Hohenrainstr. 12D
1433 Pratteln / CH
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
 02  07.04.2017  12.04.2017  ADMISSIBLE
KRKA, d.d., Novo mesto
Smarjeska cesta 6
8501 Novo Mesto / SI
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 03  13.04.2017  25.04.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Acino Supply AG
Pfeffingerring 205
4147 Aesch BL / CH
Opponent's representative
Breuer, Markus, et al
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Erika-Mann-Straße 23
80636 München / DE
 04  10.05.2017  16.05.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG / Sandoz International GmbH
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
 05  29.05.2017  06.06.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Europe Ltd
Building 2, 1st Floor
Croxley Green Business Park
Watford
Hertfordshire WD18 8YA / GB
Opponent's representative
Dean, John Paul, et al
JD IP Limited
Spring Farm The Street
Regil
Bristol BS40 8BB / GB
 06  23.06.2017  28.06.2017  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Kernebeck, Thomas
Kernebeck Patentanwalts GmbH
Stiftstraße 2
60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 07  08.08.2017  11.08.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
P.O. Box 3190
49131 Petah Tiqva / IL
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP, et al
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 08  08.08.2017  11.08.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Intas Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
2nd Floor Chinubhai Centre
Ashram Road
Ahmedabad 380009
GUJ / IN
Opponent's representative
Murray, Adrian D'Coligny, et al
Pinsent Masons LLP
30 Crown Place
Earl Street
London EC2A 4ES / GB
 09  04.08.2017  10.08.2017  ADMISSIBLE
G. L. Pharma GmbH
Schlossplatz 1
8502 Lannach / AT
Opponent's representative
Keschmann, Marc, et al
Haffner und Keschmann Patentanwälte GmbH
Schottengasse 3a
1010 Wien / AT
 10  11.08.2017  17.08.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Ethypharm
194 Bureaux de la Colline
Bât D
92213 Saint-Cloud / FR
Opponent's representative
Regimbeau, et al
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Former [2017/37]
Opponent(s)01  17.03.2017   
Develco Pharma Schweiz AG
Hohenrainstr. 12D
1433 Pratteln / CH
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
 02  07.04.2017  12.04.2017  ADMISSIBLE
KRKA, d.d., Novo mesto
Smarjeska cesta 6
8501 Novo Mesto / SI
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 03  13.04.2017  25.04.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Acino Supply AG
Pfeffingerring 205
4147 Aesch BL / CH
Opponent's representative
Breuer, Markus, et al
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Erika-Mann-Straße 23
80636 München / DE
 04  10.05.2017  16.05.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG / Sandoz International GmbH
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
 05  29.05.2017  06.06.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Europe Ltd
Building 2, 1st Floor
Croxley Green Business Park
Watford
Hertfordshire WD18 8YA / GB
Opponent's representative
Dean, John Paul, et al
JD IP Limited
Spring Farm The Street
Regil
Bristol BS40 8BB / GB
 06  23.06.2017  28.06.2017  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Kernebeck, Thomas
Kernebeck Patentanwalts GmbH
Stiftstraße 2
60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 07  08.08.2017   
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
P.O. Box 3190
49131 Petah Tiqva / IL
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP, et al
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 08  08.08.2017   
Intas Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
2nd Floor Chinubhai Centre
Ashram Road
Ahmedabad 380009
GUJ / IN
Opponent's representative
Murray, Adrian D'Coligny, et al
Pinsent Masons LLP
30 Crown Place
Earl Street
London EC2A 4ES / GB
 09  04.08.2017  10.08.2017  ADMISSIBLE
G. L. Pharma GmbH
Schlossplatz 1
8502 Lannach / AT
Opponent's representative
Keschmann, Marc, et al
Haffner und Keschmann Patentanwälte GmbH
Schottengasse 3a
1010 Wien / AT
Former [2017/31]
Opponent(s)01  17.03.2017   
Develco Pharma Schweiz AG
Hohenrainstr. 12D
1433 Pratteln / CH
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
 02  07.04.2017  12.04.2017  ADMISSIBLE
KRKA, d.d., Novo mesto
Smarjeska cesta 6
8501 Novo Mesto / SI
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 03  13.04.2017  25.04.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Acino Supply AG
Pfeffingerring 205
4147 Aesch BL / CH
Opponent's representative
Breuer, Markus, et al
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Erika-Mann-Straße 23
80636 München / DE
 04  10.05.2017  16.05.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG / Sandoz International GmbH
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
 05  29.05.2017  06.06.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Europe Ltd
Building 2, 1st Floor
Croxley Green Business Park
Watford
Hertfordshire WD18 8YA / GB
Opponent's representative
Dean, John Paul, et al
JD IP Limited
Spring Farm The Street
Regil
Bristol BS40 8BB / GB
 06  23.06.2017  28.06.2017  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Kernebeck, Thomas
Kernebeck Patentanwalts GmbH
Stiftstraße 2
60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Former [2017/27]
Opponent(s)01  17.03.2017   
Develco Pharma Schweiz AG
Hohenrainstr. 12D
1433 Pratteln / CH
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
 02  07.04.2017  12.04.2017  ADMISSIBLE
KRKA, d.d., Novo mesto
Smarjeska cesta 6
8501 Novo Mesto / SI
