blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2559956

EP2559956 - Transferring device for transferring a service robot for solar modules [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.05.2015
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Manu Systems AG
Brunnstraße 25
93053 Regensburg-Graß / DE
[2014/27]
Former [2013/08]For all designated states
Hochschule Regensburg
Prüfeninger Str. 58
93049 Regensburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Johansen, Søren Peter
Bakkegard
Ibjergvej 15
5792 Aarslev / DK
02 / Monkman, Gareth
Waldweidenweg 10
93053 Regensburg / DE
03 / Schumm, Michael
Rathausstrasse 5a
96114 Hirschaid / DE
04 / Treiber, Daniel
Kleinfeld 14
94359 Loitzendorf / DE
05 / Patzak, Adrian
Schlierseestrasse 9
81541 München / DE
06 / Kilbertus, Sebastian
Hauptstrasse 60a
93105 Tegernheim / DE
 [2013/08]
Representative(s)Hannke, Christian
Hannke Bittner & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB
Prüfeninger Straße 1
93049 Regensburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/28]Hannke, Christian
Hannke Bittner & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Prüfeninger Strasse 1
93049 Regensburg / DE
Former [2013/08]Hannke, Christian
Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ägidienplatz 7
93047 Regensburg / DE
Application number, filing date11177705.816.08.2011
[2013/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2559956
Date:20.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2559956
Date:09.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.12.2011
ClassificationIPC:F24J2/46
[2013/08]
CPC:
F24S40/20 (EP); Y02E10/40 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/08]
TitleGerman:Transportvorrichtung zum Transport eines Wartungsroboters für Solarmodule[2013/08]
English:Transferring device for transferring a service robot for solar modules[2013/08]
French:Dispositif de transfert pour le transfert d'un robot d'entretien pour modules solaires[2013/08]
Examination procedure02.11.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.08.2013Examination requested  [2013/37]
28.01.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.05.2014Fee for grant paid
27.05.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.05.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.01.2014
Opposition(s)10.04.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.08.2011
AL09.07.2014
AT09.07.2014
BE09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
ES09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
IT09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
MK09.07.2014
MT09.07.2014
NL09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
RS09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
SM09.07.2014
TR09.07.2014
IE16.08.2014
LU16.08.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU16.08.2011
AT09.07.2014
BE09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
ES09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
IT09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
MK09.07.2014
MT09.07.2014
NL09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
RS09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
SM09.07.2014
TR09.07.2014
IE16.08.2014
LU16.08.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
Former [2016/33]HU16.08.2011
AT09.07.2014
BE09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
ES09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
IT09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
MT09.07.2014
NL09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
RS09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
SM09.07.2014
TR09.07.2014
IE16.08.2014
LU16.08.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
Former [2016/32]HU16.08.2011
AT09.07.2014
BE09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
ES09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
IT09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
MT09.07.2014
NL09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
RS09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
SM09.07.2014
IE16.08.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
Former [2016/28]AT09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
ES09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
IT09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
MT09.07.2014
NL09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
RS09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
SM09.07.2014
IE16.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
Former [2016/22]AT09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
ES09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
IT09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
NL09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
RS09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
SM09.07.2014
IE16.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
Former [2015/50]AT09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
ES09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
IT09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
NL09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
RS09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
SI09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
IE16.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
Former [2015/37]AT09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
ES09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
IT09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
NL09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
RS09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
IE16.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
Former [2015/23]AT09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
CZ09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
EE09.07.2014
ES09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
IT09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
NL09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
RS09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
SK09.07.2014
BE31.08.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
Former [2015/22]AT09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
DK09.07.2014
ES09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
IT09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
NL09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
RO09.07.2014
RS09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
BE31.08.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
Former [2015/20]AT09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
ES09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
MC09.07.2014
NL09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
RS09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
BE31.08.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
Former [2015/19]AT09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
ES09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
NL09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
RS09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
BE31.08.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
Former [2015/12]AT09.07.2014
CY09.07.2014
ES09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
HR09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
LV09.07.2014
NL09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
RS09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
IS09.11.2014
PT10.11.2014
Former [2015/11]CY09.07.2014
ES09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
PL09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
GR10.10.2014
PT10.11.2014
Former [2015/10]ES09.07.2014
FI09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
BG09.10.2014
NO09.10.2014
Former [2015/09]FI09.07.2014
LT09.07.2014
SE09.07.2014
Former [2015/08]LT09.07.2014
Documents cited:Search[X]US2011137458  (HISATANI MASUJIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0042] - [0058]; figure 1 *;
 [E]EP2366964  (SENER ING & SIST [ES]) [E] 1-15 * paragraphs [0025] - [0041]; figures 1, 8 *;
 [A]US2010206294  (BLAIR JASON [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0028] - [0032] - [0 35] , [0 40]; figures 1-5, 8, 11 *;
 [A]DE102009054160  (WOCKEN INDUSTRIEPARTNER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.