Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2423088

EP2423088 - Bicycle handlebar grip [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.05.2014
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.02.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
05.02.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ergon International GmbH
Universitätsstrasse 2
56070 Koblenz / DE
[2018/09]
Former [2016/23]For all designated states
RTI Sports GmbH
Universitätsstrasse 2
56070 Koblenz / DE
Former [2012/19]For all designated states
RTI Sports Vertrieb von Sportartikeln GmbH
Universitätsstrasse 2
56070 Koblenz / DE
Former [2012/09]For all designated states
RTI Sports Vertrieb von Sportartikeln GmbH
Rudolf-Diesel-Straße 21
56220 Urmitz / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Arnold, Franc
Bismarckstrasse 6a
56068 Koblenz / DE
 [2012/09]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/26]Von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2012/09]von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date11178302.322.08.2011
[2012/09]
Priority number, dateDE20102011985U30.08.2010         Original published format: DE 202010011985 U
[2012/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2423088
Date:29.02.2012
Language:DE
[2012/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2423088
Date:25.04.2012
Language:DE
[2012/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2423088
Date:25.06.2014
Language:DE
[2014/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.03.2012
ClassificationInternational:B62K21/12, B62K21/26
[2012/09]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/09]
TitleGerman:Fahrradgriff[2012/09]
English:Bicycle handlebar grip[2012/09]
French:Poignée de vélo[2012/09]
Examination procedure26.09.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.09.2012Examination requested  [2012/45]
04.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.03.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.2013Date of oral proceedings
06.12.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
17.01.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.05.2014Fee for grant paid
13.05.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.05.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP14170965.9  / EP2774834
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.02.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.03.2015   
SQlab GmbH
Postweg 4
82024 Taufkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Koelle, Alexander
Wolfratshauser Strasse 243
81479 München / DE
 [2015/19]
04.05.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.06.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
04.05.2017Date of oral proceedings
07.07.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
07.07.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition14.09.2017Appeal received No.  T1822/17
16.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
10.08.2017Appeal received No.  T1822/17
16.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
06.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.08.2011
AL25.06.2014
BG25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
IT25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
MK25.06.2014
MT25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
RS25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SI25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
SM25.06.2014
TR25.06.2014
IE22.08.2014
LU22.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
FR01.09.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
GB22.08.2015
AT22.08.2016
NL01.09.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU22.08.2011
BG25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
IT25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
MK25.06.2014
MT25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
RS25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SI25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
SM25.06.2014
TR25.06.2014
IE22.08.2014
LU22.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
FR01.09.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
GB22.08.2015
AT22.08.2016
NL01.09.2016
Former [2017/49]HU22.08.2011
BG25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
IT25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
MT25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
RS25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SI25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
SM25.06.2014
TR25.06.2014
IE22.08.2014
LU22.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
FR01.09.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
GB22.08.2015
AT22.08.2016
NL01.09.2016
Former [2017/41]HU22.08.2011
BG25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
IT25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
MT25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
RS25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SI25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
SM25.06.2014
TR25.06.2014
IE22.08.2014
LU22.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
FR01.09.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
GB22.08.2015
NL01.09.2016
Former [2016/34]HU22.08.2011
BG25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
IT25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
MT25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
RS25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SI25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
SM25.06.2014
TR25.06.2014
IE22.08.2014
LU22.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
FR01.09.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
GB22.08.2015
Former [2016/33]HU22.08.2011
BG25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
IT25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
MT25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
RS25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SI25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
SM25.06.2014
TR25.06.2014
IE22.08.2014
LU22.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
FR01.09.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
Former [2016/32]HU22.08.2011
BG25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
IT25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
MT25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
RS25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SI25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
SM25.06.2014
IE22.08.2014
LU22.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
FR01.09.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
Former [2016/31]BG25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
IT25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
MT25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
RS25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SI25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
SM25.06.2014
IE22.08.2014
LU22.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
FR01.09.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
Former [2016/28]CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
IT25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
MT25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
RS25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SI25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
SM25.06.2014
IE22.08.2014
LU22.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
FR01.09.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
Former [2016/22]CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
IT25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
RS25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SI25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
SM25.06.2014
IE22.08.2014
LU22.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
FR01.09.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
Former [2015/50]CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
IT25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
RS25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SI25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
IE22.08.2014
LU22.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
FR01.09.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
Former [2015/38]CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
IT25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
RS25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
IE22.08.2014
LU22.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
FR01.09.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
Former [2015/37]CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
IT25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
RS25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
IE22.08.2014
LU22.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
Former [2015/22]CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
IT25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
RS25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
LU22.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
Former [2015/20]CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
RS25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
LU22.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
Former [2015/19]CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
RS25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
LU22.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
Former [2015/18]CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
RS25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
Former [2015/12]CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
RS25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
Former [2015/11]CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
RS25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
PT27.10.2014
Former [2015/10]CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
RS25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
Former [2014/52]CY25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
RS25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
Former [2014/50]CY25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
Former [2014/49]CY25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
Former [2014/48]CY25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
Former [2014/47]CY25.06.2014
Documents cited:Search[IA]DE20303932U  (INT BICYCLE PRODUCTS CORP [TW]) [I] 1-5,7-10 * page 2, line 21 - page 4, line 30 * * figure - * [A] 6,11-13;
 [XAI]WO2004048187  (LAIDLAW COLIN ALEXANDER [GB]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,10 * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 19 * * figure - * [A] 7,9,11-13 [I] 4;
 [XAI]DE9112567U  (KÖRNER, STEFFEN) [X] 1,3,4,8-10 * the whole document * [A] 2,5,11-13 [I] 6,7
by applicantEP1537014