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 03  13.04.2017  25.04.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Acino Supply AG
Pfeffingerring 205
4147 Aesch BL / CH
Opponent's representative
Breuer, Markus, et al
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Erika-Mann-Straße 23
80636 München / DE
 04  10.05.2017  16.05.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG / Sandoz International GmbH
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
 05  29.05.2017   
Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Europe Ltd
Building 2, 1st Floor
Croxley Green Business Park
Watford
Hertfordshire WD18 8YA / GB
Opponent's representative
Dean, John Paul, et al
JD IP Limited
Spring Farm The Street
Regil
Bristol BS40 8BB / GB
Former [2017/25]
Opponent(s)01  17.03.2017   
Develco Pharma Schweiz AG
Hohenrainstr. 12D
1433 Pratteln / CH
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
 02  07.04.2017  12.04.2017  ADMISSIBLE
KRKA, d.d., Novo mesto
Smarjeska cesta 6
8501 Novo Mesto / SI
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 03  13.04.2017  25.04.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Acino Supply AG
Pfeffingerring 205
4147 Aesch BL / CH
Opponent's representative
Breuer, Markus, et al
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Erika-Mann-Straße 23
80636 München / DE
 04  10.05.2017  16.05.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG / Sandoz International GmbH
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Former [2017/21]
Opponent(s)01  17.03.2017   
Develco Pharma Schweiz AG
Hohenrainstr. 12D
1433 Pratteln / CH
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
 02  07.04.2017  12.04.2017  ADMISSIBLE
KRKA, d.d., Novo mesto
Smarjeska cesta 6
8501 Novo Mesto / SI
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 03  13.04.2017   
Acino Supply AG
Pfeffingerring 205
4147 Aesch BL / CH
Opponent's representative
Breuer, Markus, et al
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Erika-Mann-Straße 23
80636 München / DE
Former [2017/20]
Opponent(s)01  17.03.2017   
Develco Pharma Schweiz AG
Hohenrainstr. 12D
1433 Pratteln / CH
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
 02  07.04.2017  12.04.2017  ADMISSIBLE
KRKA, d.d., Novo mesto
Smarjeska cesta 6
8501 Novo Mesto / SI
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
Former [2017/17]
Opponent(s)01  17.03.2017   
Develco Pharma Schweiz AG
Hohenrainstr. 12D
1433 Pratteln / CH
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
22.09.2017Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.02.2018Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.11.2018Date of oral proceedings
11.12.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.12.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition20.02.2019Appeal received No.  T0587/19
12.04.2019Statement of grounds filed
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
19.12.2012Request for further processing filed
19.12.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.01.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
12.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
12.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
12.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
12.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
12.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
12.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
24.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
22.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
22.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
29.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 13
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9932119  (EURO CELTIQUE SA [LU], et al) [X] 1-28 * the whole document * * examples 1-3; claims 1-21 *;
 [X]WO9932120  (EURO CELTIQUE SA [LU], et al) [X] 1-28 * the whole document * * examples 1-3; claims 1-10 *;
 [X]WO0158447  (EURO CELTIQUE SA [LU], et al) [X] 1-28 * the whole document * * examples 1-20; claims 1-34 *;
 [XI]US4457933  (GORDON MAXWELL [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document * * examples 1-6; claims 1-11 * [I] 11-28;
 [XI]DE4325465  (ZENZ MICHAEL PROF DR MED [DE], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document * * examples 1-9; claims 1-11 * [I] 11-28
otherUS4769372
 EP1492505
 WO03084520
    - "Valoron N retard", ROTE LISTE SERVICE GMBH, Rote Liste, EDITIO VERLAG, (20010000), pages 5-094 - 5-096, XP055264074
    - T. FLOTER; U. BRUNNMULLER, "Tilidin/Naloxon retard zur Langzeitanwendung bei chronischen Schmerzen und Multimorbidität", Fortschritte der Medizin, (20020000), vol. 120, no. I, pages 29 - 35, XP055264063
    - "Oxygesic@", ROTE LISTE SERVICE GMBH, Rote Liste, EDITIO VERLAG, (20010000), pages 5-025 - 5-027, XP002601170
    - BMA, BRITISH NATIONAL FORMULARY 43, Db Misc, (20020300), page 219,612, ISBN 978-0727916136, XP055373999
OppositionWO03084520
 WO02092060
 WO0158447
 WO9932119
 US4769372
 WO0158451
 EP1492505
 DE10215131
 DE10215067
 US3966940
 US3773955
 WO9932120
 EP0352361
 DE4325465
 US6419595
 EP2425825
 WO03007802
 US4457933
 GB1390772
 WO9825613
 WO0132180
 US4987136
 US5549912
    - J. HARDMAN et al., Goodman & Gil- man's The Pharmacological Basis of Therapeutics. 9th ed., McGraw-Hill, (19950000), pages 550 - 551, XP055373995
    - M. Zenz et al, Lehrbuch der Schmerztherapie, Grundlagen Theorie und Praxis für Aus- und Weiterbildung, (20010000), pages 463 - 464, XP055298154
    - W. MEISSNER et al., "A randomized controlled trial with prolonged- release oral oxycodone and naloxone to prevent and reverse opi- oid-induce constipation", European Journal of Pain, (20080831), vol. 13, no. 1, pages 56 - 64, XP025865529

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejpain.2008.06.012
    - Lynch M. et al., "Cancer Pain Management: II", Oncology, (20000000), vol. 5, no. Part 2, pages 1 - 12, XP055373999
    - A. WADE et al., Handbook of Pharmaceutical Excipients. 2nd ed., APA, (19940000), pages 186 - 190, XP055298172
    - Anonymous, "Oxygesic® 05 025", Rote Liste, (20010000), XP055385730
    - Anonymous, "Valoron® 05 095 ", Rote Liste, (20010000), XP055298544
    - Meissner W. et al, "A randomised controlled trial with prolonged-release oral oxycodone and naloxone to prevent and reverse opioid-induced constipation", European Journal of Pain, (20090831), vol. 13, no. 1, pages 56 - 64, XP025865529

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejpain.2008.06.012
    - M. ZENZ et al., Lehrbuch der Schmerztherapie: Grundlagen, Theorie und Praxis für Aus- und Weiterbildung, Stuttgart, (20010000), page 462, 463, 467 and 881, XP055298289
    - "Neue Therapieperspektiven mit retardiertem Tilidin/Na\oxon", Der Anaesthesist, (19980500), vol. 47, no. 5, pages 1 - 4, XP055383052
    - "Oxygesic®", ROTE LISTE SERVICE GMBH, Rote Liste, (20010000), XP055385730
    - "Valoron N retard® 05 095", Anonymous, Rote Liste, (20010000), XP055382971
    - A.T. SKARIN et al., "Cancer Pain Management: II", Hospital Physician Board Review Manual: Oncology, (20000000), vol. 5, pages 1 - 12, XP055298164
    - Prof Dr Michael Zenz Et Al.,, Lehrbuch der Schmerztherapie, Grundlagen, Theorie und Praxis für Aus- und Weiterbildung 2. Auflage, pages 462 - 465, ISBN 978-3-8047-1805-0, XP055391902
    - I. JURNA et al., "Retardiert freigesetztes Naloxon oral: Aufhebung der Obstipation durch orales Morphin ohne Beseitigung der Analgesie. [Oral administration of slow-release naloxone for prevention of constipation but not analgesia following oral morphine.]", Der Schmerz, (19931200), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 314 - 321, XP009176556

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02529868
    - Anonymous, "Neue Therapieperspektiven mit retardiertem Tilidin/Naloxon", Der Anaesthesist, (19980000), vol. 47, no. 5, pages 1 - 4, XP055383052
    - Floter T; Brunnmuller U, "Tilidin/Naloxon retard zur Langzeitanwendung bei chronischen Schmerzen und Multimorbidität", Fortschritte der Medizin, (20020000), vol. 120, no. 1, pages 29 - 35, XP055264063
    - J. Nadstawek; P. l.syandeckar, M. Hopp; C. Ruckes; S. Witz, W. Fleischer; K. Reimer, "Patient Assessment of a Novel Therapeutic Approach for the Treatment of Severe, Chronic Pain", Medscape, (20080711), pages 1 - 9, URL: htttp://www.medscape.com/viewarticle/582514, (22090107), XP055392038
    - Meissner W; Leyendecker P; Mueller-Lissner S; Nadstawek J; Hopp M; Ruckes C; Wirz S; Fleischer W; Reimer K, "A randomised controlled trial with prolonged-release oral oxycodone and naloxone to prevent and reverse opioid-induced constipation", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PAIN,, vol. 13, no. 1, (20090101), pages 56 - 64, XP025865529

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejpain.2008.06.012
    - Dana Vondrackova, Petra Leyendecker, Winfried Meissner, Michael Hopp, Istvan Szombati et al.,, "Analgesic Efficacy and Safety of Oxycodone in Combination With Naloxone as Prolonged Release Tablets in Patients With Moderate to Severe Chronic Pain", The Journal of Pain, vol. 9, no. 12, ISSN 1526-5900, (20081200), pages 1144 - 1154, XP055392044

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jpain.2008.06.014
    - "Optimization of Naloxone - Oxycodone ratio in pain patientsOXN 2401", Mundipharma GmbH Protocol OXN 2401, (20011207), pages 1 - 38, XP055298247
    - CULPEPPER-MORGAN J et al., "Oral Naloxone Treatment of Narcotic Induced Constipation: Dose Response", Nida Research Monograph, (19890000), vol. 95, pages 399 - 400, XP055298251
    - CULPEPPER-MORGAN J et al., "Treatment of opioid-induced constipation with oral naloxone: A pilot study", Clin Pharm Ther, (19920000), vol. 52, no. 1, pages 90 - 95, XP009062715
    - JURNA I, "Oral naloxone reduces constipation but not antinociception from oral morphine in the rat", Neuroscience Letters, (19920000), vol. 142, no. 1, pages 62 - 64, XP024349821

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-3940(92)90620-M
    - JURNA I, "Retardiert freigesetztes Naloxon oral: Aufhebung der Obstipation durch orales Morphin ohne Beseitigung der Analgesie. [Oral administration of slow-release naloxone for prevention of constipation but not analgesia following oral morphine.]", Der Schmerz, (19930000), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 314 - 321, XP009176556

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02529868
    - SYKES N, "An investigation of the ability of oral naloxone to correct opioid-related constipation in patients with advanced cancer", Palliative Medicine, (19960000), vol. 10, pages 135 - 144, XP055298264

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/026921639601000208
    - MEISSNER W et al., "Oral naloxone reverses opioid-associated constipation", Pain, (20000000), vol. 84, no. 1, pages 105 - 109, XP055252526

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-3959(99)00185-2
    - HAWKES ND et al., "Effect of an enteric-release formulation of naloxone on intestinaltransit in volunteers taking codeine", Aliment Pharmacol Ther, (20010000), vol. 15, no. 5, pages 625 - 630, XP055408359

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2036.2001.00970.x
    - "OxyContin ®", Ficha Técnica, (19980000), pages 1 - 12, XP055413653
    - "Oxycontin", VIDAL, (20020000), pages 155 - 156, XP055413648
    - GOODMAN L. et al., Goodman's & Gilman's The Pharmacological Basis of the Therapeutics. 9th ed., McGraw-Hill, (19960000), pages 550 - 551, XP055413643
    - A.T. SKARIN et al., "Cancer Pain Management: II", Oncology, (20000000), vol. 5, pages 1 - 12, XP055298164
    - MICHAEL ZENZ et al., Lehrbuch der Schmerztherapie, Grundlagen, Theorie und Praxis für Aus-und Weiterbildung, Stuttgart, (20010000), pages 463 - 464, XP055298154
    - J. Jage, I. Jurna, "Opioidanalgetika", J. Jage, I. Jurna, Michael Zenz, Ilmar Jurna, Lehrbuch der Schmerztherapie Grundlagen, Theorie und Praxis für Aus-und Weiterbildung 2. Auflage, Wissenschaftliche Verlagsgesellschaft mbH, (20010000), pages 1pp, IV, 255-280, 462 - 463, ISBN 978-3-8047-1805-0, XP055411579
    - "Oxygesic®", ROTE LISTE SERVICE GMBH, ROTE LISTE 2001. ARZNEIMITTELVERZEICHNIS FUER DEUTSCHLAND (EINSCHLIESSLICH EU - ZULASSUNGEN UND BESTIMMTER MEDIZINPRODUKTE); [ROTE LISTE],, (20010000), pages 5023 - 5030, XP055385730
    - "Valoron® N retard", ROTE LISTE SERVICE GMBH, ROTE LISTE 2001. ARZNEIMITTELVERZEICHNIS FUER DEUTSCHLAND (EINSCHLIESSLICH EU - ZULASSUNGEN UND BESTIMMTER MEDIZINPRODUKTE); [ROTE LISTE],, (20010000), ISBN 978-3-87193-245-8, XP055298544
    - Budavari, S., O'Neil, M., Smith, Ann, Heckelman, P., Obencha, The Merck Index Twelfth Edition, (19960000), page 1092, 1093, 1194, XP055411591
    - Anonymous, Europäisches Arzneibuch 4. Ausgabe, Grundwerk 2002 (Ph.Eur. 4), Deutscher Apotheker Verlag, (19990000), pages 1pp, V, 2442 - 2443, ISBN 978-3-7692-2947-9, XP055411597
    - I. JURNA, J. Baldauf, "Retardiert freigesetztes Naloxon oral: Aufhebung der Obstipation durch orales Morphin ohne Beseitigung der Analgesie", Der Schmerz, (19930000), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 314 - 321, XP009176556

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02529868
    - Hawkes N D; Et Al, "Effect of an enteric-release formulation of naloxone on intestinal transit in volunteers taking codeine", ALIMENTARY PHARMACOLOGY & THERAPEUTICS,, (20010500), vol. 15, no. 5, pages 625 - 630, XP055408359

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2036.2001.00970.x